CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY v. U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Beryl A Howell |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01208 |
Nature of Suit | 895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act |
Cause | 05:552 Freedom of Information Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 17, 2017 4:46 AM EST |
Defendant
U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, June 24, 2021 | ||
order
.Order
Thu 06/24 4:39 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DISMISSING this matter, with prejudice, in light of the parties' joint45 Stipulation of Dismissal. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 24, 2021. (lcbah3) |
||
Wednesday, June 23, 2021 | ||
45 | 45
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 06/23 5:41 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Valdez, Darrell) |
|
Thursday, April 22, 2021 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 04/22 8:39 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/23/2021. (ztg) |
||
Wednesday, April 21, 2021 | ||
44 | 44
misc
Status Report
Wed 04/21 11:47 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Valdez, Darrell) |
|
order
.Order
Wed 04/21 4:21 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, in light of the parties'44 Joint Status Report, the parties to submit, by June 23, 2021, a joint status report advising whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 21, 2021. (lcbah3) |
||
Tuesday, March 09, 2021 | ||
43 | 43
35
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Tue 03/09 9:05 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION regarding the defendant U.S. Department of the Interior's29 Motion for Summary Judgment and the plaintiff's30 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 9, 2021. (lcbah3) |
|
42 | 42
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Tue 03/09 9:02 PM
ORDER DENYING the defendant U.S. Department of the Interior's29 Motion for Summary Judgment and DENYING the plaintiff's30 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. See Order for further details. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 9, 2021. (lcbah3) |
|
Wednesday, March 03, 2021 | ||
41 | 41
motion
Dismiss
Wed 03/03 12:42 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss and Joint Stipulation by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY.(Snape, William) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Wed 03/03 6:19 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the parties'41 Joint Motion of Dismissal, DISMISSING with prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), Counts I-VI of plaintiff's6 Amended Complaint against defendant Bureau of Land Management and Counts I, V, and VI of the Amended Complaint against defendant U.S. Department of the Interior, and VACATING the deadline for the submission of plaintiff's response to the Order to Show Cause, see Min. Order (Mar. 1, 2021), originally set for noon on March 4, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 3, 2021. (lcbah3) |
||
Monday, March 01, 2021 | ||
order
.Order
Mon 03/01 4:38 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE by noon on March 4, 2021, why Counts I-VI of the6 Amended Complaint against defendant Bureau of Land Management ("BLM") and Counts I, V, and VI against defendant U.S. Department of the Interior ("DOI"), which claims have been not been briefed by the parties in their pending29 30 cross-motions for summary judgment, should not be summarily dismissed, particularly given the representations in plaintiff's39 Supplemental Memorandum of Law and Facts that "[p]laintiff possesses no further claims against" BLM and that "[p]laintiffs remaining claims are against co-defendant [DOI] on Counts II, III, and IV of its Amended Complaint," id. at 1. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 1, 2021. (lcbah3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 03/01 4:50 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Response to Show Cause due by noon on 3/4/2021. (ztg) |
||
Monday, February 22, 2021 | ||
40 | 40
respm
Response to Order of the Court
Mon 02/22 5:13 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order,, for Supplemental Briefing filed by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Valdez, Darrell) |
|
Tuesday, February 16, 2021 | ||
39 | 39
11
pgs
misc
Memorandum
Tue 02/16 9:59 PM
MEMORANDUM by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Snape, William) |
|
Thursday, February 11, 2021 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 02/11 3:15 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's supplemental briefing due by 2/16/2021; defendant's response due by 2/23/2021. (ztg) |
||
Tuesday, February 09, 2021 | ||
order
.Order
Tue 02/09 5:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties'29 30 cross-motions for summary judgment, which raise no disputed issue as to whether defendant U.S. Bureau of Land Management ("BLM") is entitled to summary judgment on Counts I-VI of the7 Amended Complaint and whether defendant U.S. Department of Interior ("DOI") is entitled to summary judgment on Counts I, II, IV, V, and VI of the7 Amended Complaint, that plaintiff submit, by February 16, 2021, supplemental briefing as to why summary judgment should be denied to BLM and DOI on those counts, with any response by defendants due by February 23, 2021. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 9, 2021. (lcbah3) |
||
Thursday, January 21, 2021 | ||
38 | 38
notice
Notice of Supplemental Authority
Thu 01/21 3:18 PM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY(Snape, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Seventeen - Pence Transition Memo | ||
Friday, January 15, 2021 | ||
37 | 37
respm
Surreply
Fri 01/15 3:02 PM
SURREPLY to re29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (eg) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Fri 01/15 10:24 AM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING defendants'36 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply and DIRECTING the Clerk to docket defendants' Sur-Reply, attached as Exhibit 2 to defendants' motion. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 15, 2021. (lcbah3) |
||
Thursday, January 14, 2021 | ||
36 | 36
motion
Leave to File Document
