DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc v. Melendez-Saez et al
Puerto Rico District Court | |
Judge: | Jay A Garcia-Gregory |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01826 |
Nature of Suit | 220 Real Property - Foreclosure |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 24, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 17, 2017 4:36 AM AST |
Defendant
Melvin Luis Melendez-Saez
RR 10240-20
Toa Alta, PR 00953 |
|
Defendant
Fanixa Resto-Ocasio
RR 7 BOX 10240-20
Toa Alta, PR 00953 |
|
Plaintiff
DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc
11 Madison Avenue 4th Floor
NEW YORK, NY 10010 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM AST |
Monday, July 12, 2021 | ||
33 | 33
order
Judgment
Mon 07/12 2:54 PM
JUDGMENT dismissing without prejudice Plaintiff's case. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 7/12/2021. (MQ) |
|
32 | 32
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 07/12 2:53 PM
ORDER granting31 Motion to Dismiss. Judgment shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 7/12/2021. (MQ) |
|
31 | 31
motion
Dismiss
Mon 07/12 1:40 PM
MOTION to dismiss as to All Parties filed by DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc Responses due by 7/26/2021. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Fortuno-Fas, Agustin) |
|
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order on Motion requesting Order Order on Motion Requesting Copy of Docket Sheet Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Fri 06/08 11:34 AM
ORDER denying without prejudice 25 Motion requesting Order; and denying without prejudice 26 Motion for Default Judgment, in light of the Amended Judgment of Stay. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 6/8/2018. (MQ) |
|
29 | 29
order
Amended Judgment
Fri 06/08 11:32 AM
AMENDED JUDGMENT staying case. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 6/8/2018. (MQ) |
|
28 | 28
order
Order on Informative Motion
Fri 06/08 11:29 AM
ORDER noted27 INFORMATIVE motion. Amended Judgment of Stay shall be entered accordingly. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 6/8/2018. (MQ) |
|
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
motion
Informative Motion
Mon 06/04 10:27 AM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Notice of Bankruptcy filed by Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc Responses due by 6/18/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Default -Judgment
Fri 06/01 10:35 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Melvin Luis Melendez-Saez, Fanixa Resto-Ocasio filed by Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc Responses due by 6/15/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit A-2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit A-3, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit B-1, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit B-2, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit D | ||
25 | 25
motion
Requesting Order Requesting Copy of Docket Sheet
Fri 06/01 10:28 AM
MOTION requesting Order of Continuance of Proceedings ( Responses due by 6/15/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.), MOTION Requesting Copy of Docket Sheet filed by Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc (Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin) |
|
Wednesday, January 24, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
order
Judgment
Wed 01/24 10:44 AM
JUDGMENT staying case. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/24/2018. (MQ) |
|
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 01/24 10:40 AM
ORDER noted21 Motion for extension of time. In light of the passage of Hurricanes Irma and Maria, the Court hereby STAYS this case until March 31, 2018. This will afford the parties and counsel an opportunity to resolve personal matters, determine the amount of damages to the property, and attempt in good faith to resolve the issues of foreclosure, given any post-hurricane loss mitigation programs available. A judgment of stay shall issue, and any party can request to reopen the proceedings after March 31, 2018. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/24/2018. (MQ) |
|
22 | 22
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Wed 01/24 10:37 AM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Franklin Padilla-Ortiz is terminated from this case. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 1/24/2018. (MQ) |
|
21 | 21
motion
Extension of Time
Wed 01/24 10:27 AM
MOTION for extension of time until 03/31/2018 to File Motion for Entry of Judgment filed by Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc Responses due by 2/7/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Withdraw Attorney
Wed 01/24 10:22 AM
MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Franklin Padilla-Ortiz filed by Franklin Padilla-Ortiz on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc Responses due by 2/7/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Padilla-Ortiz, Franklin) |
|
Friday, December 29, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Order on Informative Motion Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 12/29 2:39 PM
ORDER noted17 Informative motion; granting18 Motion for extension of time; granting15 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Natalia M. Batista-Vazquez is terminated from this case. Motion for default judgment and proposed default judgment due by 1/31/2018. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 12/29/2017. (MQ) |
|
18 | 18
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 12/29 1:44 PM
MOTION for extension of time until 01/31/2018 filed by Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc Responses due by 1/12/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin) |
|
17 | 17
motion
Informative Motion
Fri 12/29 1:43 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding IN COMPLIANCE WITH ORDER filed by Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc Responses due by 1/12/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 12/29 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joaquin Miguel Lago-Gonzalez on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc (Lago-Gonzalez, Joaquin) |
|
15 | 15
motion
Withdraw Attorney
Fri 12/29 1:40 PM
MOTION to Withdraw Attorney as to Natalia M. Batista-Vazquez filed by Natalia M. Batista-Vazquez on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc Responses due by 1/12/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Batista-Vazquez, Natalia) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order to Show Cause
Thu 12/28 11:39 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to why Plaintiff has failed to file a motion for default judgment in compliance with Docket Nos. 11 and 13. Show Cause Response due by 1/8/2018. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 12/28/2017. (MQ) |
|
Tuesday, October 24, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 10/24 4:48 PM
ORDER granting12 Motion for extension of time. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/24/17. (lir) |
|
Monday, October 23, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 10/23 12:41 PM
MOTION for extension of time until 12/20/2017 to File Motion for Entry of Judgment filed by Natalia M. Batista-Vazquez on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc Responses due by 11/6/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Batista-Vazquez, Natalia) |
|
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order
Tue 10/03 2:37 PM
ORDER re 9 Order on Motion for Entry of Default. In light of the passage of Hurricane Maria, motion for default judgment and proposed default judgment due by 10/23/2017. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/3/2017. (MQ) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Mon 09/18 12:22 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Melvin Luis Melendez-Saez, Fanixa Resto-Ocasio (su) |
|
9 | 9
order
Order on Motion for Entry of Default
Mon 09/18 9:07 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Entry of Default. The Clerk of Court shall take notice. Motion for default judgment and proposed default judgment due by 9/27/2017. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 9/18/2017. (MQ) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Default - Entry
Thu 08/31 2:54 PM
MOTION for Default Entry as to Melvin Luis Melendez-Saez, Fanixa Resto-Ocasio filed by Franklin Padilla-Ortiz on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc Responses due by 9/14/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Padilla-Ortiz, Franklin) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order on Informative Motion
Fri 08/11 4:19 PM
ORDER noted6 INFORMATIVE motion. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/11/2017. (lir) |
|
Wednesday, August 09, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Informative Motion
Wed 08/09 4:49 PM
INFORMATIVE Motion regarding Defendant's Military Status filed by Franklin Padilla-Ortiz on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc Responses due by 8/23/2017. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically.(Padilla-Ortiz, Franklin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Wednesday, August 02, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 08/02 1:37 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc upon Melvin Luis Melendez-Saez served on 6/28/2017, answer due 7/19/2017; Fanixa Resto-Ocasio served on 7/21/2017, answer due 8/11/2017. (Padilla-Ortiz, Franklin) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 08/02 1:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Franklin Padilla-Ortiz on behalf of DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc (Padilla-Ortiz, Franklin) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/21 9:45 AM
Summons Issued as to Melvin Luis Melendez-Saez, Fanixa Resto-Ocasio (arg) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Judge Assignment
Wed 06/21 9:02 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory (arg) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/20 3:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Melvin Luis Melendez-Saez, Fanixa Resto-Ocasio ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-5493175.), filed by DLJ Mortgage Capital Inc. Service due by 9/18/2017,(Batista-Vazquez, Natalia) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Category Sheet |