Winfrey v. Department of Homeless Services
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Lashann Dearcy Hall |
Referred: | James Orenstein |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03705 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 16, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 18, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 13, 2017 4:15 AM EST |
Defendant
Department of Homeless Services
|
|
Plaintiff
Eugene Winfrey
247 49th Street Room 214
Brooklyn, NY 11220 |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, January 02, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 01/05 9:41 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Eugene Winfrey 247 49th Street Room 214 Brooklyn, NY 11220. (Room No. is wrong, as per Complaint2 the room no. is 413) Copies resent to pro se party. Docket Sheet updated. (Almonte, Giselle) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Mail Returned
Fri 01/05 9:35 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Eugene Winfrey 247 49th Street Room 214 Brooklyn, NY 11220. (Room No. is wrong, as per Complaint2 the room no. is 413) Copies resent to pro se party. Docket Sheet updated. (Almonte, Giselle) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Judgment - Clerk
Mon 12/18 3:40 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT that the complaint is dismissed without prejudice; that Plaintiffs request to proceed in forma pauperis for the limited purpose of this order is granted; that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) an appeal would not be taken in good faith; and that in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Signed Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on 12/18/2017. (c/m with appeals packet to pro se plaintiff as address listed on docket) (Lee, Tiffeny) |
|
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order(Other)
Fri 12/15 12:14 PM
ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached Order, Plaintiff's complaint, filed in forma pauperis, is dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction, Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(h)(3), or in the alternative, for failure to state a claim. 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). Plaintiff may pursue his state law claims in the appropriate state court; he may also contact his local police precinct for information on how to file a criminal complaint. Further, the Court grants Plaintiff's request to proceed in forma pauperis for the limited purpose of this order; however, the Court certifies pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that an appeal would not be taken in good faith and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment and close this case. Ordered by Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall on 12/15/2017. (Garrett, Ruby) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Tue 06/20 9:30 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
4 | 4
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 06/20 9:28 AM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:17-cv-03458. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Monday, June 12, 2017 | ||
Mailed a copy of3 Order to Eugene Winfrey, 247 49th Street, Room 413, Brooklyn, NY 11220. (rro) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/20/2017.] | ||
Friday, June 09, 2017 | ||
3 | 3 TRANSFER ORDER: The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of New York. The Clerk of Court is further directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, and note service on the docket. Whether Plaintiff should be permitted to proceed further without prepayment of fees is a determination to be made by the transferee court. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this case. The Court certifies, under 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/9/2017) (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/20/2017.] | |
NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/20/2017.] | ||
Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk. Transmitted re:3 Order, to the Docket Assistant Clerk for case processing. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/20/2017.] | ||
CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - Eastern District of New York. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/20/2017.] | ||
Tuesday, May 09, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 COMPLAINT against Department of Homeless Services. Document filed by Eugene Winfrey.(sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/20/2017.] | |
1 | 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Eugene Winfrey.(sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/20/2017.] | |
Case Designated ECF. (sac) [Transferred from New York Southern on 6/20/2017.] | ||
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis see document 1 by Eugene Winfrey. (Davis, Kimberly) |