10
|
|
10
order
.Order
Fri 08/04 11:54 AM
Dismissal Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/4/2017. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 08/04 11:04 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris)
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
order
.Order
Tue 08/01 6:08 PM
ORDER. The parties shall meet and confer and file a Joint Status Report by no later than August 22, 2017. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/1/2017. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 08/01 6:54 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Statement due by 8/22/2017. (dot)
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/31 4:17 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Braswell, Marina)
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/26 11:53 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Marina Utgoff Braswell on behalf of ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY (Braswell, Marina)
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
service
Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Thu 07/06 10:08 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/30/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/30/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/30/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 6/29/2017(Fedeli, Chris)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Declaration of Cristina Rotaru
|
4
|
|
4
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Fri 06/23 11:37 AM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmd)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Notice of Consent
|
3
|
|
3
order
.Order
Fri 06/23 9:28 AM
ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/23/2017.(DM)
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
notice
LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Wed 06/21 12:22 PM
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris)
Related: [-]
|
1
|
|
1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/21 12:21 PM
COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5000206) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC..(Fedeli, Chris)
Related: [-]
|
| |
Att: 1
Civil Cover Sheet,
|
| |
Att: 2
Summons U.S. Attorney,
|
| |
Att: 3
Summons U.S. Attorney General,
|
| |
Att: 4
Summons EPA
|
|
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 06/21 6:49 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (md)
Related: [-]
|