Haro Investment Corp v. US Trustee
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Carmen C Cerezo |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01825 |
Nature of Suit | 422 Bankruptcy - Appeal 28 USC 158 |
Cause | 28:0158 Notice of Appeal re Bankruptcy Matter (BA |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 17, 2017 4:24 AM AST |
Appellant
Haro Investment Corp
|
Represented By
|
Appellee
US Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM AST |
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment
Mon 04/02 8:35 AM
JUDGMENT - AFFIRMING the decision of the Bankruptcy Court and DISMISSING this appeal. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 3/28/2018. (mld) |
|
Thursday, January 18, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Party
Mon 01/22 9:44 AM
ORDER granted9 Motion to Automatically Substitute Public Officer as Party. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 1/18/2018. (mld) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Substitute Party
Mon 01/08 5:20 PM
Ex Parte MOTION to Substitute Party Ex Parte Motion to Automatically Substitute Public Officer as Party Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25 filed by Jill E. Kelso on behalf of US Trustee Responses due by 1/22/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Kelso, Jill) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
Friday, August 25, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Mon 08/28 10:30 AM
ORDER granted6 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Deadline to File Brief; granted retroactively4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief on Appeal. Signed by Judge Carmen C. Cerezo on 8/25/2017. (mld) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
appeal
Appellees Brief
Thu 08/24 2:55 PM
Appellee's BRIEF by US Trustee. Appellant Reply Brief due by 9/7/2017.(Kelso, Jill) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix Appendix of Appellee, United States Trustee | ||
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 08/17 8:42 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 30 Days After Transcripts are Transmitted to file Appellee's Brief Motion is Unopposed filed by Jill E. Kelso on behalf of US Trustee Responses due by 8/31/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Kelso, Jill) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
appeal
Appellants Brief
Mon 08/14 2:45 PM
Appellant's BRIEF by Haro Investment Corp. Appellee Brief due by 8/24/2017. (Trujillo-Gonzalez, Maximiliano) |
|
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 08/03 12:30 AM
MOTION for extension of time until August 14,2017 to File Brief of Appellant filed by Maximiliano Trujillo-Gonzalez on behalf of Haro Investment Corp Responses due by 8/17/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Trujillo-Gonzalez, Maximiliano) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Bankruptcy Complete Record on Appeal
Tue 07/18 11:08 AM
CERTIFICATION for Transmittal of Complete Record on Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by US Trustee. Appellant Brief due by 8/2/2017.(U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Lizette Torres) |
|
Att: 1 Appellee's Designation of Items, | ||
Att: 2 Appellee's Record on Appeal, | ||
Att: 3 Certification of Transcripts Request, | ||
Att: 4 Certified Docket | ||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Wed 06/21 9:01 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Carmen C. Cerezo (arg) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Bankruptcy Appeal - Transmittal Form
Tue 06/20 10:38 AM
TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Haro Investment Corp.(U.S. Bankruptcy Court, Lizette Torres) |
|
Att: 1 Notice of Appeal and Election to USDC, | ||
Att: 2 Order dkt 63, | ||
Att: 3 Certified Docket |