Romero-Galindez v. Jusino-Cruz
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Francisco A Besosa |
Referred: | Camille L Velez-Rive |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01751 |
Nature of Suit | 550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2017 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment
Tue 07/25 5:52 PM
JUDGMENT dismissing this case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/25/2017. (brc) |
|
10 | 10
order
Order
Tue 07/25 12:27 PM
ORDER re9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal: GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 07/25/2017. (brc) |
|
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 07/24 5:55 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Angel Romero-Galindez (Soto-Santiago, Laura) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 06/27 5:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Laura I. Soto-Santiago on behalf of Angel Romero-Galindez (Soto-Santiago, Laura) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order
Thu 06/22 4:47 PM
ORDER: The Court hereby appoints the Federal Public Defender as counsel for Plaintiff in this case. The FPD shall meet with Plaintiff within thirty (30) days of the entry of this Order to ascertain the merits of Plaintiff's petition. The FPD shall then file a motion indicating whether they will be filing an Amended Complaint or will pursue another course of action. Status report due on or before July 24, 2017. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Camille L. Velez-Rive on June 22, 2017. (ASE) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Memorandum of the Clerk
Wed 06/21 3:09 PM
MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK. Pursuant to the Order Referring Motion entered by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 6/20/17 (Docket No. 5), the1 Complaint has been randomly assigned within the Case Assignment System to Magistrate Judge Camille Velez-Rive for report and recommendation. Signed by Clerk on 6/20/17.(gsr) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order
Tue 06/20 1:10 PM
ORDER re3 Complaint. Referred to a magistrate judge for a report and recommendation. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 06/20/2017. (brc) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 06/20 1:07 PM
ORDER re1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis: GRANTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 06/20/2017. (brc) |
|
3 | 3
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/20 11:33 AM
COMPLAINT against Eileen Jusino-Cruz, filed by Angel Romero-Galindez, Pro Se. Service due by 9/18/2017,(ad) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Envelope | ||
2 | 2
misc
Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
Tue 06/20 11:32 AM
***RESTRICTED*** Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Angel Romero-Galindez, Pro Se. (ad) |
|
1 | 1
motion
Proceed In Forma Pauperis
Tue 06/20 11:31 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Angel Romero-Galindez, Pro Se. Responses due by 7/5/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (ad) |