Smith v. New York City Police Department et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Kiyo A Matsumoto |
Referred: | Sanket J Bulsara |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03636 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 14, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 29, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 11, 2017 4:25 AM EST |
Defendant
New York City Ambulance Department and Fire Department
|
|
Defendant
New York City Police Department
|
|
Plaintiff
Veronica E. Smith
900 Ogden Street Apt. 5J
Bronx, NY 10452 |
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Judgment - Clerk
Fri 09/29 5:29 PM
JUDGMENT: It is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that all of the complaints are dismissed sua sponte ; that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith; and that in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of any appeal. ORDERED by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court on 9/29/2017. ( Copy of this Judgment and the attached appeals packet sent to pro se Plaintiff via first class mail .) (Latka-Mucha, Wieslawa) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
12
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Wed 09/27 10:13 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis . For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum and Order, the court dismisses the complaint with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). Because amendment of the complaint would be futile, the court will not grant leave to amend. The court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that any appeal would not be taken in good faith and, therefore, in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States , 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment, serve a copy of the Memorandum and Order, this Order, and the judgment on plaintiff, note service on the dockets, and close the case. Ordered by Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto on 9/27/2017. (Grover, Vanish) |
|
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 09/15 3:24 PM
Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Sanket J. Bulsara. Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Motions referred to Sanket J. Bulsara. (Mahoney, Brenna) |
||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 06/19 11:46 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
Wednesday, June 14, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 06/19 11:45 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Veronica E. Smith. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/19 11:44 AM
COMPLAINT against New York City Ambulance Department and Fire Department, New York City Police Department, filed by Veronica E. Smith. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |