Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Khan et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Pamela K Chen |
Referred: | Ramon E Reyes, Jr |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03744 |
Nature of Suit | 490 Other Statutes - Cable/Sat TV |
Cause | 47:605 Unauthorized publication or use of communications |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jul 03, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 18, 2017 3:48 AM EST |
Defendant
Sheraz Khan
|
|
Defendant
Christine Lu
|
|
Plaintiff
Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, August 20, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order(Other)
Mon 08/20 11:33 AM
ORDER: For the reasons stated in the attached, it is ordered that Plaintiff be awarded $1,848 in attorneys' fees and no additional costs. The case remains closed. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 8/20/2018. (Cuevas Ingram, Joanna) |
|
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Declaration
Tue 07/10 12:43 PM
DECLARATION in Support of Request for Attorney's Fees and Costs by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Jekielek, Jon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, July 03, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Judgment - Default
Tue 07/03 12:54 PM
DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff in a total amount of $1,838.00. Ordered by Clerk of Court, by Deputy Clerk Jalitza Poveda, on 7/2/2018. C/M w/Appeals Packet. (Barrett, C) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
6
pgs
order
Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
Mon 07/02 4:31 PM
ORDER MODIFYING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: For the reasons set forth in the attached Memorandum & Order, the Court adopts the10 Report & Recommendation of the Honorable Ramon E. Reyes, Jr., except that Plaintiff will be permitted to submit a motion for attorney's fees and a supporting affidavit within fourteen (14) days after the entry of judgment. 47 U.S.C. § 605(e)(3)(B)(iii); Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(2). The Court awards Plaintiff $1,313.00 in statutory damages and $525.00 in costs, for a total of $1,838.00. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to enter judgment. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 07/02/2018. (Cuevas Ingram, Joanna) |
|
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
respoth
Objection to Report and Recommendations
Mon 06/04 5:08 PM
OBJECTION to10 Report and Recommendations filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Jekielek, Jon) |
|
Monday, May 21, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Report and Recommendations
Mon 05/21 6:31 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re9 MOTION for Default Judgment. For the reasons contained herein, I respectfully recommend that Plaintiff's motion be granted in part and denied in part and judgment be entered against Defendants in the amount of $1,838.00. Objections to Report and Recommendation must be filed with the Clerk of the Court and the Chambers of the Honorable Pamela K. Chen by 6/4/2018.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. on 5/21/2018. (Genovese, Jacqueline) |
|
Thursday, November 30, 2017 | ||
order
Order Referring Motion
Thu 11/30 10:54 AM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: Plaintiff's9 First Motion for Default Judgment is respectfully referred to the Honorable Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 11/30/2017. (Chivers, Jeffrey) |
||
Wednesday, November 29, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 11/29 4:15 PM
First MOTION for Default Judgment by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Jekielek, Jon) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit of Joe Hand, | ||
Att: 3 Commercial Licensing Agreement, | ||
Att: 4 Rate Card, | ||
Att: 5 Affidavit of Raymond Hakimi, | ||
Att: 6 Declaration of Jon Jekielek | ||
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
order
Scheduling Order
Mon 11/06 5:55 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Clerk having entered a default order against both Defendants in this matter on October 3, 2017, Plaintiff will move for a default judgment by December 15, 2018. Failure to do so could result in this matter be dismissed for lack of prosecution. Ordered by Judge Pamela K. Chen on 11/6/2017. (Abdallah, Fida) |
||
Tuesday, October 03, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Tue 10/03 3:11 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendant Sheraz Khan, Christine Lu has failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the default of defendant Sheraz Khan, Christine Lu is hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.(Poveda, Jalitza) |
|
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Request for Certificate of Default
Fri 09/29 1:31 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Jekielek, Jon) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Jon D. Jekielek, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Default | ||
Tuesday, September 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order(Other) ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 09/26 10:58 AM
ORDER: A review of the docket entries in this action indicates that there has been no activity in this case since the Summons was returned executed on 07/12/2017. No later than October 2, 2017 one of the following events must occur: (a) the parties must file a stipulation extending the defendants time to answer, (b) the plaintiff must file a motion for the entry of a notation of default or (c) the defendant must file an answer. If, none of the preceding events occurs by the deadlines set forth above, I will deem the plaintiff to have abandoned the case and will promptly file a Report and Recommendation urging the assigned District Judge to dismiss the case for failure to prosecute. The plaintiffs counsel is directed to provide a copy of this order to his client and to the defendant. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr on 9/26/2017. (Vertus, Miriam) |
|
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 07/12 2:43 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Sheraz Khan served on 7/8/2017, answer due 7/31/2017; Christine Lu served on 7/8/2017, answer due 7/31/2017. (Jekielek, Jon) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit | ||
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 06/22 10:15 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 06/22 10:13 AM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/22 10:13 AM
Summons Issued as to Sheraz Khan, Christine Lu. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Att: 1 Lu summons | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/21 1:50 PM
COMPLAINT against Sheraz Khan, Christine Lu filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9622809 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Jekielek, Jon) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/22 10:11 AM
Case assigned to Judge Pamela K. Chen and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |