Teresa Dominguez et al v. City of Los Angeles et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dolly M Gee |
Referred: | Paul L Abrams |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-04557 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 20, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 19, 2018 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 17, 2017 1:37 AM PST |
Defendant
City of Los Angeles
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Does
|
|
Defendant
Eden Medina
|
Represented By
|
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Richard Copeland
Conflict Solution Services 530 S. Lake Avenue, #733
Pasadena, CA 91101 |
|
Plaintiff
Teresa Dominguez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jesus Romero Garcia
|
Represented By
|
1. | Parents of teenager shot dead file federal lawsuit against City of L.A. and officer (latimes.com) |
Submitted Mon 06/26/2017 | |
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Thursday, May 27, 2021 | ||
266 | 266
order
Strike
Fri 05/28 10:27 AM
ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court hereby GRANTS Defendants' unopposed motion to strike the bill of costs265 . The Bill of Costs262 is hereby ORDERED STRICKEN from the Court's docket. The 6/25/2021 hearing is VACATED. (gk) |
|
Tuesday, May 25, 2021 | ||
265 | 265
motion
Strike
Tue 05/25 10:41 AM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Strike Bill of Costs (CV-59)262 filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Eden Medina. Motion set for hearing on 6/25/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Eisenman, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Jonathan H. Eisenman, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
264 | 264
notice
Withdrawal (Document or Motion)
Tue 05/25 10:00 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Sanctions,263 filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Eden Medina. (Eisenman, Jonathan) |