Cement Masons Local 527 et al v. S&C Concrete, LLC
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Stephen N Limbaugh, Jr |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-01764 |
Nature of Suit | 791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act |
Cause | 28:1132 E.R.I.S.A. |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 30, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 17, 2017 2:34 AM CST |
Defendant
S&C Concrete, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Bennett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brad Campbell
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cement Masons Local 527
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kurt Dierkes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leonard Ehlmann
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Knott
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Kroeger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jim Renick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
St. Louis Construction Training and Advancement Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Angie Lovatto
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, April 18, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Answer to Garnishment Interrogatories
Fri 04/20 3:11 PM
Answer to Garnishment Interrogatories filed by Garnishee Peoples Bank & Trust Co. re15 Writ of Garnishment; garnishee Peoples Bank and Trust. (CSG) |
|
misc
Receipt
Thu 04/19 3:38 AM
Receipt 4644071733 in the amount of $4650.11 for GARISHMENTS on behalf of S and C Concrete LLC (CCAM) |
||
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Writ of Garnishment
Fri 01/05 10:29 AM
WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued upon the assets of S & C Concrete, LLC by serving garnishee PEOPLES BANK AND TRUST (CSG) |
|
14 | 14
order
Clerk's Order granting motion for appointment of special process server
Fri 01/05 10:28 AM
CLERK'S ORDER (GJL) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion to appoint Frederick Investigations, Inc. as a private process server for service upon garnishee PEOPLES BANK AND TRUST Doc.#13 is GRANTED. (CSG) |
|
Thursday, January 04, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Appoint Special Process Server (for Garnishment Only)
Thu 01/04 12:24 PM
MOTION to Appoint Special Process Server by Plaintiffs Jeremy Bennett, Brad Campbell, Cement Masons Local 527, Kurt Dierkes, Leonard Ehlmann, Joseph Knott, William Kroeger, Angie Lovatto, Jim Renick, St. Louis Construction Training and Advancement Foundation. (Campbell, Greg) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Execution on Garnishment
Thu 01/04 12:23 PM
NOTICE of Execution on garnishment w/affidavit and writ attached; writ issued by Plaintiffs Jeremy Bennett, Brad Campbell, Cement Masons Local 527, Kurt Dierkes, Leonard Ehlmann, Joseph Knott, William Kroeger, Angie Lovatto, Jim Renick, St. Louis Construction Training and Advancement Foundation Garnishee: Peoples Bank and Trust Writ Issued Returnable: 02/05/2018(Campbell, Greg) |
|
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Writ of Execution, | ||
Att: 3 Interrogatories, | ||
Att: 4 Certificate of Service | ||
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
order
Judgment - Default (Case)
Thu 11/30 10:57 AM
JUDGMENT in favor of Cement Masons Local 527, St. Louis Construction Training and Advancement Foundation, Angie Lovatto, Brad Campbell, Jeremy Bennett, Jim Renick, Joseph Knott, Kurt Dierkes, Leonard Ehlmann, William Kroeger against S&C Concrete, LLC in the amount of $4,650.11, consisting of $3,449.58 in liquidated damages for April, May and June 2017, and $1,200.53 in attorneys' fees and court costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant submit its reports for the period of July 2017 to the present so that plaintiffs can determine the amounts owed for this period. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/30/17. (CSG) |
|
misc
Remark
Thu 11/30 10:59 AM
***REMARK - Copy of Default Judgment (doc. #11) sent to defendant: S&C Concrete, LLC, 1616 Sunswept Dr., St. Charles, MO 63303. (CSG) |
||
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Wed 11/29 9:43 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant S&C Concrete, LLC. (copy sent to S&C Concrete, LLC at 1616 Sunswept Dr., St. Charles, MO 63303) (CSG) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
3
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Fri 11/17 11:33 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re8 MOTION for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiffs Jeremy Bennett, Brad Campbell, Cement Masons Local 527, Kurt Dierkes, Leonard Ehlmann, Joseph Knott, William Kroeger, Angie Lovatto, Jim Renick, St. Louis Construction Training and Advancement Foundation. (Campbell, Greg) |