Thu 01/14 12:44 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply by U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR(Valdez, Darrell) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Sur-Reply | ||
Tuesday, January 05, 2021 | ||
35 | 35
respm
Surreply
Tue 01/05 2:10 PM
SURREPLY to re30 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment And Reply in Opposition to Defendants' Motion filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY.(Snape, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 13, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 14, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 15, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 16 | ||
34 | 34
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Tue 01/05 1:58 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re29 MOTION for Summary Judgment And Surreply in Support of Its Motion for Partial S.J. filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY.(Snape, William) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Thirteen, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Fourteen, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Fifteen, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Sixteen | ||
Friday, December 11, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Fri 12/11 1:06 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Valdez, Darrell) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Myrick, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Myrick Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C | ||
32 | 32
9
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Fri 12/11 12:59 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re30 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR.(Valdez, Darrell) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of Facts, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Myrick, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Myrick Decl. Exhibit, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, November 25, 2020 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Wed 12/02 10:15 AM
Memorandum in opposition to re29 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (See Docket Entry30 to view document). (znmw) |
|
30 | 30
motion
Summary Judgment
Wed 11/25 9:34 AM
Partial MOTION for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Defendants' Motion by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY(Snape, William) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support and In Opposition to Defendants' Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Statement of Facts and Reply to Defendants' Statement of Facts, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration William Snape, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration Amy Atwood, | ||
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit One, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Two, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Three, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Four, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Five, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Six, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Seven, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Eight, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit Nine, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit Ten, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit Eleven, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Twelve | ||
Monday, October 26, 2020 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 10/26 3:48 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR(Valdez, Darrell) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of Facts, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Fairman, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration Alspach, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, September 15, 2020 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 09/15 8:51 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Vaughn Index due by 10/26/2020; Summary Judgment motion due by 10/26/2020; cross-motion and opposition to motion for summary judgment due by 11/25/2020; opposition to cross-motion and reply to opposition to motion for summary judgment due by 12/11/2020; reply to opposition to cross-motion due by 1/5/2021. (ztg) |
||
Monday, September 14, 2020 | ||
order
.Order
Mon 09/14 6:09 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ISSUING, upon consideration of the parties'28 Joint Status Report, the following Scheduling Order to govern the timing of further proceedings in this matter: (1) by October 26, 2020, defendants shall file any motion for summary judgment and Vaughn index; (2) by November 25, 2020, plaintiff shall file any opposition and any cross-motion for summary judgment; (3) by December 11, 2020, defendants shall file any reply and cross-opposition; and (4) by January 5, 2021, plaintiff shall file any cross-reply. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 14, 2020. (lcbah3) |
||
Friday, September 11, 2020 | ||
28 | 28
misc
Status Report
Fri 09/11 7:30 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Valdez, Darrell) |
|
Monday, August 10, 2020 | ||
27 | 27
misc
Status Report
Mon 08/10 11:13 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Snape, William) |
|
order
.Order
Mon 08/10 4:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties'27 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by September 11, 2020, a joint status report advising whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 10, 2020. (lcbah3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 08/10 5:42 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/11/2020. (hmc) |
||
Wednesday, June 10, 2020 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 06/10 7:26 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/10/2020. (ztg) |
||
Tuesday, June 09, 2020 | ||
order
.Order
Tue 06/09 4:37 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties'26 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by August 10, 2020, a joint status report advising whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 9, 2020. (lcbah3) |
||
Monday, June 08, 2020 | ||
26 | 26
misc
Status Report
Mon 06/08 3:13 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Valdez, Darrell) |
|
Monday, March 02, 2020 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Status Report
Mon 03/02 12:17 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Valdez, Darrell) |
|
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Mon 03/02 12:16 PM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Darrell C. Valdez on behalf of U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR Substituting for attorney Scott Leeson Sroka (Valdez, Darrell) |
|
order
.Order
Mon 03/02 3:55 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties'25 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by June 8, 2020, a joint status report advising whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 2, 2020. (lcbah3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 03/02 4:08 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/8/2020. (tg) |
||
Monday, January 06, 2020 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Status Report
Mon 01/06 11:05 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) |
|
order
.Order
Mon 01/06 3:54 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties'23 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by March 2, 2020, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 6, 2020. (lcbah3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 01/06 4:15 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/2/2020. (tg) |
||
Tuesday, December 03, 2019 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 12/03 11:12 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/6/2020. (tg) |
||
Monday, December 02, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Status Report
Mon 12/02 2:37 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) |
|
order
.Order
Mon 12/02 5:08 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties'22 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by January 6, 2020, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on December 2, 2019. (lcbah3) |
||
Monday, November 04, 2019 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 11/04 10:38 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/2/2019. (tg) |
||
Friday, November 01, 2019 | ||
order
.Order
Fri 11/01 7:36 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties'21 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by December 2, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 1, 2019. (lcbah3) |
||
Thursday, October 31, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Status Report
Thu 10/31 11:58 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, October 01, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Status Report
Tue 10/01 1:27 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) |
|
order
.Order
Tue 10/01 4:38 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties'20 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by November 1, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on October 1, 2019. (lcbah3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 10/01 4:41 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/1/2019. (hmc) |
||
Wednesday, August 28, 2019 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 08/28 10:29 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 10/1/2019. (hmc) |
||
Tuesday, August 27, 2019 | ||
order
.Order
Tue 08/27 4:55 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties'19 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by October 1, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 27, 2019. (lcbah3) |
||
Monday, August 26, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Status Report
Mon 08/26 1:15 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Delay by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Snape, William) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
order
.Order
Wed 07/31 10:46 AM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties'18 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by August 26, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 31, 2019. (lcbah3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 07/31 10:52 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/26/2019. (tg) |
||
Tuesday, July 30, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Status Report
Tue 07/30 2:31 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) |
|
Tuesday, April 09, 2019 | ||
order
.Order
Tue 04/09 2:41 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties'17 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by August 1, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties, and if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on April 9, 2019. (lcbah3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 04/09 3:29 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/1/2019. (tg) |
||
Monday, April 08, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Status Report
Mon 04/08 12:14 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 03/01 9:00 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 4/8/2019. (tg) |
||
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Status Report
Thu 02/28 4:32 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) |
|
order
.Order
Thu 02/28 5:05 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties'16 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by April 8, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on February 28, 2019. (lcbah3) |
||
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Status Report
Tue 01/29 12:45 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) |
|
order
.Order
Tue 01/29 3:38 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties'15 Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by March 1, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 29, 2019. (lcbah3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 01/29 3:45 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/1/2019. (tg) |
||
Monday, January 07, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Mon 01/07 3:31 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) EXTENDING, upon consideration of the defendants'14 Motion for a Stay and Extension of Time in Light of Lapse of Appropriations, the deadline for the parties to file a joint status report set forth in the Court's November 13, 2018 Minute Order, and ORDERING the parties to file, within two business days of Congress appropriating funds for the defendants, a joint status report proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on January 7, 2019. (lcbah3) |
||
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Stay Extension of Time to
Fri 01/04 8:08 PM
MOTION to Stay , MOTION for Extension of Time to in Light of Lapse of Appropriations by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT(Hudak, Brian) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
order
.Order
Tue 11/13 9:22 AM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, upon consideration of the parties'13 Fifth Joint Status Report, the parties to file, by January 9, 2019, a joint status report advising the Court whether any disputes remain between the parties and, if so, a proposed schedule to govern further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 13, 2018. (lcbah3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 11/13 9:28 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 1/9/2019. (tg) |
||
Friday, November 09, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Status Report
Fri 11/09 3:26 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) |
|
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
order
.Order
Thu 08/16 11:56 AM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, in light of the parties'12 Joint Status Report, that the parties meet and confer following the Defendants' final production of records, and file, by November 9, 2018, a joint status report informing the Court whether any issues remain between the parties, and, if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on August 16, 2018. (lcbah3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 08/16 12:01 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 11/9/2018. (tg) |
||
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Status Report
Wed 08/15 2:29 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) |
|
Friday, March 16, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Status Report
Fri 03/16 9:42 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. (Sroka, Scott) |
|
order
.Order
Fri 03/16 3:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) DIRECTING, in light of the parties'11 Joint Status Report, that the parties meet and confer following the defendants' final production of records, and file, by August 17, 2018, a joint status report informing the Court whether any issues remain between the parties, and, if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on March 16, 2018. (lcbah3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 03/16 4:07 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 8/17/2018. (tg) |
||
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Meet and Confer Statement
Thu 11/30 11:58 AM
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Snape, William) |
|
order
.Order
Thu 11/30 2:34 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ORDERING, in light of the parties'10 Meet and Confer Statement, that the parties file, by March 16, 2018, a joint status report informing the Court whether any issues remain between the parties, and, if so, proposing a schedule to govern further proceedings in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on November 30, 2017. (lcbah3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 11/30 2:42 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 3/16/2018. (tg) |
||
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 09/11 9:45 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Meet & Confer Statement due by 11/30/2017. (tg) |
||
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
order
.Order
Fri 09/08 5:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) ORDERING, in light of the parties'9 Joint Status Report, that the parties file a Joint Meet and Confer Report by November 30, 2017. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on September 8, 2017. (lcbah3) |
||
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Meet and Confer Statement
Thu 09/07 5:38 PM
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Snape, William) |
|
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Fri 08/25 8:32 AM
ANSWER to6 Amended Complaint by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR. Related document:6 Amended Complaint filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY.(Sroka, Scott) |
|
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Mon 07/31 10:45 AM
MINUTE ORDER (paperless) GRANTING the defendants' unopposed 8 Motion for Extension of Time. Accordingly, the defendants shall, by August 25, 2017, file an answer or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's6 Amended Complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on July 31, 2017. (lcbah3) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 07/31 5:09 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer to the Amended Complaint due by 8/25/2017. (tg) |
||
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 07/28 10:06 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re6 Amended Complaint by U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Sroka, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Amended Complaint
Wed 07/26 8:55 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY.(Snape, William) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 07/11 6:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Leeson Sroka on behalf of U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT (Sroka, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 06/21 5:45 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY. (Snape, William) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Standing Order
Tue 06/20 2:48 PM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell on June 20, 2017. (lcbah3) |
|
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Tue 06/20 11:14 AM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Consent Form)(zsb) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/20 2:07 AM
COMPLAINT against U.S. BUREAU OF LAND MANAGEMENT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4997733) filed by CENTER FOR BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY.(Atwood, Amy) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Tue 06/20 11:11 AM
Case Assigned to Chief Judge Beryl A. Howell. (zsb) |