AES ELECTRICAL v. LUCY WEBB HAYES NATIONAL TRAINING SCHOOL FOR DEACONESSES AND MISSIONARIES et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Amit P Mehta |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01205 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 16, 2017 5:08 AM EST |
Defendant
FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
LUCY WEBB HAYES NATIONAL TRAINING SCHOOL FOR DEACONESSES AND MISSIONARIES
|
|
Plaintiff
AES ELECTRICAL
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Withdrawal of Motion
Mon 09/18 3:23 PM
WITHDRAWAL of Motion by AES ELECTRICAL Line Withdrawing Joint Motion to Discharge Mechanic's Lien Undertaking . (Campbell, Nicole) |
|
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 09/14 10:25 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by AES ELECTRICAL. (Campbell, Nicole) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 09/14 10:18 AM
Joint MOTION Discharge Mechanic's Lien Undertaking by AES ELECTRICAL(Campbell, Nicole) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/26 5:53 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Mervis, Jeffrey) |
|
23 | 23
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/26 5:52 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA. (Mervis, Jeffrey) |
|
22 | 22
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/26 5:51 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Mervis, Jeffrey) |
|
21 | 21
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 07/26 5:47 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY. (Mervis, Jeffrey) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
respm
Response to motion
Thu 07/20 6:50 PM
RESPONSE re16 Consent MOTION to Stay The Proceedings filed by BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY, FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA, ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Mervis, Jeffrey) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Mon 07/17 3:26 PM
ORDER granting16 Plaintiff's Consent Motion to Stay. This case is hereby stayed until further order of the court. The parties are directed to file quarterly joint status reports; the first report shall be filed on or before October 16, 2017. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/17/2017. (lcapm3) |
|
18 | 18
respm
Response to motion
Mon 07/17 2:48 PM
RESPONSE re16 Consent MOTION to Stay The Proceedings filed by TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY. (Markman, Lisa) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/17 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa A Markman on behalf of TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY (Markman, Lisa) |
|
utility
Case Stayed
Mon 07/17 3:41 PM
Case Stayed. (kk) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 07/17 3:44 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Parties' Joint Status Report due by 10/16/17. (kk) |
||
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
minutes
Telephone Conference
Fri 07/14 3:38 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Telephone Conference held on 7/14/2017. (cdw) |
||
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Stay
Wed 07/12 4:30 PM
Consent MOTION to Stay The Proceedings by AES ELECTRICAL(Jones, Roger) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 07/12 4:27 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by AES ELECTRICAL (Jones, Roger) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation
Wed 07/12 3:45 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Extend Time in Which to Answer, Move, Assert a Counterclaim or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY. (Markman, Lisa) |
|
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Thu 07/06 4:15 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY served on 6/26/2017, answer due 7/17/2017 (Campbell, Nicole) |
|
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Thu 07/06 4:13 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY served on 6/26/2017, answer due 7/17/2017 (Campbell, Nicole) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Thu 07/06 4:11 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA served on 6/26/2017, answer due 7/17/2017 (Campbell, Nicole) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Thu 07/06 4:10 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LUCY WEBB HAYES NATIONAL TRAINING SCHOOL FOR DEACONESSES AND MISSIONARIES served on 6/26/2017, answer due 7/17/2017 (Campbell, Nicole) |
|
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Thu 07/06 4:08 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY served on 6/26/2017, answer due 7/17/2017 (Campbell, Nicole) |
|
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Thu 07/06 4:07 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY served on 6/26/2017, answer due 7/17/2017 (Campbell, Nicole) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Thu 07/06 4:05 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY served on 6/26/2017, answer due 7/17/2017 (Campbell, Nicole) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Thu 07/06 4:03 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY served on 6/26/2017, answer due 7/17/2017 (Campbell, Nicole) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/29 4:24 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Martin Salzman, :Firm- Hendrick Phillips Salzman & Siegel, P.C., :Address- 230 Peachtree Street, NW, Ste. 2500, Atlanta, GA 30303. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5012949. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by AES ELECTRICAL(Jones, Roger) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 06/29 7:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting5 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Martin R. Salzman is hereby admitted pro hac vice to appear in this matter on behalf of Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/29/2017. (lcapm3) |
||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/21 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole Lefcourt Campbell on behalf of AES ELECTRICAL (Campbell, Nicole) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Tue 06/20 5:06 PM
SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to BERKSHIRE HATHAWAY SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, CONTINENTAL INSURANCE COMPANY, FEDERAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE COMPANY, LUCY WEBB HAYES NATIONAL TRAINING SCHOOL FOR DEACONESSES AND MISSIONARIES, TRAVELERS CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY OF AMERICA, TURNER CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, ZURICH AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (md) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Consent | ||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 06/19 6:07 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by AES Electrical d/b/a Freestate Electrical Construction Company. (Jones, Roger) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/19 5:44 PM
COMPLAINT to Establish and Enforce Mechanic's Lien and for Damages against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4997545) filed by AES Electrical d/b/a Freestate Electrical Construction Company.(Jones, Roger) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 11 Summons, | ||
Att: 12 Summons, | ||
Att: 13 Summons, | ||
Att: 14 Summons, | ||
Att: 15 Summons, | ||
Att: 16 Summons, | ||
Att: 17 Summons, | ||
Att: 18 Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/20 3:42 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (md) |