Allore v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Ann M Donnelly |
Referred: | Vera M Scanlon |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03729 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 02, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 18, 2017 3:51 AM EST |
Defendant
Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Claudia M. Allore
44 Fane Court
Brooklyn, NY 11229 |
Docket last updated: 61 minutes ago |
Wednesday, May 02, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Judgment - Clerk
Wed 05/02 3:06 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: plaintiffs request to amend her complaint is denied; and plaintiffs claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Jalitza Poveda Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer Clerk of Court on 5/2/2018. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
Tuesday, May 01, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
5
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Tue 05/01 6:20 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. The plaintiff's request to amend her complaint is denied, and her claims are dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to enter judgment. Ordered by Judge Ann M. Donnelly on 5/1/2018. (Greene, Donna) |
|
Tuesday, March 13, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 03/13 4:46 PM
PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT against Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, filed by Claudia M. Allore. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
6 | 6
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 03/13 4:43 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 SUA SPONTE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint filed by Claudia M. Allore filed by Claudia M. Allore. (Ramesar, Thameera) |
|
Thursday, March 08, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Sua Sponte - Report and Recommendations
Thu 03/08 1:02 PM
ORDER SUA SPONTE REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re1 Complaint filed by Claudia M. Allore; Objections to R&R due by 3/22/2018. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 3/8/2018. (Quinlan, Krista) |
|
Thursday, December 28, 2017 | ||
order
Status Report Order
Thu 12/28 3:00 PM
ORDER: The Court's records reflect that the complaint in this action was filed on 6/21/2017. Plaintiff has not filed any proof that service was timely affected. Plaintiff must file such proof by 1/12/2018. If such a filing is not made, it will be recommended that the Court dismiss this action without prejudice. c/m Plaintiff Allore (Scanlon, Vera) |
||
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
order
Order(Other)
Wed 07/05 11:20 AM
SERVICE ORDER: The Court's records reflect that the complaint in this action was filed on 6/21/2017. If service is not made upon Defendant by 9/19/2017, or Plaintiff fails to show good cause why such service has not been effected, it will be recommended that the Court dismiss this action without prejudice. See full order as well as the Individual Practices & Rules of Judge Donnelly and Judge Scanlon attached. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Vera M. Scanlon on 7/5/2017.. C/M to Plaintiff. (Miller, Hannah) |
|
Att: 1 Scanlon Individual Rules, | ||
Att: 2 Donnelly Individual Rules | ||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Wed 06/21 10:39 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/21 10:39 AM
Summons Issued as to Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/21 10:37 AM
COMPLAINT against Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, filed by Claudia M. Allore. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
misc
Filing Fee Received
Wed 06/21 10:38 AM
FILING FEE: $ 400, receipt number 4653116375 (Bowens, Priscilla) |