FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION v. HUMANA, INC.
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Ellen S Huvelle |
Case #: | 1:17-mc-01465 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | Motion to Enforce Subpoena |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 30, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 06/30 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION (Kappler, Burke) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Wed 06/21 1:48 PM
ORDER granting3 Motion to Continue. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 06/21/2017. (lcgmh2) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Continue
Wed 06/21 12:48 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION(Kappler, Burke) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 06/21 2:12 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 7/10/2017 (lcgmh2) |
||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 06/20 12:17 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 06/20/2017. (lcgmh2) |
|
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 06/20 10:42 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey: Status Conference held on 6/20/2017. Order to be filed by the Court. Further Status Conference set for 6/22/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. Court Reporter FTR - Gold; FTR Time Frame: Ctrm 6 [9:34:03 - 9:53:00]; Plaintiff Attorney: Burke W. Kappler and Leslie Melman; Defense Attorney: Richard W. Smith and Kathryn C. Campbell. (cal) |
||
order
.Order
Tue 06/20 10:43 AM
MINUTE ORDER REFERRING CASE for Determination: Pursuant to Local Civil Rules 72.1(b)(7) and 72.2(a), it is hereby ORDERED that this matter is referred to United States Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey for determination. On any filing related to this matter, the parties shall place the initials of Judge Ellen Segal Huvelle and the initials of Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey following the case number in the caption. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on June 20, 2017. (lcesh2) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 06/20 12:21 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response in Opposition to Emergency Petition due on or before 12:00 PM on June 21, 2017. Petitioner's Reply due on or before 11:59 PM on June 21, 2017. Show Cause Hearing set for June 22, 2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6 before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. (lcgmh2) |
||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Motion to Compel
Tue 06/20 10:28 AM
Emergency Petition for an Order Enforcing Subpoena Duces Tecum Issued in a Merger Investigation (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by FEDERAL TRADE COMMISSION.(jf) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 7 Text of Proposed Order E |