Seitz v. U.S. National Whitewater Center, Inc. et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | James L Graham |
Referred: | Elizabeth Preston Deavers |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-00524 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Wrongful Death |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 26, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 16, 2017 4:06 AM EST |
Defendant
Recreation Engineering And Planning, Inc.
485 Arapahoe Avenue
Boulder, CO 80302 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. National Whitewater Center, Inc.
225 East Worthington Avenue
Charlotte, NC 28203 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Seitz
Administrator of the Estate of Lauren E. Seitz, Deceased 754 Old Coach Road
Westerville, OH 43081 |
Represented By
|
1. | Family of woman who died after contracting a brain-eating amoeba files lawsuit against park (cbsnews.com) |
Submitted Wed 06/21/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Mon 01/29 9:07 AM
Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in Western District of North Carolina as case 3:18-cv-00044, filed 01/26/2018. (sem) |
||
Friday, January 26, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
5
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 01/26 2:07 PM
OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part5 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting in part and denying in part6 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge James L. Graham on 1/26/2018. (ds) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District
Fri 01/26 3:00 PM
Case transferred to District of North Carolina Western. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (er) |
||
Friday, November 10, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 11/10 2:50 PM
NOTICE by Defendant U.S. National Whitewater Center, Inc. of Service of Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a) Initial Disclosures (Anspaugh, Donald) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 11/10 10:24 AM
NOTICE by Defendant Recreation Engineering And Planning, Inc. of Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosures (Barley-McBride, Mary) |
|
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order
Wed 10/11 8:57 AM
PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: This case is referred to the December, 2018 SETTLEMENT WEEK. Joinder of Parties due by 3/1/2018. Motions to Amend due by 3/1/2018. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 11/10/2017. Primary Expert due by 6/1/2018. Rebuttal Expert due by 8/15/2018. Discovery due by 10/15/2018. Dispositive motions due by 11/30/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 10/11/2017. (jlk) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Interim
Fri 10/13 6:54 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 10/10/2017. (sln) |
||
Friday, September 22, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Fri 09/22 1:24 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT OF PARTIES by Plaintiff James Seitz. (Lopez, Jose) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 09/20 4:44 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue to North Carolina Reply Memorandum in Support of Defendant U.S. National Whitewater Center, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue filed by Defendant U.S. National Whitewater Center, Inc.. (Cook, Dale) |
|
12 | 12
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Wed 09/20 4:03 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(2), or Alternatively, to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631 filed by Defendant Recreation Engineering And Planning, Inc.. (Barley-McBride, Mary) |
|
Wednesday, September 06, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 09/06 11:45 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue to North Carolina filed by Plaintiff James Seitz. (Lopez, Jose) |
|
10 | 10
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 09/06 11:33 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(2), or Alternatively, to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631 filed by Plaintiff James Seitz. (Lopez, Jose) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 09/05 4:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Lee Anspaugh for Defendant U.S. National Whitewater Center, Inc. (Anspaugh, Donald) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Hearing
Tue 09/05 9:38 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/10/2017 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 08/21 4:02 PM
NOTICE by Defendant Recreation Engineering And Planning, Inc. re6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(2), or Alternatively, to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631 Substitution of Exhibit A (Barley-McBride, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 08/18 4:21 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 12(b)(2), or Alternatively, to Transfer Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1631 by Defendant Recreation Engineering And Planning, Inc.. (Barley-McBride, Mary) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Thu 08/17 5:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue to North Carolina by Defendant U.S. National Whitewater Center, Inc.. (Cook, Dale) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Thu 08/17 4:38 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue to North Carolina by Defendant K&K Insurance Group, Inc.. (Cook, Dale) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/10 11:37 AM
NOTICE by Plaintiff James Seitz of Filing of Waivers of Service of Process (Zweizig, Jonathan) |
|
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 07/11 8:08 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Waiver sent to Recreation Engineering And Planning, Inc. & U.S. National Whitewater Center, Inc. on 6/19/2017, answer due 8/18/2017. For document see entry 3 . This entry was created for purpose of using the correct filing event and to obtain answer due date for both defendants. (er) |
||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/19 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Scott Zweizig for Plaintiff James Seitz (Zweizig, Jonathan) |
|
1 | 1
18
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Mon 06/19 11:45 AM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Recreation Engineering And Planning, Inc., U.S. National Whitewater Center, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6003481), filed by James Seitz. (Lopez, Jose) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |