ROAD SPRINKLER FITTERS LOCAL UNION 669 v. NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy J Kelly |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01200 |
Nature of Suit | 790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 24, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 16, 2017 3:34 AM EST |
Defendant
NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ROAD SPRINKLER FITTERS LOCAL UNION 669
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/27/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, August 24, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
16
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Fri 08/24 6:04 PM
|
|
29 | 29
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Fri 08/24 5:59 PM
ORDER granting Defendant's11 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction and denying as moot Plaintiff's13 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and17 Corrected Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 8/24/2018. (lctjk3) |
|
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Response to (non-motion) Document
Tue 06/26 11:30 AM
RESPONSE re27 NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY filed by ROAD SPRINKLER FITTERS LOCAL UNION 669. (Osborne, William) |
|
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Supplemental Authority
Fri 06/22 3:03 PM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD(Becker, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Colorado Fire Sprinkler, Inc. v. NLRB, No. 16-1261 2018 WL 2749130 (D.C. Cir. June 8, 2018) | ||
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion
Tue 01/23 2:43 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD for a Stay of Consideration and Resolution of the Pending Dispositive Motions in Light of United States Government Partial Shutdown (Becker, Daniel) |
|
25 | 25
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Tue 01/23 12:22 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Corrected) (Corrected) filed by ROAD SPRINKLER FITTERS LOCAL UNION 669. (Osborne, William) |
|
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Mon 01/22 12:10 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Stay of Consideration and Resolution of the Pending Dispositive Motions in Light of United States Government Partial Shutdown re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,13 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment ,17 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Corrected) by NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD(Becker, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Stay of Consideration and Resolution of the Pending Dispositive Motions | ||
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Thu 01/18 1:17 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re17 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Corrected) filed by ROAD SPRINKLER FITTERS LOCAL UNION 669.(Osborne, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C | ||
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Wed 12/27 12:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's22 Unopposed Motion for Temporary Relief from Local Civil Rule 7(n)(1). Defendant shall comply with Local Civil Rule 7(n)(1) within thirty (30) days after this Court rules on Defendant's Motion11 to Dismiss for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/27/2017. (lctjk1) |
||
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 12/21 5:09 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Temporary Relief from Local Civil Rule 7(n)(1) by NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD(Becker, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
21 | 21
17
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Thu 12/21 5:06 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re13 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment ,17 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Corrected) filed by NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD. (Becker, Daniel) |
|
20 | 20
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Thu 12/21 5:05 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD. (Becker, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 12/12 1:42 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's19 Second Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant shall file its Reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss and its Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by December 21, 2017. Plaintiff shall file its reply in support of its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by January 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 12/12/2017. (lctjk3) |
||
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 12/08 12:27 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,13 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment (Second Request) by NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD(Becker, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
13
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Tue 12/05 1:00 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Corrected) filed by ROAD SPRINKLER FITTERS LOCAL UNION 669. (Osborne, William) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 12/05 12:58 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment (Corrected) by ROAD SPRINKLER FITTERS LOCAL UNION 669 (Osborne, William) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 11/29 4:40 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's16 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File a Reply in support of its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff shall file its Reply in support of its Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment by January 11, 2018. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/29/2017. (lctjk3) |
||
Tuesday, November 28, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Tue 11/28 10:06 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re13 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by ROAD SPRINKLER FITTERS LOCAL UNION 669(Osborne, William) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 11/20 10:46 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ,13 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD(Becker, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 11/20 2:02 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant's Reply in support of its Motion to Dismiss and its Opposition to Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment shall be due by December 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 11/20/2017. (lctjk3) |
||
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
13
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Thu 11/16 3:10 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by ROAD SPRINKLER FITTERS LOCAL UNION 669.(Osborne, William) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
motion
Summary Judgment
Thu 11/16 3:08 PM
Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by ROAD SPRINKLER FITTERS LOCAL UNION 669(Osborne, William) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of Facts, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 10/11 9:26 AM
Set/Reset Deadline: The Plaintiff shall have up to and including 11/16/2017 to respond to the Defendant's motion to dismiss. (ad) |
||
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 10/10 2:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion is granted, and Plaintiff shall have up to and including November 16, 2017 to respond to the Defendant's motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Timothy J. Kelly on 10/10/2017. (lctjk2) |
||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 10/06 12:24 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by ROAD SPRINKLER FITTERS LOCAL UNION 669 (Osborne, William) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Tue 10/03 5:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD(Becker, Daniel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 09/15 1:44 PM
Case directly reassigned to Judge Timothy J. Kelly. Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) |
||
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
order
.Order
Thu 07/20 1:08 PM
GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 7/20/2017. (lckbj1) |
||
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/05 1:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Brasil Becker on behalf of NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD (Becker, Daniel) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/30 2:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Patrick Flanagan on behalf of NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD (Flanagan, Kevin) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Fri 06/23 9:42 AM
SUMMONS (2) Issued Electronically as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jf) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Request for Summons to Issue
Thu 06/22 1:00 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by ROAD SPRINKLER FITTERS LOCAL UNION 669.(Osborne, William) |
|
5 | 5
cmp
Request for Summons to Issue
Thu 06/22 12:59 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by ROAD SPRINKLER FITTERS LOCAL UNION 669.(Osborne, William) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Wed 06/21 4:48 PM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD. (Attachment: #1 Consent Form)(zsb) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Request for Summons to Issue
Wed 06/21 11:37 AM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by ROAD SPRINKLER FITTERS LOCAL UNION 669.(Osborne, William) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 06/21 11:35 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by ROAD SPRINKLER FITTERS LOCAL UNION 669 filed by ROAD SPRINKLER FITTERS LOCAL UNION 669.(Osborne, William) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 06/21 4:45 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb) |
||
service
Summons Not Issued
Wed 06/21 4:49 PM
SUMMONS Not Issued as to US Attorney and US Attorney General.....SUMMONS NOT FILED AT THE TIME COMPLAINT WAS FILED.(zsb) |
||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/19 3:00 PM
COMPLAINT against NATIONAL LABOR RELATIONS BOARD ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4996946) filed by ROAD SPRINKLER FITTERS LOCAL UNION 669.(Osborne, William) |