Quantex Laboratories, Inc
New Jersey Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Michael B Kaplan |
Case #: | 3:17-bk-22754 |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | May 21, 2018 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Small Business | Yes |
Debtor
Quantex Laboratories, Inc
300 Eastpark Blvd Ste 100
Cranbury, NJ 08512 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee.
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102 |
Docket last updated: 06/21/2017 8:00 PM EDT |
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
crditcrd
Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt
Thu 06/22 10:03 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 17-22754 ) [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A34383418, fee amount $ 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
1 | 1
8
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Thu 06/22 10:02 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Paul Gauer on behalf of Quantex Laboratories, Inc. Chapter 11 Small Business Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 12/19/2017. Chapter 11 Small Business Plan due by 04/18/2018. (Gauer, Paul) |
|
2 | 2
5
pgs
motion
Expedited Consideration of First Day Matters (For Ch. 11 Cases Only)
Thu 06/22 11:06 AM
Application for Expedited Consideration of First Day Matters Filed by Paul Gauer on behalf of Quantex Laboratories, Inc. (Gauer, Paul) |
|
3 | 3
motion
Retention (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner)
Thu 06/22 11:42 AM
Application For Retention of Professional Paul Gauer as debtor counsel Filed by Paul Gauer on behalf of Quantex Laboratories, Inc. The follow up deadline is 07/13/2017. (Gauer, Paul) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Thu 06/22 11:52 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Michael E. Brown on behalf of Sun National Bank. (Brown, Michael) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Notice of Appearance and Request
Thu 06/22 11:53 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Kyle Francis Eingorn on behalf of Sun National Bank. (Eingorn, Kyle) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Retention (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner)
Thu 06/22 1:05 PM
Application For Retention of Professional Paul Gauer Filed by Paul Gauer on behalf of Quantex Laboratories, Inc. The follow up deadline is 07/13/2017. (Gauer, Paul) |
|
7 | 7
motion
Retention (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner)
Thu 06/22 1:45 PM
Application For Retention of Professional Andrew M. Baron as Special Counsel Filed by Paul Gauer on behalf of Quantex Laboratories, Inc. The follow up deadline is 07/13/2017. (Gauer, Paul) |
|
8 | 8
court
Notice of Missing Documents
Fri 06/23 9:25 AM
Notice of Missing Documents. . Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, List of Equity Security Holders, List of All Creditors, Statement of Corporate Ownership, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G,H. Incomplete Filings due by 7/6/2017. (gan) |