Ruiz v. Armstrong et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Carol Bagley Amon |
Referred: | Peggy Kuo |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03742 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrim |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 28, 2017 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 18, 2017 4:31 AM EST |
Defendant
Anthony Armstrong
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Danielle Giunta
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
New York City Department of Education
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lisa Perlstein
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Ruiz
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Friday, July 28, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 07/28 6:32 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties that this action be dismissed and be remanded to the Supreme Court of New York for the County of Kings, and IT IS FURTHER STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the parties that each party shall bear its own attorneys' fees and costs with respect to the removal and subsequent dismissal and remand of the Action pursuant to this stipulation and order. Ordered by Judge Carol Bagley Amon on 7/27/2017. (Fernandez, Erica) |
|
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 07/25 2:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Anthony Armstrong, Danielle Giunta, New York City Department of Education, Lisa Perlstein (Pacholec, Tomasz) |
|
Friday, June 30, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 06/30 3:38 PM
ORDER granting5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The time for defendants Anthony Armstrong, Danielle Giunta, New York City Department of Education and Lisa Perlstein to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended nunc pro tunc to July 28, 2017. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo on 6/30/2017. (Riquelme, Claudia) |
||
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 06/28 3:31 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Anthony Armstrong, Danielle Giunta, New York City Department of Education, Lisa Perlstein. (Pacholec, Tomasz) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/28 3:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tomasz Pacholec on behalf of Anthony Armstrong, Danielle Giunta, New York City Department of Education, Lisa Perlstein (aty to be noticed) (Pacholec, Tomasz) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 06/22 10:08 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 06/22 10:07 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
notice
Notice of Removal
Wed 06/21 1:12 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by New York City Department of Education ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0207-9622657) (Pacholec, Tomasz) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/22 10:06 AM
Case assigned to Judge Carol Bagley Amon and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |