Town Sports International, LLC et al v. Maley et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Joanna Seybert |
Case #: | 2:17-mc-01752 |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 29, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw
Thu 06/29 3:14 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting6 Motion to Withdraw. Petitioners' motion to withdraw their Order to Show Cause is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to mark this case CLOSED. Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 6/29/2017. (Seibert, Kristin) |
||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Withdraw
Wed 06/28 3:29 PM
Letter MOTION to Withdraw Order to Show Cause by Town Sports International, LLC. (Simon, Sharon) |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order to Show Cause
Mon 06/19 3:23 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ORDERED that the above named Respondents show cause before this Court on 6/30/2017 at 2:30PM in Courtroom 1030 before Judge Joanna Seybert, why an Order should not issued pursuant to Rule 45 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and 9 U.S.C. Sec. 7, ordering and compelling Respondent Steven Ferris to appear and give testimony at an arbitration hearing to be held on July 11, 2017. So Ordered by Judge Joanna Seybert on 6/19/2017. C/G (Valle, Christine) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Filing Fee Received
Mon 06/19 10:36 AM
FILING FEE: $ 47.00, receipt number 22962 (Landow, Concetta) |
|
3 | 3
respoth
Affidavit in Support
Mon 06/19 10:35 AM
Declaration in Support re1 Proposed Order to Show Cause by Paul Grima, Town Sports International, LLC. (Landow, Concetta) |
|
2 | 2
respoth
Memorandum in Support
Mon 06/19 10:30 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re1 Proposed Order to Show Cause filed by Paul Grima, Town Sports International, LLC. (Landow, Concetta) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Unsigned Order to Show Cause
Mon 06/19 10:29 AM
Proposed Order to Show Cause for Petition to Compel Witness Attendance at Arbitration Hearing by Paul Grima, Town Sports International, LLC (Landow, Concetta) |
|
Att: 1 Miscellaneous Case Cover Sheet |