Aetna Life Insurance Company v. Cruz et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Dora Lizette Irizarry |
Referred: | Robert M Levy |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03730 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:1335 Interpleader Action |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 28, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 18, 2017 3:48 AM EST |
Cross Claimant
Thomas Dinapoli
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Nelson Cruz
|
Represented By
|
Cross Defendant
Denise L. Nappier
|
|
Defendant
Nelson Cruz
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Thomas Dinapoli
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Denise L. Nappier
|
|
Plaintiff
Aetna Life Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
ThirdParty Defendant
Tito Oquendo, Jr.
|
|
ThirdParty Plaintiff
Nelson Cruz
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, March 28, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
3
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 03/28 4:12 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER: this action, including all counterclaims and cross-claims, is dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party. So Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 3/27/2018. (Williams, Erica) |
|
Monday, March 26, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Letter
Mon 03/26 2:37 PM
Letter From Kenneth J. Kelly to The Honorable Robert M. Levy, Dated March 26, 2018, Advising That This Matter Has Been Resolved, And Asking The Court to So Order The Attached Stipulation by Aetna Life Insurance Company (Kelly, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Stipulation And Order, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Stipulation And Order, | ||
Att: 3 Affidavit of Tito Oquendo Myree | ||
Monday, October 16, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
answer
Answer to Crossclaim
Mon 10/16 10:05 PM
ANSWER to15 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Nelson Cruz. (Hoover, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing
Tue 10/10 3:54 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy: Kenneth J. Kelly, plaintiff; Michael Hoover, Cruz; Steven Banks, State/Dinapoli. (1) Scheduling order entered. Discovery deadline 3/30/18. Next conference 4/4/18 at 2:00 (tel)(close of discovery). (2) Plaintiff will circulate a stipulation authorizing the deposit of the insurance proceeds in the registry of this court pending resolution of this case. Initial Conference Hearing held on 10/10/2017 (Levy, Robert) |
||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Appear by Telephone
Fri 10/06 11:55 AM
Letter Motion to Appear by Telephone by Nelson Cruz. (Hoover, Michael) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Letter
Fri 10/06 11:12 AM
Letter to The Honorable Robert M. Levy by Aetna Life Insurance Company (Kelly, Kenneth) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Appear by Telephone
Fri 10/06 5:24 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion to Appear by Telephone. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 10/6/2017. (Levy, Robert) |
||
Monday, September 25, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 09/25 2:08 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Thomas Dinapoli re15 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim on Treasurer Denise L. Nappier (Banks, Steven) |
|
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint Crossclaim
Mon 09/25 11:57 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Nelson Cruz, Denise L. Nappier by Thomas Dinapoli. (Banks, Steven) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 09/25 11:55 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Leon Banks on behalf of Thomas Dinapoli (aty to be noticed) (Banks, Steven) |
|
Tuesday, September 19, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 09/19 5:35 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thomas Dinapoli answer due 9/25/2017.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 9/19/2017. (Levy, Robert) |
||
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Fri 09/15 10:53 AM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Interpleader Complaint by Thomas Dinapoli. (Connell, Monica) |
|
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 08/24 10:42 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 10/10/2017 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 11B South before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/24/2017. (Marino, Janine) Modified, to correct conf. date on 8/24/2017 (Marino, Janine). (Main Document 12 replaced on 8/24/2017) (Marino, Janine) |
|
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
answer
Answer to Complaint Third Party Complaint
Wed 08/23 11:24 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Tito Oquendo, Jr by Nelson Cruz. (Hoover, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, August 22, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 08/22 9:48 AM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time -- The request is granted nunc pro tunc . Per my individual rules, such requests are to be made to the assigned magistrate judge. So Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 8/22/2017. (Carosella, Christy) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 08/22 6:18 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at the NYEDs homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that s/he receives electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the 150 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee ... Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 8/22/2017. (Levy, Robert) |
||
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Fri 08/18 11:01 AM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9767672. by Nelson Cruz. (Hoover, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
Wednesday, July 19, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 07/19 11:28 AM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, dated 07 19-2017 by Thomas Dinapoli. (Connell, Monica) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 07/19 11:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Monica Anne Connell on behalf of Thomas Dinapoli (aty to be noticed) (Connell, Monica) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 07/13 1:17 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. Denise L. Nappier served on 6/29/2017, answer due 7/20/2017. (Kelly, Kenneth) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 06/29 3:21 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. Thomas Dinapoli served on 6/29/2017, answer due 7/20/2017. (Kelly, Kenneth) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Wed 06/28 4:05 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. Nelson Cruz waiver sent on 6/28/2017, answer due 8/28/2017. (Kelly, Kenneth) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Wed 06/21 12:16 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Wed 06/21 12:15 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Wed 06/21 12:15 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/21 9:42 AM
COMPLAINT against Nelson Cruz, Thomas Dinapoli, Denise L. Nappier filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9621205 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Kelly, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons for Thomas DiNapoli, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons for Nelson Cruz, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons for Denise L. Nappier | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 06/21 12:10 PM
Case assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |