POWELL v. HARVARD UNIVERSITY et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Ellen S Huvelle |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01229 |
Nature of Suit | 320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Jun 25, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 19, 2017 4:10 AM EST |
Defendant
CHARLES HAIGHT
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HARVARD UNIVERSITY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HARVARD UNIVERSITY JOHN F. KENNEDY SCHOOL OF GOVERNMENT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
STEPHEN POWELL
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
3
pgs
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 06/25 12:50 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by STEPHEN POWELL. (Clare, Thomas) |
|
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Fri 06/01 3:08 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re15 MOTION to Dismiss Harvard University's Counterclaim filed by STEPHEN POWELL. (Clare, Thomas) |
|
Friday, May 18, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
14
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Fri 05/18 2:08 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re15 MOTION to Dismiss Harvard University's Counterclaim filed by CHARLES HAIGHT, HARVARD UNIVERSITY, HARVARD UNIVERSITY JOHN F. KENNEDY SCHOOL OF GOVERNMENT. (Siegel, Nathan) |
|
Wednesday, May 09, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 05/09 10:24 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting16 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re15 MOTION to Dismiss Harvard University's Counterclaim : Upon consideration of the Joint Motion for Extension of Time, it is hereby ORDERED that the Joint Motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that defendant Harvard University's time to respond to plaintiff's motion to dismiss Harvard's Counterclaim is extended to and including May 18, 2018; and it is FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's time to submit a reply in support of his motion to dismiss the Counterclaim is extended to and including June 1, 2018. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on May 9, 2018. (AG) |
||
Tuesday, May 08, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Tue 05/08 5:24 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to15 MOTION to Dismiss Harvard University's Counterclaim by CHARLES HAIGHT, HARVARD UNIVERSITY, HARVARD UNIVERSITY JOHN F. KENNEDY SCHOOL OF GOVERNMENT(Zycherman, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, April 27, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
motion
Dismiss
Fri 04/27 12:52 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Harvard University's Counterclaim by STEPHEN POWELL(Clare, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 11, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 04/11 3:29 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 11/22/2018. Initial Disclosure due by 4/29/2018. Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 9/1/2018. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 10/1/2018. Status Conference set for 12/5/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf) |
||
Wednesday, April 04, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
order
.Order
Wed 04/04 3:58 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on April 4, 2018. (lcesh2) |
|
Thursday, March 22, 2018 | ||
order
.Order
Thu 03/22 4:28 PM
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Initial Scheduling Conference currently scheduled for March 28, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. is continued until April 4, 2018, at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom 23A. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 22, 2018. (lcesh2) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 03/22 5:29 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/4/2018 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf) |
||
Wednesday, March 21, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
misc
Meet and Confer Statement
Wed 03/21 4:37 PM
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Clare, Thomas) |
|
Saturday, March 03, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Continue Set/Reset Hearings
Sat 03/03 7:54 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting12 Consent Motion to Continue: Upon consideration of the Joint Motion to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference filed by all parties, it is hereby ORDERED that the joint motion is GRANTED; it is further ORDERED that the Initial Scheduling Conference currently scheduledfor March 7, 2018 is continued until March 28, 2018, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 23A. The parties are reminded that their meet and confer report, as prescribed by the Federal Civil Rules and LCvR 16.3, is due by no later than March 21, 2018. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on March 3, 2018. (AG) |
||
Friday, March 02, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Continue
Fri 03/02 5:29 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference by CHARLES HAIGHT, HARVARD UNIVERSITY, HARVARD UNIVERSITY JOHN F. KENNEDY SCHOOL OF GOVERNMENT (Siegel, Nathan) |
|
Tuesday, January 23, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Continue Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Tue 01/23 9:02 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting11 Joint Motion to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference: Upon consideration of the Joint Motion to Continue the Initial Scheduling Conference presently scheduled for January 23, 2018, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the Initial Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED until March 7, 2018, at 2:15 p.m. in Courtroom 23A; and it is further ORDERED that the parties' meet and confer report is due by February 28, 2018. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on January 23, 2018. (AG) |
||
Monday, January 22, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Continue
Mon 01/22 6:05 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Status Conference by CHARLES HAIGHT, HARVARD UNIVERSITY, HARVARD UNIVERSITY JOHN F. KENNEDY SCHOOL OF GOVERNMENT(Zycherman, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 16, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 01/16 11:27 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2018 at 3:30 PM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (gdf) |
||
Friday, January 12, 2018 | ||
order
.Order
Fri 01/12 9:48 AM
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that the Initial Scheduling Conference presently set for January 23, 2018, at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 23A is CONTINUED until 3:30 p.m. that same day. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on January 12, 2018. (AG) |
||
Tuesday, December 26, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Tue 12/26 3:25 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2018 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 23A before Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (tj) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 12/26 3:26 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Meet & Confer Statement due by 1/16/2018. (tj) |
||
Friday, December 22, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
order
.Order
Fri 12/22 2:48 PM
ORDER setting Initial Scheduling Conference for January 23, 2018, at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom 23A. Meet and confer report due by January 16, 2018. See order for details. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on December 22, 2017. (AG) |
|
9 | 9
56
pgs
answer
Answer to Complaint Counterclaim
Fri 12/22 1:16 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against STEPHEN POWELL by CHARLES HAIGHT, HARVARD UNIVERSITY JOHN F. KENNEDY SCHOOL OF GOVERNMENT, HARVARD UNIVERSITY.(Siegel, Nathan) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Mon 11/20 6:50 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by CHARLES HAIGHT, HARVARD UNIVERSITY, HARVARD UNIVERSITY JOHN F. KENNEDY SCHOOL OF GOVERNMENT(Zycherman, Lisa) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 11/20 7:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting8 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Upon consideration of the Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint filed herewith by defendants' Harvard University (a/k/a President and Fellows of Harvard College), Harvard University John F. Kennedy School of Government, and Charles Haight ("Defendants"), and any opposition thereto, it is hereby ORDERED that Defendants' motion is granted, and that the deadline for all Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including December 22, 2017. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on November 20, 2017. (AG) |
||
Wednesday, October 11, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 10/11 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Beth Zycherman on behalf of CHARLES HAIGHT, HARVARD UNIVERSITY, HARVARD UNIVERSITY JOHN F. KENNEDY SCHOOL OF GOVERNMENT (Zycherman, Lisa) |
|
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time to File Answer
Wed 10/11 10:52 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by CHARLES HAIGHT, HARVARD UNIVERSITY, HARVARD UNIVERSITY JOHN F. KENNEDY SCHOOL OF GOVERNMENT(Siegel, Nathan) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 10/11 11:45 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Upon consideration of defendants Harvard University (a/k/a President and Fellows of Harvard College), Harvard University John F. Kennedy School of Government, and Charles Haight ("The Harvard University Defendants") Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint, it is hereby ORDERED that motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the deadline for all The Harvard University Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint is extended to and including November 22, 2017. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on October 11, 2017. (AG) |
||
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Thu 09/21 5:37 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHARLES HAIGHT served on 9/21/2017, answer due 10/12/2017 (Clare, Thomas) |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Thu 09/21 5:36 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. HARVARD UNIVERSITY served on 9/20/2017, answer due 10/11/2017 (Clare, Thomas) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Thu 09/21 5:35 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. HARVARD UNIVERSITY JOHN F. KENNEDY SCHOOL OF GOVERNMENT served on 9/20/2017, answer due 10/11/2017 (Clare, Thomas) |
|
Sunday, September 17, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Sun 09/17 9:38 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Time to effectuate service upon party due by 9/22/2017. (gdf) |
||
Friday, September 15, 2017 | ||
order
.Order
Fri 09/15 3:53 PM
MINUTE ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO COMPLETE SERVICE OF PROCESS: Under Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, a plaintiff must serve a defendant with a summons and a complaint within 90 days after the filing of the complaint. To date, the Court has no record that the defendant has been served with a summons and complaint, and the 90-day time limit will soon expire. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that on or before September 22, 2017, plaintiff must either: (1) file with the Court proof that each defendant has been served, or (2) provide the Court with a written explanation for why service of process has not been completed. If plaintiff fails to comply with this order, or if the Court determines that plaintiff has not shown good cause for the failure to comply with Rule 4(m), this case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Ellen S. Huvelle on September 15, 2017. (AG) |
||
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Mon 06/26 10:10 AM
SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to CHARLES HAIGHT, HARVARD UNIVERSITY, HARVARD UNIVERSITY JOHN F. KENNEDY SCHOOL OF GOVERNMENT. (Attachment: #1 Consent Form)(zsb) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/26 10:08 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Ellen S. Huvelle. (zsb) |
||
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/22 2:33 PM
COMPLAINT against CHARLES HAIGHT, HARVARD UNIVERSITY, HARVARD UNIVERSITY JOHN F. KENNEDY SCHOOL OF GOVERNMENT with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5002380) filed by STEPHEN POWELL.(Clare, Thomas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Summons to Charles Haight, | ||
Att: 4 Summons Summons to Harvard University, | ||
Att: 5 Summons Summons to Harvard University Kennedy School of Government |