Kramer v. Crawford
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles A Shaw |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-01756 |
Nature of Suit | 530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General |
Cause | 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 21, 2017 |
Petitioner
Mark E. Kramer
|
|
Respondent
Larry Crawford
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case)
Thu 09/21 2:20 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - In accordance with the Memorandum and Order entered herewith, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will not issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 9/21/2017. (MRC) |
|
6 | 6
2
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Thu 09/21 2:16 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED without prejudice. A separate order of dismissal will be entered herewith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will not issue a certificate of appealability. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 9/21/2017. (MRC) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Thu 09/21 2:21 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 6,7. Copies mailed to parties not electronically notified - Petitioner Mark E. Kramer Thu Sep 21 14:21:40 CDT 2017 (Crayton, Michele) |
||
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
3
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 08/25 10:40 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner shall show cause, in writing and within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order, why the petition should not be dismissed, without prejudice. If petitioner fails to timely comply with this Order, the petition shall be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. Show Cause Response due by 9/15/2017. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 8/25/17. (JWD) |
|
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Fri 08/25 10:31 AM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED . [Doc.2 ] Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 8/25/17. (JWD) |
|
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 08/25 10:32 AM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4. Mailed to petitioner Mark Kramer. Fri Aug 25 10:32:49 CDT 2017 (Dockery, Jason) |
||
misc
Order Receipt
Fri 08/25 10:41 AM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5. Mailed to petitioner Mark Kramer. Fri Aug 25 10:41:05 CDT 2017 (Dockery, Jason) |
||
Monday, July 03, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Thu 07/06 2:12 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address (For the 120 treatment) with copy of St. Charles County, State of Missouri criminal Judgment attached by Petitioner Mark E. Kramer. [Clerk's Note: Plantiff Mark E. Kramer has submitted this change of address notice on the Clerk of Court's 6/19/2017 Complaint Letter Created that was previously mailed to plaintiff] (The address has been updated to FRDC.)(MRC) Modified on 7/6/2017 (LMR) |
|
Att: 1 Mailing envelope | ||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
misc
Complaint Letter Created (Case Opening Event ONLY)
Mon 06/19 3:33 PM
***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DJO) |
||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Mon 06/19 3:34 PM
Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Charles A. Shaw. (DJO) |
||
misc
Complaint Letter Processed (Case Opening Event ONLY)
Mon 06/19 4:01 PM
***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Mon Jun 19 16:01:33 CDT 2017 (admin,) |
||
Friday, June 16, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Mon 06/19 3:32 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Mark E. Kramer. (DJO) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus
Mon 06/19 3:31 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Mark E. Kramer.(DJO) |
|
Att: 1 Judge Assignment Label, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope |