Murray v. Unknown Officer Euclid City Police Dept. et al
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Solomon Oliver, Jr |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01290 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 22, 2018 |
Defendant
Cleveland Clinic Euclid Hospital
|
|
Defendant
Euclid City Police Dept.
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Nurse Cleveland Clinic Euclid Hospital
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Staff Cleveland Clinic Euclid Hospital
|
|
Plaintiff
Alonzo Murray
|
|
Plaintiff
Umar Abdul Aziz
|
Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago |
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
25 | 25
order
Judgment
Thu 03/22 10:07 AM
Judgment Entry . The court, having granted Defendants Cleveland Clinic Euclid Hospital (CCEH), Unknown Nurse, and Unknown Staff 's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (ECF No.18 ), in a separate Order on this same date, hereby enters judgment for Defendants and against Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 3/21/2018. (R,Sh) |
|
24 | 24
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for extension of time (other) Order on Motion to extend deadlines Order on Motion for judgment on the pleadings
Thu 03/22 10:02 AM
Order . Plaintiff's combined Motions for an Extension of Time (ECF No.22) are denied. Defendants' Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings (ECF No. 18) is granted. The court hereby dismisses the Complaint (ECF No. 1) against Defendants. In light of the court's ruling, the court notes that all claims against all Defendants in this case have been dismissed. Related documents22 ,18 ). Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 3/21/2018.(R,Sh) |
|
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Thu 03/22 10:10 AM
Copy of25 Judgment,24 Order on Motion for extension of time,, Order on Motion to extend deadlines,, Order on Motion for judgment on the pleadings, mailed to Alonzo Murray at #694741, Richland Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 8107, Mansfield, OH 44901 on 3/22/2018. Related document(s)25 ,24 . (R,Sh) |
||
Friday, February 09, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
resp
Reply
Fri 02/09 2:16 PM
Reply in support of18 Motion for judgment on the pleadings ; Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Prepare and Deliver Interrogatories; and Brief in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint and to Define Relief filed by Cleveland Clinic Euclid Hospital, Unknown Nurse Cleveland Clinic Euclid Hospital, Unknown Staff Cleveland Clinic Euclid Hospital. (Moscarino, George) |
|
Friday, February 02, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Extension (other) Extension (of deadlines)
Fri 02/02 3:57 PM
Motion for extension of time to Prepare and Deliver Interrogatories, Motion for extension of time to Amend Complaint and Answer to18 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Plaintiff Alonzo Murray. (P,WL) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion to stay
Fri 12/29 4:06 PM
Order [non-document] granting in part and denying in part Plaintiff's Motion to stay . Plaintiff may have 30 days to find counsel and 45 days from the date of this Order to respond to Motion to Dismiss. Approved by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr on 12/29/2017.(S,SR) |
||
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Fri 12/29 4:07 PM
Copy of Order on Motion to stay, mailed to Alonzo Murray #694741 at Richland Correctional Institution P.O. Box 8107 Mansfield OH 44905 on 12/29/2017. (S,SR) |
||
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
resp
Opposition
Thu 12/28 4:11 PM
Opposition to20 Motion to stay filed by Cleveland Clinic Euclid Hospital, Unknown Nurse Cleveland Clinic Euclid Hospital, Unknown Staff Cleveland Clinic Euclid Hospital. (Moscarino, George) |
|
Wednesday, December 27, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Stay
Wed 12/27 11:10 AM
Motion to stay and hold in abeyance for 60 days filed by Plaintiff Alonzo Murray. (S,SR) |
|
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim
Wed 12/13 12:14 PM
Order granting Defendant Euclid City Police Department's (ECPD), Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim for the reasons stated herein. The court hereby dismisses the Complaint against ECPD only. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 12/13/2017.(R,Sh) |
|
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Wed 12/13 1:25 PM
Copy of19 Order on Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim, mailed to Alonzo Murray, #694741, Richland Correctional Institution, P.O.Box 8107, Mansfield, OH 44901 on 12/13/2017. Related document(s)19 . (R,Sh) |
||
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Fri 12/01 4:30 PM
Motion for judgment on the pleadings filed by Defendant Cleveland Clinic Euclid Hospital. (Moscarino, George) |
|
Monday, November 27, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
oth_ans
Answer
Mon 11/27 3:17 PM
Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Cleveland Clinic Euclid Hospital. (Moscarino, George) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 11/27 3:15 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Cleveland Clinic Euclid Hospital. (Moscarino, George) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
service
Return of Service Executed
Mon 11/13 4:14 PM
Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by FedEx executed upon Cleveland Clinic Euclid Hospital on 11/13/2017, filed on behalf of Alonzo Murray Related document(s)10 . (S,SR) |
|
14 | 14
service
Return of Service Unexecuted
Mon 11/13 4:12 PM
Return of Service by U.S. Marshal unexecuted upon Cleveland Clinic Euclid Hospital. Service attempted by certified mail filed on behalf of Alonzo Murray Related document(s)10 . (S,SR) |
|
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Mon 11/13 4:15 PM
Copy of14 Return of Service Unexecuted,15 Return of Service Executed mailed to Alonzo Murray #694741 at Richland Correctional Institution P.O. Box 8107 Mansfield OH 44905 on 11/13/2017. (S,SR) |
||
Tuesday, October 31, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Tue 10/31 9:54 AM
Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Defendant Euclid City Police Dept..(Sweeney, Kelley) |
|
Att: 1 Brief in Support | ||
Wednesday, October 25, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 10/25 2:59 PM
Defendants' Answer to1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Unknown Nurse Cleveland Clinic Euclid Hospital, Unknown Staff Cleveland Clinic Euclid Hospital. (Moscarino, George) |
|
Tuesday, October 17, 2017 | ||
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Tue 10/17 10:15 AM
Copy of11 Return of Service Executed mailed to Alonzo Murray #694741 at Richland Correctional Institution P.O. Box 8107 Mansfield OH 44905 on 10/17/2017. (S,SR) |
||
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
service
Return of Service Executed
Tue 10/17 10:11 AM
Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by certified mail executed upon Euclid City Police Dept. (unknown officer) on 10/4/2017, filed on behalf of Euclid City Police Dept. Related document(s)7 . (S,SR) |
|
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
oth_evt
Summons Issued
Thu 10/12 1:16 PM
Original Summons and Complaint issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Cleveland Clinic Euclid Hospital. (R,Sh) |
|
9 | 9
oth_doc
Supplement
Thu 10/12 1:02 PM
Summons and US Marshal form for Cleveland Clinic Euclid Hospital filed by Alonzo Murray. Related document(s)1 .(S,SR) |
|
Att: 1 U.S. Marshal Form | ||
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Wed 10/11 8:12 AM
Copy of8 Return of Service Executed, mailed to Alonzo Murray #694741 at Richland Correctional Institution 1001 Olivesburg Rd. Mansfield OH 44905 on 10/11/2017. (S,SR) |
||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
service
Return of Service Executed
Wed 10/11 8:11 AM
Return of Service by U.S. Marshal by certified mail executed upon Unknown Nurse Cleveland Clinic Euclid Hospital on 10/4/2017; Unknown Staff Cleveland Clinic Euclid Hospital on 10/4/2017, filed on behalf of Alonzo Murray Related document(s)7 . (S,SR) |
|
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
oth_evt
Summons Issued
Thu 09/28 10:17 AM
Original Summons and Complaint issued to U.S. Marshal for service upon Euclid City Police Dept., Unknown Nurse Cleveland Clinic Euclid Hospital, Unknown Staff (A,B,C) Cleveland Clinic Euclid Hospital. No summons provided for defendant Cleveland Clinic Euclid Hospital, no summons issued. (R,Sh) Modified text on 9/28/2017 (R,Sh) |
|
Att: 1 U.S. Marshal Forms | ||
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis
Tue 09/26 2:53 PM
Order granting Plaintiff's2 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Parker on 9/26/2017. (O,K) |
|
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Tue 09/26 2:54 PM
Copy of6 Order on Motion to proceed in forma pauperis mailed to Alonzo Murray #694741 at Richland Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 8107, Mansfield, OH 44901 on 9/26/2017. (O,K) |
||
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice
Tue 09/26 9:24 AM
Notice of Compliance filed by Alonzo Murray.(S,SR) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 U.S. Marshal Form | ||
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order
Fri 09/01 12:11 PM
Order directing Plaintiff to provide U.S. Marshal forms and summonses for service within 30 days of this order. Plaintiff shall file a Notice of Compliance with an appropriate case caption for filing with the completed forms. Signed by Judge Solomon Oliver, Jr. on 9/1/2017. (R,Sh) |
|
oth_evt
Remark re Pro Se Service
Fri 09/01 12:20 PM
Copy of4 Order, Summons and U.S. Marshal Forms mailed to Alonzo Murray #694741, Richland Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 8107 Mansfield, OH 44901 on 9/1/2017. Related document(s)4 . (R,Sh) |
||
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Address Change Notice
Tue 07/18 9:12 AM
Address Change Notice filed by Alonzo Murray. (S,SR) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 06/20 2:25 PM
Motion to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Alonzo Murray.(P,WL) |
|
Att: 1 Request for Certified Account Statement and Acknowledgment of Understanding, | ||
Att: 2 Inmate Statement | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/20 2:20 PM
Complaint against All Defendants. Filing fee not paid, IFP. Filed by Alonzo Murray. (P,WL) (P,WL) |
|
Att: 1 (6/20/2017) Civil Cover Sheet |