K.K.E.C. et al v. Doe Run Resources Corporation, The et al
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney W Sippel |
Case #: | 4:17-cv-01684 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jun 19, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 29, 2017 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 16, 2017 3:32 AM CST |
Defendant
D.R. Acquisition Corp.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Doe Run Resources Corporation, The
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Theodore P. Fox, III
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Marvin K. Kaiser
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jerry Pyatt
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Renco Holdings, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ira L. Rennert
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
The Renco Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jeffrey L. Zelms
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chris Collins
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
K.K.E.C.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, March 22, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Entry of Appearance
Tue 03/22 11:07 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Samira Khazaeli for Plaintiffs Chris Collins, T. Y.H. M., Chris Collins, N.C.A.J., Chris Collins, K.S.A.A., Chris Collins, Y. F.B. R., M. O. G., Chris Collins, S. S.N. F., Chris Collins, K. V. L., Chris Collins, L. J.H. H., K. J.D. R., M. A.C. S., M. H.F. S., P. A.F. S., S. B.C. S., E. D.V. V., N. A.M. Z., N. J.M. Z.. Associated Cases: 4:15-cv-01704-RWS et al.(Khazaeli, Samira) |
|
Monday, February 11, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
28
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Mon 02/11 4:49 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re:(253 in 4:15-cv-01704-RWS) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion to dismiss pursuant to the doctrine of international comity 135 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' motion for determination of foreign law 253 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall docket this order in any case which is pending consolidation with the present case. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 2/11/19. Associated Cases: 4:15-cv-01704-RWS et al.(ARL) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
misc
Case Opening Notification
Wed 06/21 10:08 AM
Case Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (JWD) |
||
Monday, June 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9 ORDER [COPY AS ENTERED IN CASE 4:15-CV-1704 RWS] - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' agreed motion to consolidate four related cases with the present case 141 is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall open and randomly assign a new case for each Plaintiff (or two related Plaintiffs) using the complaint filed in: W.Y.A.L. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al. , 4:17 CV 787 HEA D.M.C.C. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al. , 4:17 CV 790 CAS F.E.O.M. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al. , 4:17 CV 797 CDP K.F.B.E. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al ., 4:17 CV 1225 JAR. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that after these cases are severed, each of the severed cases shall be consolidated with this Lead Case before me for all pretrial proceedings. Once the cases are ready for trial, they will be returned to the docket of the District Judge or Magistrate Judge in this district to whom they were assigned before consolidation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future filings shall be made only in this Lead Case and should only reference the case number of this Lead Case in the caption of the filing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file a copy of this order in each of the cases listed above and in the new severed cases. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 5/26/2017. (MRC) | |
8 | 8 ORDER [COPY AS ENTERED IN CASE 4:15-CV-1704 RWS] -.... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the claims of Plaintiffs in this case and the following cases shall be severed. The Clerk of Court shall open and randomlyassign a new case for each Plaintiff (or two related Plaintiffs) using the complaint filed in each case: L.B.H. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al. , 4:16 CV 59 JAR K.A.C.P v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al. , 4:16 CV 60 RLW A.S.S.M. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al. , 4:16 CV 61 JAR J.J.L.L. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al. , 4: 16 CV 634 JAR B.E.M.C. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al. , 4:16 CV 749 AGF A.K.R.C. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al. , 4:16 CV 822 AGF J.L.L.B. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al. , 4:16 CV 829 RLW V.D.H.H. v. The Doe Run Resources Corp. et al. , 4:16 CV 1154 JAR. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that after these cases are severed, each of the severed cases shall be consolidated with this Lead Case before me for all pretrial proceedings. Once the cases are ready for trial, they will be returned to the docket of the District Judge or Magistrate Judge in this district to whom they were assigned before consolidation. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future filings shall be made only in this Lead Case and should only reference the case number of this Lead Case in the caption of the filing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall file a copy of this order in each of the cases listed above and in the new severed cases.. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 12/12/2016. (MRC) | |
7 | 7 ANSWER to Complaint by The Renco Group, Inc..(MRC) | |
6 | 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Ira L. Rennert.(MRC) | |
5 | 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Renco Holdings, Inc..(MRC) | |
4 | 4 ANSWER to Complaint by D.R. Acquisition Corp.(MRC) | |
3 | 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Doe Run Resources Corporation, The, Theodore P. Fox, III, Marvin K. Kaiser, Jerry Pyatt, Jeffrey L. Zelms.(MRC) | |
2 | 2 Petition Received From: St. Louis City Circuit Court, filed by Plaintiffs.(MRC) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, State of Missouri, case number 1622-CC11580, Jury Demand, filed by The Renco Group, Inc.(MRC) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Part 1 of 2, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Part 2 of 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Original Filing Form, | ||
Att: 7 Supplement Circuit Court File |