CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON et al v. TRUMP et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Christopher R Cooper |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01228 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 44:2107 Presidential Recordings and Materials Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 20, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 19, 2017 4:11 AM EST |
Defendant
EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DONALD J. TRUMP
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Mar 20 2018
MEMORANDUM OPINION re 20 Order granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/20/2018. (lccrc2) |
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 22, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 07/25 3:13 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to25 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON, NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE ; USCA Case Number 18-5150 (zrdj) |
|
Att: 1 USCA Judgment | ||
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Transcript
Mon 07/30 8:17 AM
TRANSCRIPT OF MOTION HEARING before Judge Christopher R. Cooper held on January 17, 2018; Page Numbers: 1-39. Date of Issuance:July 30, 2018. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa A. Moreira, RDR, CRR, Telephone number (202) 354-3187, Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the[LINK:Transcript Order Form] For the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 8/20/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/30/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/28/2018.(Moreira, Lisa) |
|
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
31 | 31
appeal
Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA
Mon 07/02 2:58 PM
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re30 Amended Notice of Appeal ;USCA Case Number 18-5150 (ztd) |
|
Friday, June 29, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
appeal
Amended Notice of Appeal
Fri 06/29 12:35 PM
Amended NOTICE OF APPEAL re appeal25 by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON, NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE. (Clarke, George) |
|
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
29 | 29
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Alter Judgment
Mon 06/25 4:10 PM
ORDER denying22 Plaintiffs' Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 6/25/2018. (lccrc2) |
|
Tuesday, May 29, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Tue 05/29 3:42 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re22 MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON, NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE. (Clarke, George) |
|
Wednesday, May 23, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
appeal
USCA Order
Wed 05/23 6:30 PM
ORDER of USCA holding case in abeyance as to25 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON, NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE ; USCA Case Number 18-5150 (ztd) |
|
appeal
USCA Case Number
Wed 05/23 5:38 PM
USCA Case Number 18-5150 for25 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court, filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON, NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE. (zrdj) |
||
Friday, May 18, 2018 | ||
26 | 26
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Fri 05/18 2:32 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid this date re25 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (jf) |
|
25 | 25
appeal
Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
Fri 05/18 11:48 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to20 Order on Motion to Dismiss, by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON, NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0090-5488882. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Clarke, George) |
|
Tuesday, May 15, 2018 | ||
24 | 24
20
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Tue 05/15 3:56 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re22 MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES, DONALD J. TRUMP.(Myers, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 04/27 10:17 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' opposition due by 5/15/2018. Plaintiffs' Reply due by 5/29/2018. (lsj) |
||
Thursday, April 26, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Briefing Schedule
Thu 04/26 5:19 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting23 Joint Motion for Briefing Schedule. Defendants' opposition shall be due by May 15, 2018 and Plaintiffs' reply shall be due by May 29, 2018. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 4/26/2018. (lccrc2) |
||
Wednesday, April 25, 2018 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Briefing Schedule
Wed 04/25 11:27 AM
Joint MOTION for Briefing Schedule re: Plaintiffs' Motion to Alter Judgment by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES, DONALD J. TRUMP(Myers, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, April 17, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Alter Judgment
Tue 04/17 3:13 PM
MOTION to Alter Judgment by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON, NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE(Clarke, George) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, March 20, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
21
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Tue 03/20 4:36 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION re20 Order granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/20/2018. (lccrc2) |
|
20 | 20
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 03/20 4:35 PM
ORDER granting11 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. For the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss is granted. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 3/20/2018. (lccrc2) |
|
Wednesday, January 17, 2018 | ||
minutes
Motion Hearing
Wed 01/17 12:24 PM
Minute Entry for Motion Hearing held before Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 1/17/2018. Defendants' Motion11 to Dismiss argued. Motion taken under advisement; forthcoming Order. (Court Reporter Lisa Moreira) (lsj) |
||
Wednesday, December 13, 2017 | ||
order
.Order
Wed 12/13 10:59 AM
MINUTE ORDER: The parties are to appear for a hearing on the pending motion to dismiss on January 17, 2018 at 10:00 am in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/13/2017. (lccrc2) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Wed 12/13 11:25 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27A before Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (lsj) |
||
Tuesday, November 21, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Tue 11/21 6:07 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Myers, Steven) |
|
Monday, November 06, 2017 | ||
notice
Notice of Corrected Docket Entry
Mon 11/06 11:54 AM
NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Document No. re17 Affidavit, was entered in error at the request of counsel as a duplicate to18 .(zjf) |
