Vyskocil v. DePuy Orthopaedics Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ed Kinkeade |
Case #: | 3:17-cv-01627 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jan 31, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 17, 2017 3:29 AM CST |
Defendant
DePuy Orthopaedics Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DePuy Synthes Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does 1 through 20, Inclusive
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Johnson and Johnson Services Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thomas P Schmalzried, MD
|
|
Plaintiff
Glenn Vyskocil
|
Represented By
|
Special Master
Special Master
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Monday, January 31, 2022 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation
Mon 01/31 7:25 PM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL with Prejudice by Gary Cooprider, Carl Shurte, Patsy Shurte, Patricia Murphy, Thomas M. Murphy, Joann Flinn, Donald Murdzia, Leslie A Stewart, Maurice Heier, Mark Miles, Mary E. Miles, Steven Schloss, Jody Crider, Glenn Vyskocil, James L. Hogan, Judith Hogan, Mary Ann Clinton, Barbara H Young, Gary R Young. (Hazam, Lexi) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Mon 01/31 8:11 PM
Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the Stipulation of Dismissal. (chmb) |
||
Friday, April 06, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 04/06 8:14 PM
Notice of filing Case Management Orders The following orders have been filed in 3:11-md-2244 and are available by using the links provided below. [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #10 ] [LINK:PINNACLE PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM] [LINK:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER NO. #11 ] [LINK:DEFENDANTS' FACT SHEET.] (cea) |
|
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
sealex
Sealed and/or Ex Parte Reply/Sur-reply
Fri 08/11 10:17 PM
(Document Restricted) Sealed Reply re:16 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/20/2012) filed by Glenn Vyskocil (Hazam, Lexi) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
sealex
Sealed and/or Ex Parte Response/Objection
Fri 08/04 10:39 AM
(Document Restricted) Sealed Response and Objection re:16 Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/20/2012) filed by DePuy Orthopaedics Inc, DePuy Synthes Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Services Inc (Beisner, John) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Appendix of Exhibits | ||
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Sealed and/or Ex Parte Motion
Fri 07/07 7:02 PM
(Document Restricted) Plaintiff's Motion to Remand (Sealed pursuant to order dated 6/20/2012) filed by Glenn Vyskocil (Hazam, Lexi) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix - Part 1, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix - Part 2, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix - Part 3, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, June 20, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
utility
Electronic Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 06/20 3:12 PM
Case electronically transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:17-cv-04016. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas should seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Copy of NEF to be sent US Mail to parties not electronically noticed. |
|
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
14 | 14 Conditional Transfer Order - 268 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2244, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Texas and assigned to Honorable James Edgar Kinkeade. Case transferred electronically on 6/19/2017. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] | |
Tuesday, June 06, 2017 | ||
13 | 13 ORDER by Judge George H. Wu, re Stipulation to Stay Case,10 . A status conference is set for July 27, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No.2244. Case stayed. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] | |
12 | 12 Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu by Judge George H. Wu. (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] | |
11 | 11 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE WU AND ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge George H Wu; This action has been reassigned to the Honorable George H. Wu, U.S. District Judge and the Honorable Jacqueline Chooljian, U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Court sets a Status Conference for July 27, 2017 at 8:30 a.m. pending the Judicial Panel's decision whether to transfer the case to MDL No. 2244.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] | |
Monday, June 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10 STIPULATION to Stay Case pending a Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Synthes Inc., Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Services, Inc.(Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order Regarding Stipulation to Stay All Proceedings | ||
Friday, June 02, 2017 | ||
9 | 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Synthes Inc., Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Services, Inc, of Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court served on May 31, 2017.(Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Attachment to Certificate of Service | ||
8 | 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 16-05-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:11-cv-02441 GW(JCx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver and Judge Manuel L. Real to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:17-cv-04016 GW(JCx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] | |
Thursday, June 01, 2017 | ||
7 | 7 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 16-05 by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. Case transferred from Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell to the calendar of Judge Manuel L. Real for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:17-cv-04016 R(RAOx). (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] | |
6 | 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Beverly Reid OConnell and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] | |
Tuesday, May 30, 2017 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Synthes Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.. Transferred to Judge Wu(Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Part 1 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, | ||
Att: 2 Part 2 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, | ||
Att: 3 Part 3 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, | ||
Att: 4 Part 4 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, | ||
Att: 5 Part 5 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, | ||
Att: 6 Part 6 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, | ||
Att: 7 Part 7 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases, | ||
Att: 8 Part 8 of 8 to Notice of Related Cases | ||
3 | 3 Certification of Interested Parties filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Synthes Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., identifying Johnson & Johnson International, DePuy Synthes, Inc.. (Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., DePuy Synthes Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc..(Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Attachment A to Civil Cover Sheet | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number BC652261 Receipt No: 0973-19935176 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants DePuy Synthes Inc., DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party DePuy Orthopaedics, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party DePuy Synthes Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft), Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Olah, Kelley) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal of Action, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal of Action | ||
CONFORMED COPY COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Glenn Vyskocil in Los Angeles Superior Court on 2/28/2017, and attached to Notice of Removal as Exhibit 1. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 6/20/2017.] |