Wyatt v. Kirschenbaum & Phillips PC, et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Arthur D Spatt |
Referred: | Arlene R Lindsay |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03712 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 19, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 17, 2017 4:10 AM EST |
Defendant
John Doe
|
|
Defendant
Irwin Kirschenbaum
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kirschenbaum & Phillips, P.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Newburyport Capital LLC
|
|
Defendant
Elliot Phillips
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard D. Wyatt
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 07/20 11:13 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re11 stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, with prejudice, with each party to bear its respective fees and costs incurred in this action. The Clerk of the Court is directed close the case. SO ORDERED by Judge Arthur D. Spatt on 7/19/18. (Coleman, Laurie) |
|
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 07/18 5:48 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Richard D. Wyatt (Pashkin, Mitchell) |
|
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 07/10 10:31 AM
ORDER: Due to a change in the Court's calendar, the July 11, 2018 conference is adjourned to July 17, 2018 at 1:30 p.m. The parties are to electronically file a joint proposed pretrial order in compliance with the district judge's individual rules, signed by counsel for each party, prior to the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 7/10/2018. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) |
||
Tuesday, December 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Scheduling Order
Tue 12/12 11:16 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for July 11, 2018 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 12/12/2017. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference
Tue 12/12 11:13 AM
ORDER re9 : The parties have agreed to the proposed scheduling order. Accordingly, the schedule will be entered by the Court. The December 13, 2017 conference is adjourned. Counsel shall follow the undersigneds individual rules should an issue arise. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 12/12/2017. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) |
||
Monday, December 11, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 12/11 9:21 AM
Consent MOTION to Adjourn Conference Scheduled for December 13, 2017 by Richard D. Wyatt. (Pashkin, Mitchell) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 11/13 5:00 PM
Initial Conference ORDER: If counsel cannot agree to the proposed schedule or minor modifications thereof, as attached, they are directed to appear before the undersigned in Courtroom 810, United States Federal Courthouse, Central Islip, New York at the date and time provided in the initial conference order. See attachments for details. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay on 11/13/2017. c/ecf (Imrie, Robert) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Scheduling Order | ||
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 09/27 8:40 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Irwin Kirschenbaum, Kirschenbaum & Phillips, P.C., Elliot Phillips. (Kohl, Michael) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Wed 09/27 8:38 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kirschenbaum & Phillips, P.C. (Kohl, Michael) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Complaint
Mon 09/18 5:40 PM
COMPLAINT against John Doe, Irwin Kirschenbaum, Kirschenbaum & Phillips, P.C., Newburyport Capital LLC, Elliot Phillips Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Richard D. Wyatt. (Pashkin, Mitchell) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Judgment, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Consent Order, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Restraining Notice | ||
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 06/22 10:03 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 06/22 10:01 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/22 10:03 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Arthur D. Spatt and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (McMahon, Carol) |
||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 06/21 9:47 AM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Kirschenbaum & Phillips, PC (Kohl, Michael) |
|
utility
Incorrect Case-Document Information
Wed 06/21 8:31 AM
Incorrect Document Entry Information. A Civil Cover Sheet was not filed; the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet. Counsel is directed to submit the Civil Cover Sheet using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen) |
||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Tue 06/20 1:43 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kirschenbaum & Phillips, PC from Supreme court of the State of NY Nassau County, case number 601485/2017. (Kohl, Michael) |