|
8 | 8
motion
Default Judgment Case
Fri 11/17 11:33 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment by Plaintiffs Jeremy Bennett, Brad Campbell, Cement Masons Local 527, Kurt Dierkes, Leonard Ehlmann, Joseph Knott, William Kroeger, Angie Lovatto, Jim Renick, St. Louis Construction Training and Advancement Foundation.(Campbell, Greg) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Kurt Dierkes, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Dierkes Aff, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Dierkes Aff, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 to Dierkes Aff, | ||
Att: 5 Affidavit of Greg A. Campbell, | ||
Att: 6 Proposed Order | ||
7 | 7
motion
Default Entry
Fri 11/17 11:31 AM
MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default against S & C Concrete, LLC by Plaintiffs Jeremy Bennett, Brad Campbell, Cement Masons Local 527, Kurt Dierkes, Leonard Ehlmann, Joseph Knott, William Kroeger, Angie Lovatto, Jim Renick, St. Louis Construction Training and Advancement Foundation.(Campbell, Greg) |
|
Att: 1 Entry of Default by the Clerk | ||
Thursday, October 19, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
A Docket Text Order
Thu 10/19 11:39 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Motion for Default Judgment or Dismissal ;Proposed extension date November 19, 2017 by Plaintiffs Jeremy Bennett, Brad Campbell, Cement Masons Local 527, Kurt Dierkes, Leonard Ehlmann, Joseph Knott, William Kroeger, Jim Renick, St. Louis Construction Training and Advancement Foundation, angie lovatto. (Campbell, Greg) filed by Joseph Knott, St. Louis Construction Training and Advancement Foundation, angie lovatto, Kurt Dierkes, William Kroeger, Jeremy Bennett, Brad Campbell, Jim Renick, Cement Masons Local 527, Leonard Ehlmann; MOTION ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/19/17. (CSG) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Thu 10/19 8:11 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Motion for Default Judgment or Dismissal ;Proposed extension date November 19, 2017 by Plaintiffs Jeremy Bennett, Brad Campbell, Cement Masons Local 527, Kurt Dierkes, Leonard Ehlmann, Joseph Knott, William Kroeger, Jim Renick, St. Louis Construction Training and Advancement Foundation, angie lovatto. (Campbell, Greg) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
1
pgs
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
Thu 10/05 11:20 AM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall, within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order, file appropriate motions for entry of default and for default judgment, supported by all necessary affidavits and documentation, as well as proposed orders for the Court's consideration. Failure to comply with this order may result in dismissal without prejudice. Response to Court due by 10/19/2017. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/5/17. (CSG) |
|
Monday, August 28, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 08/28 8:25 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Jeremy Bennett, Joseph Knott, Leonard Ehlmann, angie lovatto, Kurt Dierkes, William Kroeger, Cement Masons Local 527, Jim Renick, St. Louis Construction Training and Advancement Foundation, Brad Campbell. S&C Concrete, LLC served on 8/18/2017, answer due 9/8/2017. (Campbell, Greg) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Wed 06/21 4:02 PM
Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to Greg A. Campbell. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. (MFG) |
||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Notice of Process Server
Tue 06/20 2:42 PM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Jeremy Bennett, Brad Campbell, Cement Masons Local 527, Kurt Dierkes, Leonard Ehlmann, Joseph Knott, William Kroeger, Jim Renick, St. Louis Construction Training and Advancement Foundation, angie lovatto Process Server: Frederick Investigations Inc. (Campbell, Greg) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Tue 06/20 2:41 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant S&C Concrete, LLC with receipt number 0865-6011961, in the amount of $400 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Jeremy Bennett, Joseph Knott, Leonard Ehlmann, angie lovatto, Kurt Dierkes, William Kroeger, Cement Masons Local 527, Jim Renick, St. Louis Construction Training and Advancement Foundation, Brad Campbell.(Campbell, Greg) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Original Filing Form, | ||
Att: 3 Summons |