Whitehead v. Guthy-Renker, Ltd. et al
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Noelle C Collins |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-01766 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Aug 15, 2017 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 17, 2017 3:33 AM CST |
Defendant
Guthy-Renker Partners, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Guthy-Renker, Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wen by Chaz Dean
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tanya Whitehead
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 78 minutes ago |
Tuesday, August 15, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order of Dismissal 41(b)
Tue 08/15 4:24 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Voluntarily Dismiss (Doc.15 ) is GRANTED, Defendants Guthy-Renker, Ltd. and Guthy-Renker Partners, Inc.'s Motion to Stay (Doc.5 ) is DENIED, as moot, and this matter is DISMISSED, without prejudice.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/15/17. (KKS) |
|
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Dismiss Case
Fri 07/28 4:07 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiff's Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss Plaintiff's Claims Against Defendants by Plaintiff Tanya Whitehead. (Engelmeyer, Timothy) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Response to Motion
Fri 07/14 1:08 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re5 MOTION to Stay This Matter Pending Final Approval of Class Settlement and Memorandum in Support Thereof Plaintiff Tayna Whitehead's Response to Defendants' Motion to Stay filed by Plaintiff Tanya Whitehead. (Engelmeyer, Timothy) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule)
Mon 07/10 1:23 PM
ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff is granted until July 14, 2017, to respond to Defendants Motion to Stay (Doc.5 ). Failure to do so will result in the Court ruling on Defendants unopposed motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 7/10/2017. (NEB) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
misc
Entry of Appearance
Wed 07/05 11:23 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Katharine Jilka for Defendant Wen by Chaz Dean. (Jilka, Katharine) |
|
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/05 11:22 AM
ANSWER to Complaint Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Petition by Wen by Chaz Dean.(Jilka, Katharine) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 06/26 2:30 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Guthy-Renker Partners, Inc., Guthy-Renker, Ltd..(Kehlenbrink, Scott) |
|
9 | 9
misc
Disclosure of Organizational Interests
Mon 06/26 10:48 AM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants Guthy-Renker Partners, Inc., Guthy-Renker, Ltd.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: Guthy-Renker Ventures, LLC, Publicly held company: None,. (Kehlenbrink, Scott) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Case Assignment Local Rule 2.08
Wed 06/21 6:29 PM
Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401. (CSAW) |
|
7 | 7
misc
Entry of Appearance
Wed 06/21 8:57 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by James W. Childress for Defendants Guthy-Renker Partners, Inc., Guthy-Renker, Ltd.. (Childress, James) |
|
misc
Case Opening Notification
Wed 06/21 8:47 AM
Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (JWD) |
||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Complaint (Removal/Transfer) - COURT USE ONLY
Wed 06/21 8:45 AM
Petition Received From: St. Louis County Circuit Court, filed by Tanya Whitehead.(JWD) |
|
5 | 5
motion
Stay
Tue 06/20 4:56 PM
MOTION to Stay This Matter Pending Final Approval of Class Settlement and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Defendants Guthy-Renker Partners, Inc., Guthy-Renker, Ltd..(Kehlenbrink, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Filing Notice of Removal
Tue 06/20 4:54 PM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Guthy-Renker Partners, Inc., Guthy-Renker, Ltd. Sent To: State Court - Executed(Kehlenbrink, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Notice of Removal | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Filing Notice of Removal
Tue 06/20 4:52 PM
NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Guthy-Renker Partners, Inc., Guthy-Renker, Ltd. Sent To: Plaintiff(Kehlenbrink, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Attachment Notice to Clerk of Notice of Removal to Federal District Court, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment Notice of Removal | ||
2 | 2
misc
Entry of Appearance
Tue 06/20 4:45 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Scott Kehlenbrink for Defendants Guthy-Renker Partners, Inc., Guthy-Renker, Ltd.. (Kehlenbrink, Scott) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal Petition
Tue 06/20 4:39 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL with receipt number 0865-6012479, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Guthy-Renker Partners, Inc., Guthy-Renker, Ltd..(Kehlenbrink, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - state court file, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. X - email correspondence, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment Declaration of Scott Smith, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 5 Original Filing Form |