Washington Mutual Mortgage Securities Corp. v. Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark H Cohen |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-02272 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 07, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2017 4:13 AM EST |
Defendant
Plaza Home Mortgage, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Washington Mutual Mortgage Securities Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 20, 2019 | ||
misc
Clerks Entry of Dismissal
Fri 09/20 4:10 PM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING69 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (adg) |
||
Thursday, September 19, 2019 | ||
69 | 69
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 09/19 11:58 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Washington Mutual Mortgage Securities Corp..(Sudbury, Gregory) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order |