SIMMERS v. NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Trevor N Mcfadden |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01204 |
Nature of Suit | 330 Torts - Personal Injury - Federal Employers’ Liability |
Cause | 45:2 Federal Employers' Liability Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 16, 2017 4:28 AM EST |
Defendant
NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ANDREW R. SIMMERS
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 04/27 2:24 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (Singleton, Dawn) |
|
order
.Order
Fri 04/27 4:34 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties' joint13 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice per the terms of the stipulation. Each party shall bear its own attorney's costs and fees, as stipulated. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/27/2018. (lctnm2) |
||
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
order
.Order
Tue 03/13 10:30 AM
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Plaintiff's12 Notice of Settlement, the parties are hereby ORDERED to file a joint stipulation of dismissal on or before April 27, 2018. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/13/2018. (lctnm2) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 03/13 12:01 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint stipulation of dismissal due by 4/27/2018. (hmc) |
||
Monday, March 12, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Settlement
Mon 03/12 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Settlement Letter to Judge McFadden by ANDREW R. SIMMERS (Duckworth, James) |
|
Friday, March 09, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 03/09 10:13 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's response to the Court due by 3/12/2018. (hmc) |
||
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Extension of Time to
Thu 03/08 2:19 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File 26(a)(2) Statement by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK)(Singleton, Dawn) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
.Order
Thu 03/08 5:26 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court is the Defendant's11 Consent Motion to Extend Time, which suggests that the Plaintiff may intend to call his medical doctors for the purpose of giving opinion testimony pursuant to Federal Rule of Evidence 702, 703, or 705, even though the Plaintiff failed to provide the required disclosures pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(a)(2) and the Court's9 Scheduling Order dated October 3, 2017. A decision on the Defendant's11 Consent Motion to Extend Time is hereby DEFERRED, and the Plaintiff is ORDERED to notify the Court on or before March 12, 2018, whether he intends to elicit opinion testimony from his doctors as alleged. If so, the Plaintiff must also show cause, if there be any, why such testimony should not be excluded from trial as a sanction for violating the Court's9 Scheduling Order dated October 3, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/8/2018. (lctnm2) |
||
Thursday, March 01, 2018 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 03/01 3:31 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING: The parties shall take notice that a Status Conference is scheduled for 5/1/2018, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (hmc) |
||
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Rule 26a1 Statement
Mon 11/20 1:41 PM
RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Singleton, Dawn) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
order
.Order
Wed 11/15 11:34 AM
MINUTE ORDER: In light of the recent assignment of this case to Judge McFadden, the parties are advised that the pre-existing schedule for this case remains in effect. The parties shall comply with all deadlines as previously ordered. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on November 15, 2017. (lctnm2) |
||
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 11/02 12:59 PM
Case directly reassigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Judge Rosemary M. Collyer is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) |
||
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
order
.Order
Tue 10/03 5:17 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 10/3/2017. (lcrmc1) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Meet and Confer Statement
Thu 09/28 5:13 PM
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Singleton, Dawn) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
order
.Order Terminate Hearings
Tue 09/26 1:54 PM
MINUTE ORDER vacating the initial scheduling conference currently set for October 5, 2017 at 11:00 AM. The parties shall file their joint report no later than September 28, 2017. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 9/26/2017. (DAS) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 09/27 8:18 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Status Report due by 9/28/2017. (zcdw) |
||
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 08/28 9:06 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Joint Report due by 9/28/2017. Initial Scheduling Conference reset for 10/5/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 8 before Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (DAS) |
||
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
.Order
Mon 08/07 1:28 PM
ORDER setting Initial Scheduling Conference for September 27, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. The parties' joint report is due September 20, 2017. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Rosemary M. Collyer on 8/7/2017. (lcrmc1) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 08/03 11:34 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph John Bottiglieri on behalf of NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) (td) |
|
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/03 10:53 AM
ENTERED IN ERROR. . . . .ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK).(Bottiglieri, Joseph) Modified on 8/3/2017 (td) |
|
notice
Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
Thu 08/03 11:35 AM
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: re5 Answer to Complaint was entered in error and said pleading was refiled correctly as docket entry no.6 . (td) |
||
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 08/02 3:33 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). (Singleton, Dawn) |
|
3 | 3
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 08/02 3:23 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK).(Singleton, Dawn) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Thu 06/22 9:31 AM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK). (Attachment: #1 Consent Forms)(jd) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/19 4:11 PM
COMPLAINT against NATIONAL RAILROAD PASSENGER CORPORATION (AMTRAK) with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4997257) filed by ANDREW SIMMERS.(Duckworth, James) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/20 2:39 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Rosemary M. Collyer. (jd) |