Rodriguez v. British Airways et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Brian M Cogan |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03691 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 13, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 16, 2017 5:21 AM EST |
Defendant
Plc British Airways
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cathay Pacific Airways Limited
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Valentina Rodriguez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
56 | 56
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Vacate
Fri 01/19 12:35 PM
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying plaintiff's48 Motion to Vacate. ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/19/2018 ) (Guzzi, Roseann) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
55 | 55
misc
Affidavit/Affirmation
Tue 01/16 12:07 PM
AFFIDAVIT/AFFIRMATION re54 Reply in Support, by Valentina Rodriguez (Kapelman, David) |
|
Att: 1 Interrogatories, | ||
Att: 2 Answer to Interrogatories | ||
54 | 54
respoth
Reply in Support
Tue 01/16 12:04 PM
REPLY in Support re50 Memorandum in Support,52 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion,48 MOTION to Vacate46 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,47 Clerk's Judgment, ,53 Memorandum in Opposition,51 Memorandum in Opposition,46 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment,,47 Clerk's Judgment,49 Affidavit filed by Valentina Rodriguez. (Kapelman, David) |