JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. v. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Trevor N Mcfadden |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01218 |
Nature of Suit | 895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act |
Cause | 05:552 Freedom of Information Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 17, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 18, 2017 4:59 AM EST |
Defendant
U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, November 16, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Thu 11/16 3:15 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint) by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC.. (Fedeli, Chris) |
|
order
.Order
Thu 11/16 5:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of the parties'9 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice per the terms of the stipulation. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 11/16/2017. (lctnm3) |
||
Thursday, November 02, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 11/02 11:57 AM
Case directly reassigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson is no longer assigned to the case. (ztnr) |
|
Monday, August 14, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Status Report
Mon 08/14 9:33 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY. (Nebeker, William) |
|
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 08/14 10:26 AM
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the representations in the parties'7 Joint Status Report, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall file a further joint status report on or before 12/13/2017, which shall contain a proposed schedule for further proceedings if litigation is going to be necessary. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 08/14/2017. (lckbj1) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 08/14 10:45 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/13/2017 (hs) |
||
Monday, July 31, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/31 10:00 AM
ANSWER to Complaint by U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY.(Nebeker, William) |
|
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 07/31 10:35 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. It is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall promptly confer and file a joint proposed schedule for briefing or disclosure, on or before 8/14/2017. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 07/31/2017. (lckbj1) |
||
Thursday, July 06, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed in FOIA case as to U.S. Attorney Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Summons Returned Executed as to Federal Defendant
Thu 07/06 11:34 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/30/2017. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 7/30/2017.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 6/30/2017., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY served on 6/29/2017(Fedeli, Chris) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Cristina Rotaru | ||
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
.Order
Mon 06/26 3:09 PM
GENERAL ORDER AND GUIDELINES FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE JUDGE KETANJI BROWN JACKSON. The Court will hold the parties and counsel responsible for following these directives, and parties and counsel should pay particular attention to the Courts instructions for briefing motions and filing exhibits. Failure to adhere to this Order may, when appropriate, result the imposition of sanctions and/or sua sponte denial of non-conforming motions. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 6/26/2017. (lckbj1) |
|
3 | 3
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Mon 06/26 10:54 AM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to U.S. ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Consent Form)(zsb) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/26 10:48 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson. (zsb) |
||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Wed 06/21 12:31 PM
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC. (Fedeli, Chris) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/21 12:30 PM
COMPLAINT against ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AGENCY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5000252) filed by JUDICIAL WATCH, INC..(Fedeli, Chris) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons U.S. Attorney, | ||
Att: 3 Summons U.S. Attorney General, | ||
Att: 4 Summons EPA |