Maxey v. Albee Tower I Owners LLC et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | William F Kuntz, II |
Referred: | Ramon E Reyes, Jr |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03676 |
Nature of Suit | 443 Civil Rights - Housing/Accommodations |
Cause | 42:405 Fair Housing Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 18, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 19, 2018 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 15, 2017 3:41 AM EST |
Defendant
Albee Tower I Member LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Albee Tower I Owners LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
PWB Management Corp
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Maxey
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 19, 2018 | ||
45 | 45
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 09/19 3:14 PM
STIPULATION Of Dismissal: Pursuant to Rule 4l(a)(l)(A)(ii) of the FederalRules of Civil Procedure, all the claims asserted or could have been asserted in this action are hereby dismissed with prejudice and without costs.SO Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II on undated. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, September 18, 2018 | ||
44 | 44
motion
Adjourn Conference
Tue 09/18 12:22 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Larry Maxey. (Hanski, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
43 | 43
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 09/18 11:51 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Larry Maxey (Hanski, Robert) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Tue 09/18 1:07 PM
ORDER granting44 Motion to Adjourn Conference Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/18/18. |
||
Tuesday, August 28, 2018 | ||
42 | 42
motion
Dismiss
Tue 08/28 3:53 PM
Letter MOTION to Dismiss with request to reopen within 30 days by Albee Tower I Member LLC, Albee Tower I Owners LLC. (Lynett, Joseph) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 08/28 4:08 PM
ORDER denying42 Motion to Dismiss. The parties have until 9/14/18 to file a stipulation of dismissal or complete all discovery. NO EXTENSIONS WILL BE PERMITTED FOR ANY REASON WHATSOEVER. The final pretrial conference is adjourned to 9/18/18 at 3:00 p.m.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 8/28/18. |
||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 08/28 4:40 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: The final pretrial conference is adjourned to 9/18/2018 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
41 | 41
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/13 4:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Marie McCloskey on behalf of Albee Tower I Member LLC, Albee Tower I Owners LLC (aty to be noticed) (McCloskey, Rebecca) |
|
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
40 | 40
misc
Letter
Fri 08/10 9:15 AM
Letter regarding case status by 7 Dekalb Owners LLC, Albee Tower I Member LLC, Albee Tower I Owners LLC, PWB Management Corp, Urban Associates, LLC (DiPalma, Joseph) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
39 | 39
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 08/06 2:36 PM
ANSWER to38 Amended Complaint by 7 Dekalb Owners LLC, Albee Tower I Member LLC, Albee Tower I Owners LLC, PWB Management Corp, Urban Associates, LLC. (DiPalma, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 07/25 4:36 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr:Status Conference held on 7/25/2018. Appearances and discussions held on the record. The parties must inform the Court by letter on 8/10/18 whether a settlement was reached. If a settlement is reached then the parties must file a Stipulation of Dismissal no later than 8/31/2018; otherwise, proceed with completing depositions and discovery by the same due date. The 8/8/2018 Final Pretrial Conference is adjourned to 9/5/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. (FTR Log #11:57:40-12:07:17.) (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
38 | 38
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 07/23 6:52 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against 7 Dekalb Owners LLC, Albee Tower I Member LLC, Albee Tower I Owners LLC, PWB Management Corp, Urban Associates, LLC, filed by Larry Maxey. (Hanski, Robert) |
|
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement Scheduling Order
Fri 07/20 3:53 PM
ORDER granting37 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement. Plaintiff to file amended pleadings by 7/25/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 7/20/2018. (Genovese, Jacqueline) |
||
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Amend/Correct/Supplement
Thu 07/12 5:48 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement19 Amended Complaint by Larry Maxey. (Hanski, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit "A" | ||
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Adjourn Conference
Fri 06/22 3:55 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by 7 Dekalb Owners LLC, Albee Tower I Member LLC, Albee Tower I Owners LLC, PWB Management Corp, Urban Associates, LLC. (DiPalma, Joseph) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Fri 06/22 4:35 PM
ORDER granting36 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Status Conference is rescheduled for 7/25/2018 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. The Discovery Deadline remains unaffected and is set for 7/31/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 6/22/2018. (Genovese, Jacqueline) |
||
Monday, May 07, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 05/07 10:11 PM
ANSWER to19 Amended Complaint by 7 Dekalb Owners LLC, Urban Associates, LLC. (DiPalma, Joseph) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Consent to Change Attorney
Mon 05/07 10:10 PM
NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Joseph James DiPalma (DiPalma, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 04/24 9:00 AM
ORDER granting33 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants 7 Dekalb Owners LLC and Urban Associates, LLC answers to the Complaint are due 5/7/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 4/23/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Monday, April 23, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 04/23 5:00 PM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re19 Amended Complaint by 7 Dekalb Owners LLC, Urban Associates, LLC. (Rosen, Cori) |
|
Monday, April 02, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 04/02 8:40 AM
ORDER granting32 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants 7 Dekalb Owners, LLC and Urban Associates, LLC answers are due 4/13/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 3/30/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 03/30 3:09 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer the Complaint by 7 Dekalb Owners LLC, Urban Associates, LLC. (Rosen, Cori) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Thu 03/29 6:38 PM
ANSWER to19 Amended Complaint by Albee Tower I Member LLC, Albee Tower I Owners LLC, PWB Management Corp. (DiPalma, Joseph) |
|
Monday, March 19, 2018 | ||
order
Order(Other) ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 03/19 12:59 PM
ORDER re30 Proposed Scheduling Order is approved. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/8/2018 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., Status Conference set for 6/27/2018 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 3/19/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Sunday, March 18, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
misc
Proposed Scheduling Order
Sun 03/18 8:36 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order (Jointly Proposed) by Larry Maxey (Hanski, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, March 14, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Consent to Change Attorney
Wed 03/14 11:05 AM
NOTICE of Consent to Change Attorney by Joseph James DiPalma (DiPalma, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
order
Order(Other) 1 - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 03/13 4:50 PM
ORDER: Upon review of the confidential settlement submissions it is apparent that the parties are too far apart in their settlement positions for a productive settlement conference. Accordingly, the March 15th settlement conference is cancelled. The parties are to complete ALL discovery by July 31, 2018. NO EXTENSIONS WILL BE PERMITTED. The parties are to submit a revised case management plan with dates for all disclosures, including experts, by March 16, 2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 3/13/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
order
Order(Other)
Mon 03/12 5:45 PM
ORDER re Confidential ex parte settlement letters to be faxed to Magistrate Judge Reyes Chambers at 718-613-2125 by 3/9/2018: The Court did not receive Plaintiff Larry Maxey or Defendants' Urban Associates, LLC and 7 Dekalb Owners, LLC ex parte settlement letters. The parties are directed to comply with the Court's 3/7/2018 order. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 3/12/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 03/09 8:27 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on or before March 31, 2018 by 7 Dekalb Owners LLC, Urban Associates, LLC. (Rosen, Cori) |
|
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 03/09 8:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cori Ann Rosen on behalf of 7 Dekalb Owners LLC, Urban Associates, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Rosen, Cori) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 03/09 10:41 AM
ORDER granting28 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants 7 Dekalb Owners, LLC and Urban Associates, LLC answers are due 3/30/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 3/9/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
order
~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 03/07 10:47 AM
Confidential ex parte settlement letters to be faxed to Chambers at 718-613-2125 by 3/9/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 3/7/2018. (Genovese, Jacqueline) |
||
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 03/01 11:47 AM
ORDER granting26 Motion for Defendant PWB Management, Corp., Extension of Time to Answer by 3/29/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 3/1/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 02/28 12:35 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re19 Amended Complaint by PWB Management Corp. (Haar, Jamie) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Wed 02/28 9:41 AM
ORDER granting25 Motion for Defendants Albee Tower I Member LLC and Albee Tower I Owners LLC Extension of Time to Answer by 3/29/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 2/28/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Friday, February 23, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 02/23 5:10 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re19 Amended Complaint by Albee Tower I Member LLC, Albee Tower I Owners LLC. (DiPalma, Joseph) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 02/21 7:25 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Maxey. Urban Associates, LLC served on 2/15/2018, answer due 3/8/2018. (Hanski, Robert) |
|
23 | 23
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 02/21 7:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Larry Maxey. 7 Dekalb Owners LLC served on 2/15/2018, answer due 3/8/2018. (Hanski, Robert) |
|
Monday, February 12, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
service
Summons Issued
Mon 02/12 2:03 PM
Summons Issued as to 7 Dekalb Owners LLC, Urban Associates, LLC. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Issued | ||
Saturday, February 10, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Sat 02/10 4:03 PM
Proposed Summons. Re19 Amended Complaint by Larry Maxey (Hanski, Robert) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Sat 02/10 3:59 PM
Proposed Summons. Re19 Amended Complaint by Larry Maxey (Hanski, Robert) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
cmp
Amended Complaint
Fri 02/09 6:46 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Albee Tower I Member LLC, Albee Tower I Owners LLC, PWB Management Corp, Urban Associates, LLC, 7 Dekalb Owners LLC, filed by Larry Maxey. (Hanski, Robert) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings
