De-Leon-Quinones v. USA
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Jay A Garcia-Gregory |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01822 |
Nature of Suit | 510 Prisoner Petitions - Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause | 28:2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 25, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 21, 2020 | ||
8 | 8
order
Judgment
Tue 01/21 12:39 PM
JUDGMENT dismissing with prejudice Petitioner's case. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/21/2020. (MQ) |
|
7 | 7
order
Order
Tue 01/21 12:37 PM
ORDER. It is ordered that no certificate of appealability should be issued in the event that Petitioner files a notice of appeal, because there is no substantial showing of a denial of a constitutional right under 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c)(2). Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/21/2020. (MQ) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order
Tue 01/21 12:36 PM
ORDER denying1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) (Criminal Number 06-CR-125 (JAG)). While the Supreme Court recently held that § 924(c)(3)(B) is indeed unconstitutionally vague, United States v. Davis , 139 S.Ct. 2319, 2336 (2019); the First Circuit has ruled that federal bank robbery is a "crime[] of violence under the force clause of § 924(c)(3)," Hunter v. United States , 873 F.3d 388, 390 (1st Cir. 2017). Thus, Petitioner's offense of conviction still qualifies as a crime of violence under § 924(c)(3)'s force clause. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/21/2020. (MQ) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order Order Lifting Stay
Tue 01/21 12:33 PM
ORDER vacating and setting aside4 Judgment; Order Lifting Stay, Docket No. 4. The case shall be reopened. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/21/2020. (MQ) |
|
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judgment
Wed 10/25 6:18 PM
JUDGMENT staying case. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/25/2017. (MQ) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order on Motion requesting Order
Wed 10/25 6:16 PM
ORDER denying2 Motion requesting Order. This case is hereby STAYED pending resolution of Sessions v. Dimaya , 137 S. Ct. 31 (2016), which may affect the case law applicable to this case. This case will remain administratively closed and shall be reopened upon motion. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/25/2017. (MQ) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Requesting Order
Wed 07/05 5:00 PM
MOTION requesting Order to Adjudicate Petitioner's Motion to Vacate Judgment under 2255 Johnson v. United States as Unopposed filed by Marie L. Cortes-Cortes on behalf of Andres De-Leon-Quinones Responses due by 7/19/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Cortes-Cortes, Marie) |
|
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
motion
Motion to Vacate/Set Aside/Correct Sentence (2255)
Mon 06/19 11:00 AM
MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence (2255) Pursuant to JOHNSON vs. USA (Criminal Number 06-CR-125 (JAG)) filed by Marie L. Cortes-Cortes on behalf of Andres De-Leon-Quinones. Responses due by 6/30/2017. (su) |