August Storck KG et al v. Stark Group International Inc. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sandra J Feuerstein |
Referred: | Arlene R Lindsay |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03696 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 30, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 16, 2017 4:56 AM EST |
Defendant
Stark Foods Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Stark Group International Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
August Storck KG
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Storck USA L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Report Patent or Trademark AO120
Thu 08/31 2:42 PM
Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Tirado, Chelsea) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 08/31 2:40 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re8 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. SO Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 8/30/2017. (Tirado, Chelsea) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/29 3:21 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by August Storck KG, Storck USA L.P. (Wolkoff, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 07/12 12:09 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by August Storck KG, Storck USA L.P. re Notice of Hearing, (Wolkoff, Joshua) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 06/22 10:24 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 10/18/2017 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 1010 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein at the Central Islip Courthouse, located at 100 Federal Plaza, Central Islip, New York 11722. The parties shall appear with authority, or with individuals with authority, to settle this matter. Plaintiffs shall serve a copy of this Notice of Hearing on Defendants and file proof of such service with the Court. c/ECF (Walsh, Kenneth) |
||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Report Patent or Trademark AO120
Wed 06/21 5:36 PM
Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Trademark. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
Att: 1 Complaint, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 14 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/21 5:22 PM
Summons Issued as to Stark Foods Inc.. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/21 5:22 PM
Summons Issued as to Stark Group International Inc.. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Wed 06/21 5:21 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Wed 06/21 5:16 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 06/21 5:18 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (McMahon, Carol) |
||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/19 4:08 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9616282 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by August Storck KG, Storck USA L.P.. (Wolkoff, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit 11, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit 12, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit 14 |