FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION et al v. DRAFTKINGS, INC. et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Ketanji Brown Jackson |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01195 |
Nature of Suit | 410 Other Statutes - Antitrust |
Cause | 15:1 Antitrust Litigation |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 14, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 16, 2017 3:50 AM EST |
Defendant
DRAFTKINGS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FANDUEL LIMITED
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STATE OF CALIFORNIA
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
51 | 51
misc
Transcript
Mon 07/17 8:42 AM
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson held on July 7, 2017; Page Numbers: 1-79. Date of Issuance:July 17, 2017. Court Reporter/Transcriber Janice Dickman, Telephone number 202-354-3267, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter refe renced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/7/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/17/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/15/2017.(Dickman, Janice) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
50 | 50
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 07/13 4:55 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.(Dillickrath, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
49 | 49
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/12 5:34 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Elisa F. Kantor on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION(Kantor, Elisa) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
48 | 48
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/12 3:00 PM
ANSWER to3 Complaint by FANDUEL LIMITED.(Ferris, Jamillia) |
|
47 | 47
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/12 1:51 PM
ANSWER to3 Complaint by DRAFTKINGS, INC..(Park, Chong) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 07/12 11:05 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 7/12/2017. Fact discovery due by 8/16/2017. (zgdf) |
||
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
46 | 46
order
Order on Motion for Scheduling Order
Mon 07/10 1:42 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. See attached document for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on July 10, 2017. (lckbj2) |
|
45 | 45
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 07/10 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Guia Dixon on behalf of FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION(Dixon, Guia) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
44 | 44
notice
Notice of Filing Redacted Document
Mon 07/10 10:20 AM
NOTICE OF FILING REDACTED DOCUMENT to3 Complaint by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (The original PDF Document contained privacy information and was restricted pursuant to the E-Government Act.)(Quillian, Ryan) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Public Version of Complaint for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction Pursuant to Section 13(b) of the Federal Trade Commission Act | ||
43 | 43
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 07/10 9:56 AM
NOTICE of Filing Joint Proposed Schedule by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION re38 MOTION for Scheduling Order(Dillickrath, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Parties' Joint Proposed Schedule | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Mon 07/10 4:51 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Pre-Hearing conference set for 9/15/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 9/18/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 17 before Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (tj) |