Stewart v. Honda Lease Trust et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Nicholas G Garaufis |
Referred: | Steven M Gold |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03686 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Auto Negligence |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 04, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 16, 2017 3:47 AM EST |
Defendant
Honda Lease Trust
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Yvette Samuel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raheem Stewart
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 10/04 9:38 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 10/3/2017. (Lee, Tiffeny) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 10/03 9:41 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by Honda Lease Trust, Yvette Samuel (O'Shaughnessy, Shawn) |
|
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Settlement
Tue 09/26 10:30 AM
Letter MOTION for Settlement by Honda Lease Trust, Yvette Samuel. (O'Shaughnessy, Shawn) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 09/01 1:22 PM
Minute Entry: Initial Conference Hearing held on 8/31/2017 before Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Katz for plaintiff, O'Shaughnessy for defendant. Counsel report that they are in the midst of productive settlement discussions. COUNSEL WILL SUBMIT A LETTER BY OCTOBER 15, 2017, REPORRTING ON THEIR PROGRESS REACHING A SETTLEMENT and proposing a case management schedule if a settlement has not been reached. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/30 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin James Katz on behalf of All Plaintiffs (notification declined or already on case) (Katz, Benjamin) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Appear by Telephone Vacate Remand to State Court
Tue 08/22 10:39 AM
Motion to Appear by Telephone , MOTION to Vacate , Letter MOTION to Remand to State Court by Honda Lease Trust, Yvette Samuel. (O'Shaughnessy, Shawn) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone Order on Motion to Vacate Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
Tue 08/22 2:53 PM
ORDER:8 Motion to Appear by Telephone;8 Motion to Vacate; and8 Motion to Remand to State Court are hereby denied. The in-person initial conference will proceed as scheduled at 10:00 am on August 31, 2017, unless by that date counsel have filed a stipulation of dismissal without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a) as suggested in the Order entered by United States District Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on July 26, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 8/22/2017. (Kaufman, Zachary) |
||
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 08/16 10:33 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 10:00 a.m. on August 31, 2017 before the undersigned in Courtroom 13-D South. Counsel for all parties must attend. Counsel for plaintiff is directed to immediately confirm this conference date and time with defendant's counsel. Adjournment requests will not be considered unless made in accordance with this Court's Individual Rules. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold on 8/16/2017. (Gillespie, Saudia) |
|
Att: 1 Chambers Individual Rules | ||
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation
Wed 07/26 10:44 AM
STIPULATION of Remand and Discontinuance as to Honda Lease Trust by Honda Lease Trust, Yvette Samuel (O'Shaughnessy, Shawn) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Wed 07/26 1:30 PM
ORDER re6 Stipulation. In their Stipulation, the parties have agreed to limit the amount in controversy in this matter to a maximum of $74,999. The parties assert that, as a result, "the federal court is divested of jurisdiction." The parties are incorrect. "It is long established law that events occurring after removal that reduce the amount in controversy, including... by stipulation,... do[] not deprive the district court of jurisdiction." Purple Passion, Inc. v. RCN Telecom Servs., Inc. , 406 F. Supp. 2d 245, 246 (S.D.N.Y. 2005) (quoting St. Paul Mercury Indem. Co. v. Red Cab Co. , 303 U.S. 283, 292 (1938)); see generally Universal Commodity Servs., Inc. v. Murphy Rd. Recycling, LLC , No. 09-CV-970, 2009 WL 1850986, at *1 (E.D.N.Y. June 18, 2009). Therefore, the Stipulation does not provide cause for remanding the action. Plaintiff retains the option to seek dismissal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a), and may, at that time, refile in state court if so desired. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/26/2017. (Polaris, Julian) |
||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 06/23 3:51 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants. (Sweeney, Robert) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Mon 06/19 3:03 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Mon 06/19 3:03 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Mon 06/19 2:05 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Notice of Removal by Honda Lease Trust, Yvette Samuel (O'Shaughnessy, Shawn) |
|
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Mon 06/19 2:02 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Honda Lease Trust, Yvette Samuel ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0207-9615497) (O'Shaughnessy, Shawn) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/19 3:02 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis and Magistrate Judge Steven M. Gold. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |