McAleer et al v. Deep Root Analytics, LLC
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Paul G Byron |
Referred: | Thomas B Smith |
Case #: | 6:17-cv-01142 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Nov 07, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 18, 2017 4:56 AM EST |
Defendant
Deep Root Analytics, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dr. James Albert McAleer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda McAleer
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, November 07, 2017 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order
Tue 11/07 2:30 PM
ORDER re 34 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice filed by James Albert McAleer, Linda McAleer. The Clerk is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 11/7/2017. (MMW) |
|
34 | 34
notice
Notice of voluntary dismissal
Tue 11/07 10:49 AM
NOTICE of voluntary dismissal by James Albert McAleer, Linda McAleer (Zimmerman, Jason) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Response to order to show cause
Mon 11/06 7:55 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re32 Order pdf filed by James Albert McAleer, Linda McAleer. (Zimmerman, Jason) |
|
Thursday, October 05, 2017 | ||
32 | 32
order
*Order pdf
Thu 10/05 9:24 AM
ORDER directing Plaintiff to provide evidence concerning the citizenship of the members of Defendant, which is required to establish the existence of diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 10/5/2017. (Smith, Thomas) |
|
Wednesday, September 27, 2017 | ||
31 | 31
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Wed 09/27 9:30 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by James Albert McAleer, Linda McAleer. (Zimmerman, Jason) |
|
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
30 | 30
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 09/18 5:09 PM
ORDER re 29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed by Deep Root Analytics, LLC. The motion is referred to the Magistrate Judge for ruling, or if necessary, issuance of a Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/18/2017. (MMW) |
|
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
29 | 29
motion
Dismiss
Wed 09/13 4:28 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint by Deep Root Analytics, LLC.(Knight, Jon) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support and, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 | ||
28 | 28
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Wed 09/13 10:45 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 27 Motion for Leave to File a Motion to Dismiss with five (5) additional pages. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 9/13/2017. (ALJ) |
|
Tuesday, September 12, 2017 | ||
27 | 27
motion
File Excess Pages
Tue 09/12 11:13 AM
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Deep Root Analytics, LLC. (Knight, Jon) |
|
Tuesday, September 05, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 09/05 5:49 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Class Action Complaint against Deep Root Analytics, LLC with Jury Demand. filed by All Plaintiffs.(Zimmerman, Jason) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
Thu 08/31 9:44 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 24 Motion for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss with five (5) additional pages. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/31/2017. (ALJ) |
|
Wednesday, August 30, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
File Excess Pages
Wed 08/30 3:27 PM
Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by All Defendants. (Dyer, Karen) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
order
*Order pdf
Tue 08/22 3:23 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting nunc pro tunc Plaintiffs' request for a 30-day extension to amend their Complaint 21 . Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 16 is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 8/22/2017. (ALJ) |
|
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
22 | 22
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 08/21 9:33 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Deep Root Analytics, LLC with Jury Demand. filed by James Albert McAleer, Linda McAleer.(Jackson, Trace) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
misc
Mail Returned
Thu 07/27 3:39 PM
Mail returned as Undeliverable re:13 Order on motion to appear pro hac vice. Mail NOT resent to Jon Knight. (JP) |
||
Wednesday, July 26, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Response to motion
Wed 07/26 6:34 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re16 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof filed by James Albert McAleer, Linda McAleer. (Jackson, Trace) |
|
Thursday, July 20, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order
Thu 07/20 1:52 PM
ENDORSED ORDER directing any party who believes recusal is appropriate in view of the footnote contained in 19 Certificate of Interested Persons shall file a Motion for Recusal within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 7/20/2017. (GNB) |
|
Tuesday, July 18, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Tue 07/18 4:01 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by James Albert McAleer, Linda McAleer. (Jackson, Trace) |
|
Friday, July 14, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Fri 07/14 2:36 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by James Albert McAleer, Linda McAleer. (Jackson, Trace) |
|
17 | 17
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Fri 07/14 2:35 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases per Local Rule 1.04(d) by James Albert McAleer, Linda McAleer. Related case(s): no (Jackson, Trace) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss
Wed 07/12 7:00 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Memorandum of Law in Support Thereof by Deep Root Analytics, LLC. (Dyer, Karen) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Wed 07/12 6:58 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Deep Root Analytics, LLC. Related case(s): no (Dyer, Karen) |
|
14 | 14
misc
Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
Wed 07/12 6:54 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re6 Interested persons order by Deep Root Analytics, LLC. (Dyer, Karen) |
|
Tuesday, July 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order on motion to appear pro hac vice
Tue 07/11 3:20 PM
ORDER granting 7 motion for William C. Jackson to appear pro hac vice; granting 9 motion for Travis LeBlanc to appear pro hac vice; granting 11 motion for Jon R. Knight to appear pro hac vice for Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas B. Smith on 7/11/2017. (Smith, Thomas) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Written designation and consent to act
Tue 07/11 2:26 PM
Written designation and consent to act by Karen Caudill Dyer on behalf of Deep Roots Analytics, LLC. Local Counsel: Karen C. Dyer. Non-Resident Counsel: Jon R. Knight. (Dyer, Karen) |
|
11 | 11
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 07/11 2:25 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Jon R. Knight to appear pro hac vice by Deep Roots Analytics, LLC. (Dyer, Karen) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Written designation and consent to act
Tue 07/11 2:20 PM
Written designation and consent to act by Karen Caudill Dyer on behalf of Deep Roots Analytics, LLC. Local Counsel: Karen C. Dyer. Non-Resident Counsel: Travis LeBlanc. (Dyer, Karen) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 07/11 2:18 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Travis LeBlanc to appear pro hac vice by Deep Roots Analytics, LLC. (Dyer, Karen) |
|
8 | 8
misc
Written designation and consent to act
Tue 07/11 2:15 PM
Written designation and consent to act by Karen Caudill Dyer on behalf of Deep Roots Analytics, LLC. Local Counsel: Karen C. Dyer. Non-Resident Counsel: William C. Jackson. (Dyer, Karen) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 07/11 2:14 PM
Unopposed MOTION for William C. Jackson to appear pro hac vice by Deep Roots Analytics, LLC. (Dyer, Karen) |
|
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fees paid
Tue 07/11 3:03 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Travis LeBlanc, appearing on behalf of Deep Roots Analytics, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL065165.) Related document:9 Unopposed MOTION for Travis LeBlanc to appear pro hac vice. (RDO) |
||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fees paid
Tue 07/11 3:04 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney Jon R. Knight, appearing on behalf of Deep Roots Analytics, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL065166.) Related document:11 Unopposed MOTION for Jon R. Knight to appear pro hac vice. (RDO) |
||
misc
Pro Hac Vice Fees paid
Tue 07/11 3:05 PM
***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid and Special Admission Attorney Certification Form filed by attorney William C. Jackson, appearing on behalf of Deep Roots Analytics, LLC (Filing fee $150 receipt number ORL065168.) Related document:7 Unopposed MOTION for William C. Jackson to appear pro hac vice. (RDO) |
||
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Interested persons order
Fri 06/30 1:30 PM
INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER. The Certificate of Interested Persons shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/30/2017. (GNB) |
|
5 | 5
order
Related case order and track 2 notice
Fri 06/30 1:29 PM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. The Notice of Pendency of Other Actions shall be filed within fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 6/30/2017. (GNB) |
|
4 | 4
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/30 11:06 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Paul G. Byron. New case number: 6:17-cv-1142-ORL-40TBS. Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp no longer assigned to the case. (RDO) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
order
Order reassigning case to another judge w/in division
Thu 06/29 11:59 AM
ORDER reassigning this case to another District Judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge G. Kendall Sharp on 6/28/2017. (SC) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons issued
Wed 06/21 3:30 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Deep Roots Analytics, LLC. (RDO) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/21 3:29 PM
COMPLAINT and Request for Injunctive Relief against Deep Roots Analytics, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 - receipt number ORL064607) filed by All Plaintiffs.(RDO) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |