Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. DECJAM Inc. et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Sandra J Feuerstein |
Referred: | Arlene R Lindsay |
Case #: | 2:17-cv-03749 |
Nature of Suit | 490 Other Statutes - Cable/Sat TV |
Cause | 47:605 Unauthorized publication or use of communications |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2017 |
Re-opened: | Oct 11, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 06, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 18, 2017 3:33 AM EST |
Defendant
James Gilroy
|
|
Defendant
Declan Wallace
|
|
Defendant
Decjam Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
1
pgs
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 11/07 4:08 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re20 Stipulation of Dismissal - The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SO Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 11/6/2018. (Tirado, Chelsea) |
|
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 11/06 11:31 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Jekielek, Jon) |
|
Tuesday, October 23, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 10/23 11:58 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. re Notice of Hearing, (Jekielek, Jon) |
|
Monday, October 22, 2018 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Mon 10/22 5:42 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Due to a change in the Court's calendar, the conference originally scheduled before Judge Feuerstein on 10/24/2018 is converted into a telephone conference at 2:00 pm. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to initiate the conference call to 631-712-5630. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to serve a copy of this notice on all parties upon receipt. c/ecf (Morabito, Bryan) |
||
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Reopen Case
Thu 10/11 3:38 PM
ORDER granting17 Motion to Reopen Case - Plaintiff, Joe Hand Promotions, Inc., having moved to reopen this case due to failure of the parties to reach a settlement, this Court hereby reopnes and restores the above entitled action to the Court's calendar. A status conference is scheduled for 10/24/2018 at 11:15AM (in person, Courtroom 1010 of the Central Islip Courthouse) SO Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 10/11/2018. (Tirado, Chelsea) |
|
Wednesday, October 10, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Reopen Case
Wed 10/10 11:57 AM
MOTION to Reopen Case by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Jekielek, Jon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Thu 09/06 1:50 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held on 9/5/2018 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein: Civil Cause for Status Conference. Counsel for Plaintiff: Jon Damon Jekielek. Counsel for Defendant: Chris Ross. Court Reporter: E. Combs. Case called. Case closed with leave to reopen on 10 days notice in no event later than 10/10/2018. (Tirado, Chelsea) |
|
Thursday, August 30, 2018 | ||
notice
Notice of Hearing
Thu 08/30 4:47 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Due to a change in the Court's calendar, the conference originally scheduled before Judge Feuerstein on 9/5/2018 is converted into a telephone conference at 11:00 am. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to initiate the conference call to 631-712-5630. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to serve a copy of this notice on all parties upon receipt. c/ecf (Morabito, Bryan) |
||
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 07/10 6:11 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by All Defendants. (Ross, Christopher) |
|
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 07/06 10:15 AM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall file their Answer by 7/10/18. The Status Conference set for 7/11/18 is adjourned to 9/5/18 at 11:15 AM. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 7/6/2018. (Roman, Joshua) |
||
Thursday, July 05, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 07/05 3:37 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Jekielek, Jon) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
service
Certificate of Service
Mon 07/02 4:59 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. re12 Initial Conference Hearing,, Set Hearings, (Jekielek, Jon) |
|
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
minutes
Initial Conference Hearing ~Util - Set Hearings
Mon 07/02 2:50 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held on 6/28/2018 before Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein: Civil Cause for Initial Conference. Counsel for Plaintiff: Jon Damon Jekielek via telephone. Counsel for Defendant: Not Present. Court Reporter: E. Combs. Case called. A further status conference is scheduled before Judge Feuerstein on 7/11/2018 at 11:15AM. Plaintiff's counsel is directed to serve notice of this conference on all parties and file a certificate of service with the Court. (Tirado, Chelsea) |
|
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 05/31 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Ross on behalf of Decjam Inc., James Gilroy, Declan Wallace (aty to be noticed) (Ross, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
service
Certificate of Service
Wed 04/25 12:28 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. re Order,, (Jekielek, Jon) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Wed 04/25 9:36 AM
ORDER re9 Clerk's Entry of Default: In light of the Clerk's Entry of Default against all Defendants, Plaintiff is directed to file and serve its Motion for Default Judgment and proposed form of judgment by May 31, 2018. A hearing in aid of judgment shall be conducted on June 28, 2018 at 11:15 a.m. (Courtroom 1010 in the Central Islip Federal Courthouse). Plaintiff(s) shall serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file proof of such service with the Court. Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 4/25/2018. c/ECF (Killigrew, Patricia) |
||
Tuesday, April 24, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
order
Clerks Entry of Default
Tue 04/24 9:23 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT: It appearing from the docket maintained in this action that defendants Decjam Inc., James Gilroy, and Declan Wallace have failed to appear or otherwise defend this action, the defaults of defendants Decjam Inc., James Gilroy, and Declan Wallace are hereby noted pursuant to Rule 55a of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Toritto, Jim) |
|
Thursday, April 05, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
misc
Request for Certificate of Default
Thu 04/05 12:23 PM
Request for Certificate of Default by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Jekielek, Jon) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Jon D. Jekielek, | ||
Att: 2 Certificate of Default | ||
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 04/04 4:49 PM
Case Reassigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein. Judge Leonard D. Wexler no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Corsini, Alexander) |
||
Friday, July 07, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed
Fri 07/07 12:41 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Decjam Inc. served on 7/5/2017, answer due 7/26/2017; James Gilroy served on 7/5/2017, answer due 7/26/2017; Declan Wallace served on 7/5/2017, answer due 7/26/2017. (Jekielek, Jon) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit, | ||
Att: 2 Affidavit | ||
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/22 3:33 PM
Summons Issued as to Declan Wallace. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/22 3:32 PM
Summons Issued as to James Gilroy. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 06/22 3:32 PM
Summons Issued as to Decjam Inc.. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 06/22 3:21 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet
Thu 06/22 1:43 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Jekielek, Jon) |
|
utility
Incorrect Case-Document Information
Thu 06/22 8:16 AM
Incorrect Document Entry Information. The Civil Cover Sheet was not filled out correctly - Specifically on Page 2 the NY-E Division of Business Rule 50.1(d)(2)section of the document; Question 1 indicates Yes; However, this is not a removal from a NYS Court located in Nassau or Suffolk County; Counsel is directed to submit a corrected Civil Cover Sheet using the event Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Flanagan, Doreen) |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/22 3:25 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Leonard D. Wexler and Magistrate Judge Arlene R. Lindsay. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (McMahon, Carol) |
||
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 06/21 4:23 PM
COMPLAINT against DECJAM Inc., James Gilroy, Declan Wallace filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0207-9623799 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Jekielek, Jon) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Proposed Summons |