Alloway et al v. US Coachways, Inc. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Ramon E Reyes, Jr |
Referred: | Ramon E Reyes, Jr |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03720 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Feb 20, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 17, 2017 3:43 AM EST |
Defendant
Edward Telmany
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark Telmany
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
US Coachways, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sonny Alloway
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juanita Figueroa
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, February 20, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Settlement ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Tue 02/20 4:22 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Settlement. The Court has reviewed the settlement agreement in accordance with Cheeks v. Freeport Pancake House, Inc., 796 F.3d 199, 206 (2d Cir. 2015) and finds its terms to be fair and reasonable. Accordingly, the Court approves the parties' FLSA settlement and directs Chambers staff to close this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 2/20/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Friday, February 16, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Settlement
Fri 02/16 3:47 PM
First MOTION for Settlement Approval by Sonny Alloway, Juanita Figueroa. (Harrison, David) |
|
Monday, January 29, 2018 | ||
order
1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings
Mon 01/29 9:33 AM
Terminated Scheduling Order: The 1/26/2018, 4/17/2018 and 6/18/2018 conferences and discovery deadlines previously scheduled before Magistrate Judge Reyes are cancelled. Parties' Motion for Settlement approval and Stipulation of Dismissal are due on 2/16/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 1/29/2018. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Thu 01/18 2:38 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Raymond J. Dearie no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
utility
Case No Longer Referred
Thu 01/18 2:37 PM
Case no longer referred to Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
||
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Tue 01/16 5:12 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Reyes. (Consent form forwarded to Judge Dearie for approval on 1/16/2018). (Vertus, Miriam) |
|
minutes
Settlement Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 01/16 5:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr:Settlement Conference held on 1/16/2018. Counsel and clients present. Settlement discussions held. Case settled off the record. The parties consent to Magistrate Judge Reyes' jurisdiction for all purposes. Parties' Motion for Settlement approval and Stipulation of Dismissal is due on or before 2/16/2018. (FTR Log #not recorded.) (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Friday, December 15, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 12/15 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Michael Bonomo on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Bonomo, Joseph) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Adjourn Conference
Fri 12/08 4:35 PM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by US Coachways, Inc.. (Bauman, Michael) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Fri 12/08 4:57 PM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Adjourn Conference. The parties are directed to fax (718) 613-2125 their ex-parte confidential settlement letters on 1/11/2018. Settlement Conference is rescheduled to 1/16/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 12/8/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Tuesday, December 05, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Hearing
Tue 12/05 4:22 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Hearing Settlement Conference set for 12/12/2017 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr. Parties with full settlement authority must be present at the conference. The parties are directed to fax ex-parte confidential settlement letters by 12/11/2017 to chambers at (718)613-2125. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 12/5/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Monday, December 04, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Letter
Mon 12/04 7:56 PM
Letter re by US Coachways, Inc. (Bauman, Michael) |
|
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Amend/Correct/Supplement
Thu 11/16 12:17 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct/Supplement Order, by Edward Telmany, Mark Telmany, US Coachways, Inc.. (Bauman, Michael) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement
Thu 11/16 1:22 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Amend/Correct/Supplement Order dated 11/15/2017 Plaintiffs motion for conditional certification is due 12/15/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 11/16/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 11/15 4:51 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr:Initial Conference Hearing held on 11/15/2017. Case called. Appearance and discussions held on the record. The parties' CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT15 is adopted by the Court. (See attached for details). All discovery, including depositions of experts, shall be completed on or before 6/15/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., Status Conference set for 4/17/2018 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr., Telephone Conference set for 1/26/2018 at 11:00 AM, call to be initiated by plaintiff's counsel. (FTR Log #3:13:05-3:32:22.) (Vertus, Miriam) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Wed 11/15 4:54 PM
ORDER: Plaintiff's counsel shall produce the phone records to defendants' counsel by 12/1/2017; Plaintiff's motion is due by 11/30/2017 ; Defendants' opposition to the motion is due by 1/12/2018; Replies, if any are due 1/19/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 11/15/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference ~Util - Set Hearings
Fri 10/20 9:28 AM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Initial Conference set for 11/15/2017 will commence at 3:15 PM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 10/20/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Adjourn Conference
Thu 10/19 4:49 PM
Second MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Edward Telmany, Mark Telmany, US Coachways, Inc.. (Bauman, Michael) |
|
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Case Management Statement
Mon 10/16 12:30 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Harrison, David) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 10/05 11:09 AM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Adjourn Conference. Initial Conference is adjourned to 11/15/2017 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Case Management Statement12 is due by 11/10/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 10/5/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Wednesday, October 04, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Adjourn Conference
Wed 10/04 4:57 PM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by US Coachways, Inc.. (Bauman, Michael) |
|
utility
Incorrect Case-Document Information
Wed 10/04 4:59 PM
Incorrect Case/Document/Entry Information has been deleted from the docket sheet doc. no. 14. First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by US Coachways, Inc., filed by (Bauman, Michael) (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Thursday, September 14, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Adjourn Conference
Thu 09/14 4:29 PM
First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Sonny Alloway, Juanita Figueroa. (Harrison, David) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 09/14 4:35 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Adjourn 10/5/2017 Conference. Initial Conference set for 10/18/2017 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Case Management Statement12 is due by 10/16/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/14/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 09/13 9:27 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/5/2017 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 2E North before Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes Jr., located in the United States Eastern District of New York Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York 11201. All counsel are required to attend, and plaintiff's counsel is directed to ensure that all counsel are aware of their obligation to appear. Any requests for adjournment must be made in writing on notice to opposing parties, and must disclose whether all parties consent. No request for adjournment will be considered unless made at least forty-eight (48) hours before the scheduled conference. Prior to the conference, the parties are to comply with the requirements of Rule 26(f) of the Fed. R. Civ. P. (See main document) Case Management Statement must be completed and filed on ECF no later than 10/2/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/13/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/18 1:48 PM
Defendants ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Edward Telmany, Mark Telmany, US Coachways, Inc.. (Bauman, Michael) |
|
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 07/21 2:54 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Edward Telmany, Mark Telmany, US Coachways, Inc.. (Bauman, Michael) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 07/21 2:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bauman on behalf of Edward Telmany, Mark Telmany, US Coachways, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Bauman, Michael) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 07/21 3:30 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for All Defendants Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint by 8/18/2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 7/21/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
||
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 07/12 1:54 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonny Alloway, Juanita Figueroa. Edward Telmany served on 7/6/2017, answer due 7/27/2017. (Harrison, David) |
|
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 07/12 1:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonny Alloway, Juanita Figueroa. Mark Telmany served on 7/6/2017, answer due 7/27/2017. (Harrison, David) |
|
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 07/12 1:51 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sonny Alloway, Juanita Figueroa. US Coachways, Inc. served on 7/6/2017, answer due 7/27/2017. (Harrison, David) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/21 9:50 AM
Summons Issued as to Edward Telmany, Mark Telmany, US Coachways, Inc.. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Wed 06/21 9:49 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Wed 06/21 9:43 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 06/21 9:43 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Raymond J. Dearie and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) |
||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Tue 06/20 4:32 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Sonny Alloway, Juanita Figueroa (Harrison, David) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/20 4:19 PM
COMPLAINT against Edward Telmany, Mark Telmany, US Coachways, Inc. filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9619922 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Sonny Alloway, Juanita Figueroa. (Harrison, David) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons |