Ahmetspahic v. U.S. Department of Homeland Security et al
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Audrey G Fleissig |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-01759 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Sep 12, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 17, 2017 3:18 AM CST |
Defendant
James B. Comey
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John F. Kelly
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
James McCament
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chester Moyer
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U.S. Department of Homeland Security
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dzemil Ahmetspahic
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
order
A Docket Text Order
Tue 09/12 12:28 PM
Docket Text ORDER: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Doc. No. 14); SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on September 12, 2017. (SAA) |
|
Monday, September 11, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/11 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs (Hacking, James) |
|
Thursday, August 17, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
A Docket Text Order
Thu 08/17 2:27 PM
Docket Text ORDER Re:12 Third Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Petition (UNOPPOSED) by Defendants U.S. Department of Homeland Security, et al.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on August 17, 2017. (SAA) |
|
Wednesday, August 16, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 08/16 11:59 AM
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Petition , (UNOPPOSED) by Defendants James B. Comey, John F. Kelly, James McCament, Chester Moyer, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Rund, Jane) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
A Docket Text Order
Tue 07/18 10:45 AM
Docket Text ORDER Re:10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Petition by Defendants U.S. Department of Homeland Security, et al.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on July 18, 2017. (SAA) |
|
Monday, July 17, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 07/17 1:48 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Petition , by Defendants James B. Comey, John F. Kelly, James McCament, Chester Moyer, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Rund, Jane) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 06/22 1:46 PM
NOTICE Appearance of Counsel: by Defendants James B. Comey, John F. Kelly, James McCament, Chester Moyer, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (Riedel, Durwood) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Substitute Attorney (Federal Public Defender or Assistant US Attorney)
Wed 06/21 3:22 PM
Substitution of Attorney Terminating Claire Whitaker Replaced by substituted attorney Jane Rund. (Rund, Jane) |
|
7 | 7
order
A Docket Text Order
Wed 06/21 2:44 PM
Docket Text ORDER Re:6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Petition by Defendants U.S. Department of Homeland Security, et al.; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on June 21, 2017. (SAA) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 06/21 1:52 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Petition , by Defendants James B. Comey, John F. Kelly, James McCament, Chester Moyer, Jefferson Beauregard Sessions, III, U.S. Citizenship & Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (Rund, Jane) |
|
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY)
Tue 06/20 9:06 AM
Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:17-cv-00624. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically. |
|
order
Order of Transfer to Other District
Tue 06/20 8:45 AM
Case transferred to the USDC for the Eastern District of Missouri, pursuant to Court Order entered 6/6/17. Sent to Court Extraction. (td) |
||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Tue 06/20 9:11 AM
Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Audrey G. Fleissig. (JWD) |
||
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
MINUTE ORDER granting Consent Motion to Transfer Case: Upon consideration of Defendants' Consent Motion to Transfer, and it appearing that venue is proper in the U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri, it is hereby ORDERED that this case shall be immediately transferred to U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on June 6, 2017. (AG) | ||
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 Consent MOTION to Transfer Case by JAMES B. COMEY, JOHN F. KELLY, JAMES MCCAMENT, CHESTER MOYER, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY(Whitaker, Claire) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, May 18, 2017 | ||
3 | 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Claire M. Whitaker on behalf of JAMES B. COMEY, JOHN F. KELLY, JAMES MCCAMENT, CHESTER MOYER, JEFFERSON BEAUREGARD SESSIONS, III, U.S. CITIZENSHIP & IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY (Whitaker, Claire) | |
Wednesday, April 12, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS (8) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments #1 Consent Form)(sb) | |
Friday, April 07, 2017 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4616084084) filed by DZEMIL AHMETSPAHIC.(Hacking, James) Modified on 4/21/2017 to correct receipt no. (jf). | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons | ||
Case Assigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (jd) |