Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II v. Rosario-Acevedo et al
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Pedro A Delgado-Hernande |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01821 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1345 Foreclosure |
Case Filed: | Jun 17, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Jun 07, 2018 |
Terminated: | Apr 04, 2019 |
Last checked: Thursday Dec 14, 2017 5:04 AM AST |
Defendant
Conjugal Partnership Acevedo-Heredia
|
|
Defendant
Claritza Heredia-Lopez
|
|
Defendant
Felipe Acevedo-Rosario
|
|
Plaintiff
Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 06, 2020 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Confirmation of Sale
Tue 10/06 6:52 PM
ORDER: Granting25 "Motion for Confirmation of Sale," and Finding as moot29 "Motion for confirmation of sale." See attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 10/6/2020. (ebb) |
|
29 | 29
motion
Confirmation of Sale
Tue 10/06 5:33 PM
MOTION for Confirmation of Sale filed by Francisco J. Fernandez-Chiques on behalf of Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II Responses due by 10/20/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco) |
|
Att: 1 Return by Special Master, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 05, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion In Compliance
Wed 08/05 12:03 PM
ORDER: Noting27 "Motion in Compliance with Court Order." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/5/2020. (ebb) |
|
27 | 27
motion
In Compliance
Wed 08/05 10:51 AM
Motion In Compliance as to 26 Order,,,, filed by Francisco J. Fernandez-Chiques on behalf of Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II Responses due by 8/19/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco) |
|
Tuesday, July 28, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
order
Order
Tue 07/28 10:49 AM
ORDER: Not later than August 7, 2020, plaintiff shall inform whether the mortgage in question is subject to any applicable local or federal moratorium or is an FHA-insured Single Family mortgage covered under the Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security (CARES) Act. If the mortgage in question is an FHA-insured Single Family mortgage covered under the Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security (CARES) Act, or one under either Fannie Mae or Freddie Mac, plaintiff shall show cause within that term as to why the case should not be subject to the Foreclosure and Eviction Moratorium in connection with the Presidentially Declared COVID-19 National Emergency, instituted by the U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development (HUD) on March 18, 2020 (via Mortgagee Letter 2020-03), which was extended through August 31, 2020 (see Mortgagee Letters 2020-13 and 2020-19). See Federal Housing Finance Agencys June 17, 2020 News Release. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 7/28/2020. (ebb) |
|
Tuesday, February 25, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Confirmation of Sale
Tue 02/25 9:34 AM
MOTION for Confirmation of Sale filed by Francisco J. Fernandez-Chiques on behalf of Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II Responses due by 3/10/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco) |
|
Att: 1 Return by Special Master, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 14, 2020 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Party
Tue 01/14 2:03 PM
ORDER: Granting23 "Motion for Substitution of Party." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/14/2020. (ebb) |
|
Wednesday, January 08, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Substitute Party
Wed 01/08 5:49 PM
MOTION to Substitute Party filed by Francisco J. Fernandez-Chiques on behalf of Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II Responses due by 1/22/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Hearing | ||
Monday, November 25, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
service
Writ Issued
Mon 11/25 1:57 PM
Writ of Execution Issued.(Original and Certified copy of Writ sent by mail to Atty. Francisco J. Fernandez-Chiques) (ad) |
|
Wednesday, November 20, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Execution of Judgment Order on Motion to Appoint Special Master Order on Motion requesting Order
Wed 11/20 5:19 PM
ORDER: Granting18 "Motion for Execution of Judgment." See attached. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 11/20/2019. (MPL) |
|
Tuesday, November 19, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Requesting Order
Tue 11/19 5:51 PM
MOTION requesting Order , re 18 MOTION for Execution of Judgment 19 MOTION to Appoint Special Master filed by Francisco J. Fernandez-Chiques on behalf of Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II Responses due by 12/3/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco) |
|
Monday, June 03, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Appoint Special Master
Mon 06/03 4:56 PM
MOTION to Appoint Special Master filed by Francisco J. Fernandez-Chiques on behalf of Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II Responses due by 6/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
18 | 18
motion
Execution of Judgment
Mon 06/03 4:53 PM
MOTION for Execution of Judgment filed by Francisco J. Fernandez-Chiques on behalf of Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II Responses due by 6/17/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Writ | ||
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thu 04/04 3:58 PM
ORDER: Granting16 "Motion for Default Judgment." See attached. This case is now closed for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 4/4/2019. (EMJ) |
|
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Default -Judgment
Thu 01/17 12:44 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Defendants filed by Francisco J. Fernandez-Chiques on behalf of Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II Responses due by 1/31/2019. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Note, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Mortgage Deed, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Verified Title Report, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Certificate of Title, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Unsworn Statement, | ||
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Judgment | ||
Tuesday, January 15, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Tue 01/15 11:10 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Felipe Acevedo-Rosario, Conjugal Partnership Acevedo-Heredia, Claritza Heredia-Lopez. (mr) |
|
Monday, January 14, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order on Motion for Entry of Default
Mon 01/14 6:01 PM
ORDER: Granting13 "Motion for Entry of Default." The Clerk shall enter default accordingly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 1/14/2018. (EMJ) |
|
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Default - Entry
Tue 11/06 7:13 PM
MOTION for Default Entry as to All Defendants filed by Francisco J. Fernandez-Chiques on behalf of Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II Responses due by 11/20/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco) |
|
12 | 12
service
Service by Publication
Tue 11/06 7:06 PM
SERVICE by Publication filed by Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II. Last publication date 09/20/18. (Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco) |
|
Tuesday, August 14, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
service
Service by Publication
Tue 08/14 5:04 PM
Summons by Publication issued as to Felipe Acevedo-Rosario, Conjugal Partnership Acevedo-Heredia, Claritza Heredia-Lopez. (vdm) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Publication | ||
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order on Motion for Service by Publication
Mon 08/13 2:58 PM
ORDER: Granting9 "Motion for Service by Publication." Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/13/2018. (LMR) |
|
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Service by Publication
Tue 07/31 6:02 PM
MOTION for Service by Publication as to All Defendants filed by Francisco J. Fernandez-Chiques on behalf of Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II Responses due by 8/14/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 06/27 3:40 PM
ORDER: Granting "Motion to Reopen Proceedings." Because six months elapsed since the filing of the complaint and entry of judgment administratively closing the case without service of summons on any defendants, plaintiff shall serve summons and a copy of the complaint on all defendants not later than July 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 6/27/2018. (AM) |
|
Saturday, June 09, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Lift Stay
Sat 06/09 5:17 PM
MOTION to lift stay re6 Judgment filed by Francisco J. Fernandez-Chiques on behalf of Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II Responses due by 6/25/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco) |
|
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Judgment
Tue 12/26 4:37 PM
JUDGMENT: See attached. This case is now closed for statistical purposes. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/26/2017. (ebb) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Tue 12/26 4:30 PM
ORDER: Granting4 "Leave for Temporary Stay." This case is ordered administratively closed. It may be reopened by any party upon expiration of the term referred to in the motion. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 12/26/2017. (ebb) |
|
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Informative Motion
Thu 12/21 5:11 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Moratorium filed by Francisco J. Fernandez-Chiques on behalf of Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II Responses due by 1/4/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/19 11:19 AM
Summons Issued as to Felipe Acevedo-Rosario, Conjugal Partnership Acevedo-Heredia, Claritza Heredia-Lopez (arg) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Mon 06/19 9:27 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg) |
|
Saturday, June 17, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Sat 06/17 6:58 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-5489772.), filed by Roosevelt Cayman Asset Company II. Service due by 9/15/2017,(Fernandez-Chiques, Francisco) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Note, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Category Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Summons |