HORTON v. ESPINDOLA et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Amit P Mehta |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01230 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 29:160(1) National Labor Relations Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2017 |
Terminated: | Dec 20, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 19, 2017 4:04 AM EST |
Defendant
D.C. SOCCER LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
FABIAN ESPINDOLA
|
|
Defendant
BENJAMIN OLSEN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
CHARLES A. HORTON
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
MAJOR LEAGUE SOCCER, LLC
Terminated: 11/13/2017
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, December 20, 2019 | ||
47 | 47
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 12/20 1:33 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by CHARLES A. HORTON. (Foret, L.) |
|
Friday, November 08, 2019 | ||
46 | 46
order
.Order
Fri 11/08 3:56 PM
ORDER setting the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: Plaintiff shall provide any expert reports and disclosures on or before December 16, 2019; Defendants shall file any rebuttal expert reports and disclosures on or before February 17, 2020; the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report regarding the status of discovery on or before February 21, 2020; all discovery shall conclude on April 16, 2020; and a Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for April 23, 2020 at 10 a.m. in Courtroom 10. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/08/2019. (lcapm2) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 11/14 3:03 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 12/16/2019. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 2/17/2020. Joint Status Report due by 2/21/2020. Discovery due by 4/16/2020. Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 4/23/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd) |
||
Thursday, November 07, 2019 | ||
45 | 45
misc
Status Report
Thu 11/07 11:49 AM
Joint STATUS REPORT and Proposed Scheduling Order by CHARLES A. HORTON.(Foret, L.) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, October 11, 2019 | ||
minutes
Settlement Conference
Fri 10/11 2:32 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather: Settlement Conference held on 10/11/2019. (lcrm2) |
||
Thursday, September 26, 2019 | ||
44 | 44
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings
Thu 09/26 7:22 PM
ORDER Settlement Conference set for 10/11/2019 at 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather on 09/26/2019. (lcrm2) |
|
Tuesday, September 24, 2019 | ||
43 | 43
misc
Status Report
Tue 09/24 12:54 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by CHARLES A. HORTON. (Foret, L.) |
|
Friday, August 16, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Fri 08/16 10:00 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting41 Motion to Stay. In view of ongoing settlement efforts, and at the parties' request, this matter is hereby stayed until October 31, 2019. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/16/2019. (lcapm2) |
||
Thursday, August 15, 2019 | ||
42 | 42
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 08/19 9:03 AM
Case randomly Reassigned to Referral Magistrate Judge Robin M. Meriweather. Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson is no longer assigned to the case. (rj) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
motion
Stay
Wed 08/14 1:21 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay Until October 31, 2019 by CHARLES A. HORTON(Foret, L.) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support | ||
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Mediation
Fri 08/02 4:31 PM
ORDER granting39 Joint Motion for Mediation. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/2/2019 (lcapm2) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 08/05 1:25 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 9/24/2019. (zjd) |
||
utility
Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
Mon 08/05 9:12 PM
CASE RANDOMLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Deborah A. Robinson for mediation. (zad) |
||
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
motion
Mediation
Wed 07/24 9:45 AM
Joint MOTION for Mediation Referral by CHARLES A. HORTON (Foret, L.) |
|
Friday, April 26, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Modify
Fri 04/26 9:51 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting38 Motion to Modify Schedule. The Scheduling Order, ECF No.32 as amended by the Minute Order of 2/26/2019 will be modified as follows: August 15, 2019: Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2) expert reports and disclosures; September 17, 2019: Defendants' Rule 26(a)(2) expert reports and disclosures; September 23, 2019: Submission of Joint Status Report regarding status of discovery; December 2, 2019: Conclusion of discovery; December 4, 2019: Post-Discovery Status Conference at 10 a.m. The parties are hereby put on notice that, absent exceptional circumstances, the court is unlikely to grant an additional request to extend the discovery period. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 4/26/2019. (lcapm2) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 04/26 11:04 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Reports and Disclosures due by 8/15/2019. Defendants' Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Reports and Disclosures due by 9/17/2019. Joint Status Report due by 9/23/2019. Discovery shall conclude on 12/2/2019. Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 12/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd) |
||
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
motion
Modify
Wed 04/24 4:10 PM
Consent MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by CHARLES A. HORTON(Foret, L.) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 26, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
motion
Modify
Tue 02/26 10:01 AM
Consent MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by CHARLES A. HORTON(Foret, L.) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion to Modify
Tue 02/26 6:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting37 Motion to Modify Schedule. The Scheduling Order, ECF No.32 will be modified as follows: May 15, 2019: Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2) expert reports and disclosures; June 17, 2019: Defendants' Rule 26(a)(2) expert reports and disclosures; June 21, 2019: Submission of Joint Status Report regarding status of discovery; September 20, 2019: Conclusion of discovery; September 30, 2019: Post-Discovery Status Conference at 10 a.m. in Courtroom 10. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 2/26/2019. (lcapm2) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Sun 03/10 6:07 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery shall conclude 9/20/2019. Plaintiff Rule 26(a)(2) due by 5/15/2019. Defendant Rule 26(a)(2) due by 6/17/2019. Status Report due by 6/21/2019 Status Conference set for 9/30/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd) |
||
Friday, January 04, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Fri 01/04 9:16 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by L. Palmer Foret (Foret, L.) |
|
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
35 | 35
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Modify
Tue 11/20 5:33 PM
ORDER granting Plaintiff's consent motion to revise the schedule for further discovery proceedings in this matter. The schedule for further proceedings in this matter is as follows: (1) Plaintiff shall provide any expert reports and disclosures, consistent with Rule 26(a)(2), on or before March 15, 2019; (2) Defendants shall provide any rebuttal expert reports and disclosures, consistent with Rule 26(a)(2), on or before April 15, 2019; (3) The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report regarding the status of discovery on or before April 19, 2019; (4) Discovery shall conclude on July 31, 2019; and (5) A Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for August 6, 2019, at 11 a.m. in Courtroom 10. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/20/2018. (lcapm2) |
|
34 | 34
motion
Modify
Tue 11/20 4:38 PM
Consent MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by CHARLES A. HORTON(Foret, L.) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 11/21 3:39 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2) Expert Reports and Disclosures due by 3/15/2019. Defendants' Rule 26(a)(2) Rebuttal Expert Reports and Disclosures due by 4/15/2019. Joint Status Report due by 4/19/2019. Discovery shall conclude on 7/31/2019. Post-Discovery Status Conference set for 8/6/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zjd) |
||
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
33 | 33
misc
Rule 26a1 Statement
Tue 09/11 11:55 AM
RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Johnson, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, August 23, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 08/23 11:52 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Disclosure due by 9/12/2018. Amended pleadings due by 9/26/2018. Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2) due by 12/14/2018. Defendants' Rule 26(a)(2) due by 1/14/2019. Joint Status Report due by 1/18/2019. Discovery to conclude by 5/10/2019. Status Conference set for 5/14/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (hmc) |
||
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
32 | 32
order
.Order
Wed 08/22 6:09 PM
ORDER setting the following schedule for further proceedings in this matter: the parties shall supplement their initial disclosures, as required under Rule 26(a)(1), on or before September 12, 2018; the deadline for joinder of parties and amendment of pleadings is September 26, 2018; Plaintiff shall provide any expert reports and disclosures, consistent with Rule 26(a)(2), on or before December 14, 2018; Defendants shall provide any rebuttal expert reports and disclosures, consistent with Rule 26(a)(2), on or before January 14, 2019; the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report regarding the status of discovery on or before January 18, 2019; discovery shall conclude on May 10, 2019; and a Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for May 14, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/22/2018. (lcapm2) |
|
31 | 31
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Wed 08/22 10:26 AM
ANSWER to14 Amended Complaint by BENJAMIN OLSEN, D.C. SOCCER LLC.(Johnson, Matthew) Modified on 8/22/2018 to correct filers (jf) |
|
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Summary Judgment
Fri 08/10 12:32 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by MAJOR LEAGUE SOCCER, LLC. (See Court's29 Order directing the conversion of entry17 ) (jf) |
|
29 | 29
15
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Wed 08/08 10:47 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER re: Defendants'17 Motion to Dismiss. The court converts Defendants'17 Motion to Dismiss into a motion for summary judgment, and denies that motion without prejudice. See the attached Memorandum Opinion & Order for details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 8/8/2018. (lcapm2) |
|
Wednesday, March 07, 2018 | ||
28 | 28
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Wed 03/07 3:14 PM
SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to FABIAN ESPINDOLA. (jf) |
|
Tuesday, March 06, 2018 | ||
27 | 27
cmp
Request for Summons to Issue
Tue 03/06 12:30 PM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE filed by CHARLES A. HORTON.(Foret, L.) |
|
Tuesday, December 19, 2017 | ||
26 | 26
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Tue 12/19 12:44 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by D.C. SOCCER LLC. (Johnson, Matthew) |
|
Monday, November 20, 2017 | ||
25 | 25
motion
Extension of Time to
Mon 11/20 11:22 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's Oppositon to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by D.C. SOCCER LLC (Johnson, Matthew) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Mon 11/20 4:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants'25 Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' Reply shall now be due on or before December 20, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/20/2017. (lcapm2) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 11/22 4:34 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Defendants' Reply due by 12/20/2017. (zcdw) |
||
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Wed 11/15 9:34 AM
MINUTE ORDER granting Defendants'24 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Defendants' Reply shall now be due on or before November 30, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 11/15/2017. (lcapm2) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 11/17 11:35 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Reply to17 due by 11/30/2017. (zcdw) |
||
Tuesday, November 14, 2017 | ||
24 | 24
motion
Extension of Time to
Tue 11/14 3:55 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by MAJOR LEAGUE SOCCER, LLC (Johnson, Matthew) |
|
Monday, November 13, 2017 | ||
23 | 23
respm
Response to motion
Mon 11/13 7:59 PM
RESPONSE re17 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Opposition To Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by CHARLES A. HORTON.(Foret, L.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit 5, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit 6, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit 7, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit 8, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit 9, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit 10, | ||
Att: 11 Text of Proposed Order | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice (Other)
Mon 11/13 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Dismissal of Defendant Major League Soccer, LLC by CHARLES A. HORTON (Foret, L.) |
|
Thursday, October 26, 2017 | ||
21 | 21
motion
Extension of Time to
Thu 10/26 11:38 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by CHARLES A. HORTON (Foret, L.) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Thu 10/26 2:53 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiff's21 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition. Plaintiff's Opposition is now due on or before November 13, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 10/26/2017. (lcapm2) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Sat 10/28 7:01 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to17 due by 11/13/2017. (zcdw) |
||
Friday, September 29, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to
Fri 09/29 5:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting20 Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's Opposition to17 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss shall be filed on or before October 30, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/29/2017. (lcapm2) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 09/29 5:36 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Response to17 due by 10/30/2017. (zcdw) |
||
Thursday, September 28, 2017 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Extension of Time to
Thu 09/28 9:34 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by CHARLES A. HORTON (Foret, L.) |
|
Thursday, September 21, 2017 | ||
19 | 19
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Thu 09/21 11:19 AM
ORDER entering18 Stipulated Protective Order. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 09/21/2017. (lcapm3) Modified on 9/21/2017 to add main document (zcdw) |
|
Wednesday, September 20, 2017 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Protective Order
Wed 09/20 11:29 AM
MOTION for Protective Order Stipulated Protective Order by MAJOR LEAGUE SOCCER, LLC (Johnson, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, September 07, 2017 | ||
17 | 17
motion
Dismiss
Thu 09/07 3:55 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by MAJOR LEAGUE SOCCER, LLC(Johnson, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Supplement | ||
Monday, August 21, 2017 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Rule 26a1 Statement
Mon 08/21 10:53 AM
RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Johnson, Matthew) |
|
Friday, August 18, 2017 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Rule 26a1 Statement
Fri 08/18 3:55 PM
RULE 26a1 STATEMENT. (Foret, L.) |
|
Monday, August 07, 2017 | ||
14 | 14
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 08/08 3:03 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against D.C. SOCCER LLC, FABIAN ESPINDOLA, MAJOR LEAGUE SOCCER, LLC, BENJAMIN OLSEN with Jury Demand filed by CHARLES A. HORTON.(znmw) |
|
13 | 13
order
.Order
Mon 08/07 6:14 PM
ENTERED IN ERROR............ORDER setting the schedule for further proceedings in this matter: The parties shall submit their initial disclosures, as required under Rule 26(a)(1), on or before August 28, 2017; The deadline for joinder of parties and amendment of pleadings is October 16, 2017; Fact discovery shall conclude on November 30, 2017; The parties shall make any proponent expert disclosures, consistent with Rule 26(a)(2), on or before January 2, 2018; The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report regarding the status of discovery on or before January 17, 2018; The parties shall make any rebuttal expert disclosures, consistent with Rule 26(a)(2), on or before February 15, 2018; The parties shall provide any reply expert reports on or before March 1, 2018; Discovery shall conclude on March 30, 2018; and a Post-Discovery Status Conference is set for April 4, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/07/2017. (lcapm2) Modified on 8/7/2017 (zcdw) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File
Mon 08/07 12:40 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting12 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. The court shall consider as operative [12-3] Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed as Exhibit 3 to this Motion. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 08/07/2017. (lcapm2) |
||
Friday, August 04, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Leave to File Document
Fri 08/04 1:16 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by CHARLES A. HORTON(Foret, L.) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 | ||
Tuesday, July 25, 2017 | ||
minutes
Scheduling Conference
Tue 07/25 2:42 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Amit P. Mehta: Initial Scheduling Conference held on 7/25/2017. Scheduling Order to follow. (Court Reporter: William Zaremba) (cdw) |
||
order
.Order
Tue 07/25 4:29 PM
MINUTE ORDER setting the schedule for further proceedings in this matter: Plaintiff shall file his Amended Complaint on or before August 7, 2017; the parties shall submit their initial disclosures, as required under Rule 26(a)(1), on or before August 21, 2017; Defendants shall file their Motion to Dismiss on or before September 7, 2017; Plaintiff shall file his Opposition to Defendants' Motion on or before September 21, 2017; Defendants shall file their Reply on or before September 28, 2017. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 07/25/2017. (lcapm2) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 07/27 10:57 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Complaint due by 8/7/2017. Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures due by 8/21/2017. Motion to Dismiss due by 9/7/2017. Response due by 9/21/2017. Reply due by 9/28/2017. (cdw) |
||
Monday, July 24, 2017 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 07/24 1:05 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference reset for 7/25/2017 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zcdw) |
||
Friday, July 21, 2017 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Meet and Confer Statement
Fri 07/21 2:58 PM
MEET AND CONFER STATEMENT. (Foret, L.) |
|
Wednesday, July 05, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents
Fri 07/07 3:03 PM
Receipt on 7 05-2017 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 17-CA-002046. (zrdj) |
|
Wednesday, June 28, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 06/28 12:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by L. Palmer Foret on behalf of CHARLES A. HORTON (Foret, L.) |
|
Tuesday, June 27, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
order
.Order
Tue 06/27 2:48 PM
ORDER setting Initial Scheduling Conference for August 1, 2017, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. See the attached Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Amit P. Mehta on 06/27/2017. (lcapm2) |
|
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 06/27 1:29 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by BENJAMIN OLSEN.(Hassell, Christopher) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 06/28 10:24 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/1/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 before Judge Amit P. Mehta. (cdw) |
||
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice to Counsel/Party
Mon 06/26 4:15 PM
NOTICE to Counsel/Party re1 Notice of Removal, (zsb) |
|
5 | 5
misc
Errata
Mon 06/26 1:42 PM
ERRATA by D.C. SOCCER LLC.(Johnson, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/26 4:11 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Amit P. Mehta. (zsb) |
||
Friday, June 23, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/23 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher E. Hassell on behalf of All Defendants (Hassell, Christopher) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/22 11:10 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by DC SOCCER, LLC. (Johnson, Matthew) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thu 06/22 11:08 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Major League Soccer LLC. (Johnson, Matthew) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Notice of Removal
Thu 06/22 11:06 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court for District of Columbia, case number 2017 CA 002046 B Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0090-5003126 filed by Major League Soccer LLC.(Johnson, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Notice of Removal, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet |