GOLDEN GATE NATIONAL SENIOR CARE, LLC et al v. KILLIAN
Pennsylvania Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Jan E Dubois |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-02732 |
Nature of Suit | 896 Other Statutes - Arbitration |
Cause | 09:0010 Petition to Vacate Arbitration Award |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Apr 09, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 09, 2019 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2017 3:50 AM EST |
Defendant
LINDA KILLIAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GGNSC ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GGNSC CLINICAL SERVICES, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GGNSC EQUITY HOLDINGS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GGNSC HOLDINGS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GGNSC LANSDALE GP, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GGNSC LANSDALE, LP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GOLDEN GATE ANCILLARY, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GOLDEN GATE NATIONAL SENIOR CARE, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GPH LANSDALE GP, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
GPH LANSDALE LP
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Friday, April 12, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 04/15 11:57 AM
ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TRANSFER THE CASE FROM THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE TO THE COURTS ACTIVE DOCKET; AND, PURSUANT TO THE PROVISIONS OF RULE 41.1(B) OF THE LOCAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE OF THIS COURT, THE ABOVE ACTION IS DISMISSEDWITH PREJUDICE, BY AGREEMENT OF COUNSEL, WITHOUT COSTS. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 4/12/19. 4/15/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 04/09 5:02 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by GGNSC ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC, GGNSC CLINICAL SERVICES, LLC, GGNSC EQUITY HOLDINGS, LLC, GGNSC HOLDINGS, LLC, GGNSC LANSDALE GP, LLC, GGNSC LANSDALE, LP, GOLDEN GATE ANCILLARY, LLC, GOLDEN GATE NATIONAL SENIOR CARE, LLC, GPH LANSDALE GP, LLC, GPH LANSDALE LP. (REED, ERIC) |
|
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/08 11:03 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL R. KLAPROTH on behalf of LINDA KILLIAN with certificate of service(KLAPROTH, DANIEL) |
|
Wednesday, March 06, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Letter
Thu 03/07 10:55 AM
Letter dated 1/30/19 frin Eric Reed to Judge DuBois, re: Joint Status Update. (va, ) |
|
14 | 14
2
pgs
order
Order Staying Case Suspense Order Order Dismissing Case
Thu 03/07 10:15 AM
ORDER THAT ALL PROCEEDINGS IN THIS CASE ARE STAYED UNTIL FURTHER ORDER OF THE COURT; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL TRANSFER THE CASE TO THE CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE; THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL MARK THE CASE CLOSED FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES; THE COURT SHALL RETAIN JURISDICTION OVER THE CASE AND THE CASE SHALL BE RETURNED TO THE COURTS ACTIVE DOCKET WHEN THERE ARE NO IMPEDIMENTS TO FURTHER PROCEEDINGS AND THE CASE MAY PROCEED TO FINAL DISPOSITION; THE ENTRY OF THIS ORDER IS WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE RIGHTS OF ANY PARTY TO REQUEST THAT THE CASE BE RETURNED TO THE COURTS ACTIVE DOCKET; AND, THE PARTIES, THROUGH COUNSEL, SHALL FILE AND SERVE JOINT STATUS REPORTS AT FOUR (4) MONTH INTERVALS OR MORE FREQUENTLY IF WARRANTED BY THE CIRCUMSTANCES. ONE (1) COPY OF EACH JOINT STATUS REPORT SHALL BE SERVED ON THE COURT (CHAMBERS, ROOM 12613) WHEN THE ORIGINAL IS FILED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 3/6/19. 3/7/19 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) |
|
Monday, August 06, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
2
pgs
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion Order
Tue 08/07 10:39 AM
ORDER THAT PETITIONERS9 MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION IS GRANTED, AS FOLLOWS: RESPONDENT SHALL ARBITRATE THE CLAIMS THAT SHE FILED IN THE MONTGOMERY COUNTY COURT OF COMMON PLEAS, DOCKET NO. 2017-10000; THE COURT ENJOINS THE PARTIES FROM PROCEEDING FURTHER IN THE MONTGOMERY COUNTY CASE, OTHER THAN AS NECESSARY TO STAY THE CASE PENDING THE COMPLETION OF ARBITRATION. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE PART OF THE PETITION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION, STAYING IMPROPERLY COMMENCED STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS, AND GRANTING DECLARATORY RELIEF (DOCUMENT NO. 1, FILED JUNE 16, 2017) SEEKING A DECLARATORY JUDGMENT IS DENIED AS MOOT ON THE GROUNDS THAT PETITIONERS DO NOT ADDRESS DECLARATORY RELIEF IN THE MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND THE FACT THAT SUCH RELIEF IS REDUNDANT. THE COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION TO ENTER JUDGMENT ON ANY AWARD IN ARBITRATION AND CONDUCT ANY NECESSARY PROCEEDINGS RELATING TO THE ARBITRATION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 8/6/18. 8/7/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) |
|
12 | 12
13
pgs
order
Memorandum and/or Opinion
Tue 08/07 10:10 AM
MEMORANDUM SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 8/6/18. 8/7/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) |
|
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
respm
Response in Support of Motion
Fri 03/02 1:50 PM
RESPONSE in Support re9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by GGNSC ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC, GGNSC CLINICAL SERVICES, LLC, GGNSC EQUITY HOLDINGS, LLC, GGNSC HOLDINGS, LLC, GGNSC LANSDALE GP, LLC, GGNSC LANSDALE, LP, GOLDEN GATE ANCILLARY, LLC, GOLDEN GATE NATIONAL SENIOR CARE, LLC, GPH LANSDALE GP, LLC, GPH LANSDALE LP. (REED, ERIC) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Fri 02/02 6:32 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Respondent's Brief in Opposition to Petitionsers' Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by LINDA KILLIAN. (MCGRATH, DANIEL) |
|
Friday, January 19, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Compel
Fri 01/19 4:55 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by GGNSC ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC, GGNSC CLINICAL SERVICES, LLC, GGNSC EQUITY HOLDINGS, LLC, GGNSC HOLDINGS, LLC, GGNSC LANSDALE GP, LLC, GGNSC LANSDALE, LP, GOLDEN GATE ANCILLARY, LLC, GOLDEN GATE NATIONAL SENIOR CARE, LLC, GPH LANSDALE GP, LLC, GPH LANSDALE LP.Brief, Certificate of Service.(REED, ERIC) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Brief, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Statement of Material Facts, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A - Killian Deposition, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B - Morgan Deposition, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit C - Killian Admission Agreement, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit D - Killian Arbitration Agreement, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit E - Killian Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 9 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 12/05 5:12 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: PLAINTIFFS SHALL FILE A MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 19, 2018. DEFENDANT SHALL FILE AND SERVE A RESPONSE TO THE MOTION ON OR BEFORE FEBRUARY 18, 2018. PLAINTIFFS ARE GRANTED LEAVE TO FILE AND SERVE A REPLY ON OR BEFORE MARCH 2, 2018. TWO (2) COPIES OF EACH DOCUMENT SHALL BE SERVED ON THE COURT (CHAMBERS, ROOM 12613) WHEN THE ORIGINAL IS FILED; AND, ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 12, 2018, COUNSEL SHALL JOINTLY REPORT TO THE COURT (LETTER TO CHAMBERS, ROOM 12613) WITH RESPECT TO THE STATUS OF THE MONTGOMERY COUNTY CASE. ETC. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS ON 12/1/17. 12/5/17 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (va, ) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 11/29 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Hearing (TIME CHANGE): PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RESET FOR 12/1/2017 03:30 PM BEFORE HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS.(mvh, ) |
|
Att: 1 Conference Information Report.pdf, | ||
Att: 2 Scheduling & Discovery Policy-Counsel.pdf | ||
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Hearing
Fri 10/20 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 12/1/2017 04:45 PM BEFORE HONORABLE JAN E. DUBOIS.(mvh, ) |
|
Att: 1 Conference Information Report.pdf, | ||
Att: 2 Scheduling & Discovery Policy-Counsel.pdf | ||
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 09/19 2:15 PM
ANSWER to Complaint together with Affirmative Defenses to Petitioners' Petition for Order Compelling Arbitration, Staying Imporperly Commenced State Court Proceeding and Granting Declaratory Relief by LINDA KILLIAN.(MCGRATH, DANIEL) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit a, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit b | ||
Saturday, September 09, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Acceptance of Service
Sat 09/09 1:18 PM
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Respondent's counsel as of 8/30/17 (REED, ERIC) |
|
Tuesday, August 29, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/29 11:13 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC E. REED on behalf of GGNSC ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC, GGNSC CLINICAL SERVICES, LLC, GGNSC EQUITY HOLDINGS, LLC, GGNSC HOLDINGS, LLC, GGNSC LANSDALE GP, LLC, GGNSC LANSDALE, LP, GOLDEN GATE ANCILLARY, LLC, GOLDEN GATE NATIONAL SENIOR CARE, LLC, GPH LANSDALE GP, LLC, GPH LANSDALE LP with Certificate of Service(REED, ERIC) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
discov
Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 (COURT ONLY)
Thu 06/22 11:38 AM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 by GGNSC ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC, GGNSC CLINICAL SERVICES, LLC, GGNSC EQUITY HOLDINGS, LLC, GGNSC HOLDINGS, LLC, GGNSC LANSDALE GP, LLC, GGNSC LANSDALE, LP, GOLDEN GATE ANCILLARY, LLC, GOLDEN GATE NATIONAL SENIOR CARE, LLC, GPH LANSDALE GP, LLC, GPH LANSDALE LP.(rt) |
|
1 | 1
misc
Application/Petition
Mon 06/19 12:35 PM
PETITION FOR ORDER COMPELLING ARBITRATION, STAYING IMPROPERLY COMMENCED STATE COURT PROCEEDINGS, AND GRANTING DECLARATORY RELIEF by GGNSC ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, LLC, GGNSC CLINICAL SERVICES, LLC, GGNSC EQUITY HOLDINGS, LLC, GGNSC HOLDINGS, LLC, GGNSC LANSDALE GP, LLC, GGNSC LANSDALE, LP, GOLDEN GATE ANCILLARY, LLC, GOLDEN GATE NATIONAL SENIOR CARE, LLC, GPH LANSDALE GP, LLC, GPH LANSDALE LP.(rt) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit |