Mandel et al v. Board of Trustees of the California State University et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William H Orrick |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-03511 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Oct 29, 2018 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 16, 2017 12:58 AM PST |
Amicus
Amici Curiae: Jewish Studies Scholars
1611 Telegraph Ave. Suite 1020
Oakland, CA 94612 |
Represented By
|
Amicus
Amici Curiae Jewish Studies Scholars
Jewish Voice for Peace 1611 Telegraph Ave. Suite 1020 Sacramento
Oakland, CA 94612 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert Nava
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Leslie E. Wong
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Board of Trustees of the California State University
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brian Stuart
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
San Francisco State University
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Vernon Piccinotti
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Reginald Parson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kenneth Monteiro
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark Jaramilla
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Luoluo Hong
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Shimina Harris
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Osvaldo Del Valle
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lawrence Birello
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mary Ann Begley
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rabab Abdulhadi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Masha Merkulova
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jacob Mandel
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Liam Kern
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephanie Rosekind
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Volk
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Plaintiff
Aaron Parker
Terminated: 11/08/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
182 | 182
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Sanctions
Tue 05/28 2:07 PM
Order by Judge William H. Orrick DENYING 176 Motion for Sanctions. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, May 22, 2019 | ||
181 | 181
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice ~Util - Set Motion and Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 05/22 11:11 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Pursuant to Civil L.R.7-1(b), the176 Motion for Sanctions has been identified by the Court as a motion appropriate for disposition without hearing. The motion is taken under submission; and the hearing set for 5/29/2019 is VACATED. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jmdS, COURT STAFF) |