Choudhury v. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Roslynn R Mauskopf |
Referred: | Steven Tiscione |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03740 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 47:605 Unauthorized publication or use of communications |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 21, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 18, 2017 3:31 AM EST |
Defendant
J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Shabbir Choudhury
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, December 21, 2017 | ||
order
Order Dismissing Case
Thu 12/21 8:21 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The stipulation at16 is so ordered. The action is dismissed with prejudice and with each party to bear his and its own fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to close the case. Ordered by Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf on 12/21/2017. (Taronji, Robert) |
||
Wednesday, December 20, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 12/20 6:05 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Shabbir Choudhury (Tariq, Subhan) |
|
Thursday, December 07, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
minutes
Settlement Conference
Thu 12/07 9:57 AM
Minute Entry for Settlement Conference held on 12/6/2017 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Tariq for Plaintiff; Rao & Goulet for Defendant. Settlement discussions were held and the parties were able to reach a tentative disposition. Parties shall file the stipulation of dismissal by January 8, 2018. (FTR Log #2:34 - 2:35, 3:51 - 3:52.) (Vasquez, Lea) (Main Document 15 replaced on 12/7/2017) (Vasquez, Lea) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter 1 - Exparte Document - to be used ONLY in conjunction with primary event selection
Wed 12/06 11:23 AM
Letter re Ex Parte Settlement Statement by Shabbir Choudhury (Tariq, Subhan) |
|
Friday, December 01, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Letter 1 - Exparte Document - to be used ONLY in conjunction with primary event selection
Fri 12/01 7:15 PM
Letter re Ex Parte Settlement Statement by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A (Rao, Arjun) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Wednesday, September 13, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings
Wed 09/13 3:56 PM
Minute Entry for Initial Conference Hearing held on 9/12/2017 before Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione: Tariq for Plaintiff; Goulet for Defendant. The Court sets the following discovery deadlines: Deadline for completion of Rule 26(a) initial disclosures - 9/15/17; Completion of Phase I discovery - 11/15/17; Deadline for motions to join new parties or amend pleadings - 12/21/17; First requests for production of documents and interrogatories due by - 1/5/18; All fact discovery to be completed by 4/12/18; Exchange of expert reports - 5/12/18; Expert depositions completed by - 6/12/18; All discovery completed by - 6/12/18; Final date to take first step in dispositive motion practice - 7/12/18. An in-person settlement conference will be held on December 6, 2017 at 2:30 p.m. Parties are to submit their respective settlement positions via ex parte electronic filing no later than December 3, 2017. Counsel are to refer to the Settlement Section of this Court's Individual Rules in preparation for the conference. (FTR Log #2:19 - 2:21.) (Vasquez, Lea) |
|
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice(Other)
Fri 09/08 7:33 PM
NOTICE by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A re8 Scheduling Order, /Parties Joint Discovery Plan Worksheet with Proposed Dates (Goulet, Chelsea) |
|
Friday, September 01, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 09/01 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chelsea Goulet on behalf of J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A (notification declined or already on case) (Goulet, Chelsea) |
|
Thursday, August 31, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/31 4:25 PM
Notice of MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice /Notice of Motion to Admit Chelsea L. Goulet Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number 0207-9798767. by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Goulet, Chelsea) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/31 10:39 PM
ORDER granting9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Having reviewed the Pro Hac Vice application9 submitted by Chelsea L. Goulet for Defendant J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. and found it to be in compliance with the local rules concerning attorney admissions, the application is approved. If not already done, the attorney shall register for ECF which is available online at the NYED's homepage. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance and ensure that she receives electronic notifications of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure that the $150 admission fee is submitted to the Clerks Office.. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 8/31/2017. (Vasquez, Lea) |
||
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 08/07 10:25 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: An in-person initial conference will be held at 2:00 p.m. on September 12, 2017 before the undersigned in Hearing Room N324 in the North Wing. All counsel must attend. Counsel are directed to complete the attached Discovery Plan Worksheet and electronically file same with the Court no later than September 8th. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 8/7/2017. (Vasquez, Lea) |
|
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/04 1:11 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Rao, Arjun) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Thu 07/13 8:22 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A answer due 8/4/2017. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 7/13/2017. (Vasquez, Lea) |
||
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Document
Wed 07/12 5:46 PM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File /Consented to Letter Motion from Arjun P. Rao to Magistrate Judge Steven L. Tiscione requesting a three week extension of time to August 4, 2017 to move, answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Rao, Arjun) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 06/28 11:45 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shabbir Choudhury. J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A served on 6/23/2017, answer due 7/14/2017. (Tariq, Subhan) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 06/22 9:57 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 06/22 9:57 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
order
Order Reassigning Case
Thu 06/22 10:53 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 6/22/2017. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/22 9:57 AM
Summons Issued as to J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/21 12:59 PM
COMPLAINT Shabbir Choudhury against J.P. Morgan Chase Bank, N.A filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9622563 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Shabbir Choudhury. (Tariq, Subhan) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/22 9:55 AM
Case assigned to Judge Roslynn R. Mauskopf and Magistrate Judge Cheryl L. Pollak. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |