SCHERTZMAN COHEN et al v. ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | James E Boasberg |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01214 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1605A Foreign Sovereign Immunities Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 11, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 17, 2017 3:47 AM EST |
Defendant
ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN
|
|
Defendant
ISLAMIC REVOLUTIONARY GUARD CORPS
|
|
Plaintiff
MYRIAM MILLER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
TOVA MILLER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHANA AIDEL MILLER SCHERTZMAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ABRAHAM SCHERTZMAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DANIEL SCHERTZMAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
DONALD SCHERTZMAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
LESLIE SCHERTZMAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
YEHUDA SCHERTZMAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ILANA SCHERTZMAN COHEN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
ARIELLA SCHERTZMAN FISHER
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jul 11 2019
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 41 Order on Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/11/2019. (lcjeb1) |
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 08, 2022 | ||
59 | 59
service
Affidavit of Service by DOS on Foreign State/Agency
Thu 08/11 12:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service by the U.S. Department of State upon ISLAMIC REPUBLIC OF IRAN re41 Order,42 Memorandum & Opinion (Originals returned to counsel). (ztth) |