Fri 01/19 2:29 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Telephone Conference held on 1/19/2018. Appearances: Robert Gerald Hanski, Esq. for Plaintiff, Joseph J. Lynett, Esq. for Defendant Albee Tower I Owners LLC, and Jamie Haar, Esq. for Defendant PWB Management Corp. Discussions held. Defendant to disclose information regarding new owners and new management company to Plaintiff by 1/26/2018. Plaintiff to file amended pleadings by 2/9/2018. Defendant to disclose Confidential Expert Report, for attorney's eyes only, by 1/26/2018. Settlement Conference is set for 3/15/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. All parties MUST be present, including the new and former building owners and the new and former management company. (FTR Log #11:02:49 - 11:22:28 (208N).) (Genovese, Jacqueline) |
||
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 11/15 3:31 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr:Initial Conference Hearing held on 11/15/2017. Case called. Appearances and discussions held on the record. The Court adopts the parties' CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT18 . All discovery, including depositions of experts, shall be completed on or before 5/15/2018., Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., Status Conference set for 3/15/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., Telephone Conference set for 1/19/2018 at 11:00 AM, call to be initiated by plaintiff's counsel. (FTR Log #12:40:56-12:51:18.) (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Case Management Statement
Tue 11/07 7:37 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (PROPOSED) (Hanski, Robert) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 10/11 11:31 AM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The 10/19/2017 Initial Conference is adjourned to 11/15/2017 at 12:30 PM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. Case Management Statement14 is due 11/9/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 10/11/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Adjourn Conference
Tue 10/10 6:05 PM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Larry Maxey. (Hanski, Robert) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 09/15 11:50 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by PWB Management Corp. (Krebs, Diane) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Fri 09/15 11:47 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by PWB Management Corp (Krebs, Diane) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 09/13 11:31 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/19/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr., located in the United States Eastern District of New York Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York 11201. All counsel are required to attend, and plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that all counsel are aware of their obligation to appear. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See main document) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 10/16/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/13/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 09/11 3:50 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Albee Tower I Member LLC, Albee Tower I Owners LLC. (DiPalma, Joseph) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 09/11 3:47 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Albee Tower I Member LLC, Albee Tower I Owners LLC identifying Other Affiliate Acadia Realty Trust for Albee Tower I Member LLC, Albee Tower I Owners LLC. (DiPalma, Joseph) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 08/18 2:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jamie Haar on behalf of PWB Management Corp (aty to be noticed) (Haar, Jamie) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order(Other)
Wed 08/09 11:29 AM
ORDER granting re6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint. PWB Management Corp. Answer is due 9/15/2017.So Ordered by Judge William F. Kuntz, II, undated. (Tavarez, Jennifer) |
|
Tuesday, August 08, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 08/08 10:59 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Albee Tower I Member LLC, Albee Tower I Owners LLC. (Lynett, Joseph) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/08 10:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Lynett on behalf of Albee Tower I Member LLC, Albee Tower I Owners LLC (aty to be noticed) (Lynett, Joseph) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/08 10:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph James DiPalma on behalf of Albee Tower I Member LLC, Albee Tower I Owners LLC (aty to be noticed) (DiPalma, Joseph) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 08/08 10:22 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Answer is due on 09/15/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 8/8/2017. (Din, Myra) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 08/08 12:12 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Albee Tower I Member LLC's amd Albee Tower I Owners LLC's answers are due 9/11/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 8/8/2017. (Din, Myra) |
||
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 08/07 5:30 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by PWB Management Corp. (Krebs, Diane) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/07 5:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Diane Krebs on behalf of PWB Management Corp (aty to be noticed) (Krebs, Diane) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/20 11:05 AM
Summons Issued as to Albee Tower I Member LLC, Albee Tower I Owners LLC, PWB Management Corp. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 06/20 11:03 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 06/20 11:00 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/20 11:00 AM
Case Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Sunday, June 18, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/20 10:50 AM
COMPLAINT against Albee Tower I Member LLC, Albee Tower I Owners LLC, PWB Management Corp, filed by Larry Maxey. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Tue 06/20 10:52 AM
FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 0207-9613595 (Davis, Kimberly) |