||
Friday, November 03, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Affidavit
Fri 11/03 8:17 PM
AFFIDAVIT re14 Memorandum in Opposition by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON, NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE.(Clarke, George) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
17 | 17
misc
Affidavit
Fri 11/03 8:03 PM
AFFIDAVIT re14 Memorandum in Opposition by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON, NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE.(Clarke, George) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D | ||
16 | 16
misc
Affidavit
Fri 11/03 8:01 PM
AFFIDAVIT re14 Memorandum in Opposition by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON, NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE.(Clarke, George) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit G, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit H, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit I, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit J | ||
15 | 15
misc
Affidavit
Fri 11/03 7:55 PM
AFFIDAVIT re14 Memorandum in Opposition by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON, NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE. (Clarke, George) |
|
14 | 14
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Fri 11/03 7:52 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON, NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE.(Clarke, George) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 13, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 10/13 2:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting12 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss shall be due by November 3, 2017. Defendants' Reply shall be due by November 21, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/13/2017. (lccrc2) |
||
Thursday, October 12, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 10/12 8:48 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting13 Motion for Admission to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 10/12/2017. (lccrc2) |
||
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 10/11 12:16 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Katie Michelle Bailo Marcusse, :Firm- Baker & McKenzie LLP, :Address- 100 New Bridge Street, London EX4V 6JA, United Kingdom. Phone No. - +44 20 7919 1508. Fax No. - +44 20 7919 1999 Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5153935. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON, NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE(Clarke, George) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, October 10, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 10/10 8:45 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to11 MOTION to Dismiss by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON, NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE(Clarke, George) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 06, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
47
pgs
motion
Dismiss Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Fri 10/06 3:16 PM
MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES, DONALD J. TRUMP(Myers, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, August 24, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Thu 08/24 6:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting10 Motion for Admission to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/24/2017. (lccrc2) |
||
Wednesday, August 23, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Wed 08/23 5:10 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice :Attorney Name- Angela Coin Vigil, :Firm- Baker & McKenzie LLP, :Address- 1111 Brickell Avenue, Suite 1700, Miami, FL 33131. Phone No. - 305-789-8904. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0090-5086860. Fee Status: Fee Paid. by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON, NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE(Clarke, George) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, August 01, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Tue 08/01 8:46 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting9 Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File their Answer. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants shall file their Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint on or by October 6, 2017. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 8/1/2017. (lccrc2) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 08/01 10:42 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 10/6/2017 (lsj) |
||
Thursday, July 27, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Thu 07/27 5:20 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,, by EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES, DONALD J. TRUMP(Myers, Steven) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 07/27 5:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A. Myers on behalf of All Defendants (Myers, Steven) |
|
Monday, July 10, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
service
Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
Mon 07/10 8:34 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 6/23/2017. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 8/22/2017. (Oldak, Mireille) |
|
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/23 9:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anne L. Weismann on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Weismann, Anne) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
notice
LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Thu 06/22 1:32 PM
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE (Oldak, Mireille) |
|
4 | 4
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Thu 06/22 12:21 PM
SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to EXECUTIVE OFFICE OF THE PRESIDENT OF THE UNITED STATES, DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Consent Form)(zsb) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/22 9:11 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Mireille R. Oldak on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Oldak, Mireille) |
|
2 | 2
notice
LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Thu 06/22 8:33 AM
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON (Oldak, Mireille) |
|
1 | 1
38
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/22 8:14 AM
COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY, INJUNCTIVE, AND MANDAMUS RELIEF against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5001574) filed by NATIONAL SECURITY ARCHIVE, CITIZENS FOR RESPONSIBILITY AND ETHICS IN WASHINGTON.(Clarke, George) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons to the President of the United States, | ||
Att: 3 Summons to the Executive Office of the President, | ||
Att: 4 Summons to the Attorney General, | ||
Att: 5 Summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Columbia | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/22 12:09 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) |