Kuhn v. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Beryl A Howell |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01199 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 19, 2019 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 16, 2017 3:48 AM EST |
Defendant
DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
HARRIET KUHN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 19, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 06/19 12:21 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA. (Spencer, Cara) |
|
order
.Order
Wed 06/19 4:08 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to close this case in light of the parties'13 Stipulation of Dismissal, which stipulates to the dismissal of this action with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 19, 2019. (lcbah1) |
||
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/30 9:37 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cara J. Spencer on behalf of DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Spencer, Cara) |
|
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Tue 07/24 11:31 AM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the parties'11 Joint Motion to Stay Proceedings Pending Resolution of Plaintiffs Arbitration Case, STAYING the case, and DIRECTING the parties to file a Joint Status Report within 30 days of the arbitration proceedings conclusion. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 24, 2018. (lcbah1) |
||
utility
Case Stayed
Tue 07/24 11:40 AM
Case Stayed. (tg) |
||
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Stay
Thu 07/19 10:45 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings pending resolution of Plaintiff's related Administrative Appeal by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA(Dickerson, Rahsaan) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 06/04 10:02 AM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) MODIFYING, in consideration of the defendant's10 Consent Motion to Extend Fact Discovery and All Subsequent Court Ordered Deadlines, the Scheduling Order as follows: (1) by August 15, 2018, the parties shall complete fact discovery and submit a joint status report. By October 17, 2018, the parties shall file any dispositive motions. By November 14, 2018, the parties shall file any oppositions. By December 5, 2018, the parties shall file any replies. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 4, 2018. (lcbah1) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 06/04 10:15 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 8/15/2018; Joint Status Report due by 8/15/2018; Dispositive Motions due by 10/17/2018; Oppositions to Dispositive Motions due by 11/14/2018; Replies due by 12/5/2018. (tg) |
||
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Fri 05/25 7:58 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Dickerson, Rahsaan) |
|
Monday, April 09, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
12
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Mon 04/09 10:35 AM
ORDER GRANTING the parties'8 Joint Motion to Enter Protective Order. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 9, 2018. (lcbah1) |
|
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Protective Order
Fri 04/06 5:02 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Dickerson, Rahsaan) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Tue 03/13 10:39 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA(Dickerson, Rahsaan) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Tue 03/13 1:45 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the parties'7 Joint Motion to Extend Fact Discovery and All Subsequent Court Ordered Deadlines. By June 12, 2018, the parties shall complete fact discovery and submit a joint status report. By August 14, 2018, the parties shall file any dispositive motions. By September 11, 2018, the parties shall file any oppositions. By October 2, 2018, the parties shall file any replies. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 13, 2018. (lcbah1) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 03/13 2:30 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery due by 6/12/2018; Joint Status Report due by 6/12/2018; Dispositive Motions due by 8/14/2018; Oppositions to Dispositive Motions due by 9/11/2018; Reply to Oppositions to Dispositive Motions due by 10/2/2018. (tg) |
||
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
order
.Order
Wed 10/04 10:39 AM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING, upon consideration of the parties'6 Meet and Confer Report, the following SCHEDULING ORDER to control the timing of proceedings in this matter: Discovery shall commence immediately, and shall close on April 2, 2018, on which date the parties shall file a joint status report advising the Court whether (a) the parties request referral for mediation or settlement, (b) the parties request a date for a pretrial conference, or (c) dispositive motions are anticipated. Each party is limited to 30 interrogatories, 30 requests for admissions, and 10 depositions. The parties shall exchange expert witnesses' reports in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2), except that (1) either party who is an expert's proponent shall make disclosure within 90 days of this scheduling order; (2) the opposing party will then have 45 days to make counter-disclosures; and (3) the parties must make any supplementation of disclosure 10 business days prior to any expert's deposition. Either party shall move to amend its pleading or join additional parties, if at all, within 60 days of the close of discovery, and any further amendments past that deadline may be made only by consent of the other party or leave of Court. Should either party amend its pleading, the other party must file its response, if any, within 30 days following service of the amendment. Any dispositive motions shall be filed no later than June 4, 2018, with oppositions due by July 5, 2018 and replies due by July 26, 2018. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 4, 2017. (lcbah1) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 10/04 3:36 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Discovery shall close on 4/2/2018. Joint Status Report due by 4/2/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 6/4/2018. Oppositions to Dispositive Motions due by 7/5/2018. Replies to Dispositive Motions due by 7/26/2018. (hmc) |
||
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Meet and Confer Statement
Tue 10/03 2:09 PM
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT.(Salzman, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 08/28 3:38 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA.(Dickerson, Rahsaan) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 07/25 8:33 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Complaint due by 8/28/2017. (tg) |
||
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 07/24 3:45 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on or before August 28, 2017 by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (Dickerson, Rahsaan) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 07/24 4:59 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendant's consented to4 Motion for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint and Points and Authorities in Support Thereof. Accordingly, the defendant shall, by August 28, 2017, respond to the Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 24, 2017. (lcbah1) |
||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Standing Order
Tue 06/20 1:05 PM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 20, 2017. (lcbah1) |
|
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to DCAG,DCDFT, Mayor
Tue 06/20 10:46 AM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to District of Columbia Attorney General and the District of Columbia Mayor. (Attachment: #1 Consent Form)(zsb) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/20 10:44 AM
Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb) |
||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/19 2:26 PM
COMPLAINT against DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4996845) filed by Harriet Kuhn.(Salzman, Richard) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons |