Guarasci v. MRS BPO, LLC
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sandra J Feuerstein |
Referred: | Arlene R Lindsay |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03679 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 28, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 16, 2017 3:43 AM EST |
Defendant
MRS BPO, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Guarasci
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 28, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 03/02 3:37 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re20 Notice of Settlement - Plaintiff having advised the Court that this matter has settled, this case is closed with leave to reopen on 10 days notice by no later than 4/13/2018. SO Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 2/28/2018. (Tirado, Chelsea) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Settlement
Tue 02/27 4:40 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Michael Guarasci (Barshay, David) |
|
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Tue 01/16 3:51 PM
ORDER re19 : The protective order is hereby So Ordered. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 1/16/2018. (Lanin, Debbie) |
||
Tuesday, January 09, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Protective Order
Tue 01/09 1:32 PM
MOTION for Protective Order Stipulated by MRS BPO, LLC. (Etmund, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Motion | ||
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 11/17 4:29 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held on 11/16/2017 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein: Civil Cause for Status Conference. Counsel for Plaintiff: David Barshay. Counsel for Defendant: Aleksander Powietrzynski. Case called. Outstanding discovery is respectfully referred to the assigned magistrate judge. All discovery shall be complete by 4/10/2018. Dispositive motions shall be served and filed in accordance with Judge FEuerstein's individual rules by 7/10/2018. An in person pretrial conference is scheduled before Judge Feuerstein on 10/10/2018 at 11:15AM. (Tirado, Chelsea) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Letter
Wed 11/15 4:08 PM
Letter providing the Court with phone number at which Aleksander Powietrzynski will be available for initial conference on November 16, 2017 at 11:15 AM by MRS BPO, LLC (Powietrzynski, Aleksander) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 11/15 11:46 AM
MOTION to Adjourn Conference on consent conference scheduled for 11/16/17 at 11:15 AM until 11/16/17 at 1:30 PM or later, November 20, 2017 at 11:15 or another time convenient for the Court by MRS BPO, LLC. (Powietrzynski, Aleksander) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Wed 11/15 3:03 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part16 (Motion to Adjourn Conference): The application is granted to the extent that counsel for MRS BPO, LLC may appear at the initial conference by telephone. By close of business today, Counsel is to file a letter with the Court providing the telephone number to be used to call him. Counsel is directed to be available at said telephone number on November 16, 2017, for a period of two (2) hours starting from 11:15 a.m. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 11/15/2017. c/ECF (Killigrew, Patricia) |
||
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 11/14 9:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aleksander Piotr Powietrzynski on behalf of MRS BPO, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Powietrzynski, Aleksander) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 11/01 11:52 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by MRS BPO, LLC. (Etmund, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
18
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 10/24 2:20 PM
ORDER denying12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Dismissal Motion is DENIED. The currently scheduled 11/16/2017 Initial Conference shall proceed at 11:15AM in Courtroom 1010 of the Central Islip Federal Courthouse. SO Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 10/24/2017. (Tirado, Chelsea) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 10/11 4:14 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: The Initial Conference originally scheduled for October 18, 2017 at 11:15 AM is adjourned to Thursday, November 16, 2017 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 (Central Islip Federal Courthouse) before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein. c/ECF (Killigrew, Patricia) |
||
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 09/06 11:55 AM
ORDER granting10 (Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply): The application is granted nunc pro tunc to permit the requested extension to August 25, 2017. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 9/6/2017. c/ECF (Killigrew, Patricia) |
||
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Fri 08/25 4:36 PM
Fully Briefed Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by MRS BPO, LLC. (Etmund, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Memorandum in Opposition (Plaintiff's), | ||
Att: 3 Reply Brief | ||
11 | 11
misc
Letter
Fri 08/25 4:25 PM
Letter serving Reply Brief on opposing counsel by MRS BPO, LLC (Etmund, Michael) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 08/21 2:34 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to9 Letter Unopposed by MRS BPO, LLC. (Etmund, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Letter
Wed 08/16 7:56 PM
Letter Cover Letter Concerning Service of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Michael Guarasci (Barshay, David) |
|
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/15 2:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David M. Barshay on behalf of Michael Guarasci (aty to be noticed) (Barshay, David) |
|
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 08/02 11:01 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MRS BPO, LLC identifying Corporate Parent MRS Associates, Inc. for MRS BPO, LLC. (Etmund, Michael) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Letter
Wed 08/02 10:59 AM
Letter serving Motion to Dismiss on opposing counsel by MRS BPO, LLC (Etmund, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/02 10:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Thomas Etmund on behalf of MRS BPO, LLC (aty to be noticed) (Etmund, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 07/26 11:43 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Guarasci. MRS BPO, LLC served on 7/13/2017, answer due 8/3/2017. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Tue 06/20 10:12 AM
Summons Issued as to MRS BPO, LLC. (Landow, Concetta) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 06/20 9:57 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Landow, Concetta) |
|
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Tue 06/20 9:54 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. (Landow, Concetta) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/20 9:57 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Landow, Concetta) |
||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 06/20 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 10/18/2017 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing upon defendant and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF (D'Agostino, Peter) |
||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/19 12:43 PM
COMPLAINT against MRS BPO, LLC filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9615216 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Michael Guarasci. (Sanders, Craig) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons |