JAMES MADISON PROJECT et al v. CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Amy Berman Jackson |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-01231 |
Nature of Suit | 895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act |
Cause | 05:552 Freedom of Information Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 22, 2017 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 19, 2017 3:55 AM EST |
Defendant
CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
DEPARTMENT OF STATE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JAMES MADISON PROJECT
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
NOAH SHACHTMAN
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SPENCER ACKERMAN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, March 25, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Mon 03/25 5:26 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by SPENCER ACKERMAN, JAMES MADISON PROJECT, NOAH SHACHTMAN. (Moss, Bradley) |
|
Monday, March 04, 2019 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 03/04 2:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The parties must submit a joint status report by April 1, 2019, if the matter has not been resolved by then. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 03/04/2019. (lcabj3) |
||
Friday, March 01, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Status Report
Fri 03/01 5:30 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Cartier, Nicholas) |
|
Wednesday, January 30, 2019 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 01/30 10:24 AM
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the government's notice21 , the stay in this case is hereby lifted. The parties must submit a joint status report by March 1, 2019, if the matter has not been resolved. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 01/30/2019. (lcabj3) |
||
Tuesday, January 29, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 01/29 9:53 PM
NOTICE of Restoration of Operations by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE(Cartier, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, January 17, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
motion
Stay
Thu 01/17 12:12 AM
MOTION to Stay by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Cartier, Nicholas) |
|
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Thu 01/17 12:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting20 Motion to Stay. The government must file a notice within two days of the resumption of operations and it should include a proposed revised schedule is necessary. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 01/17/2019. (lcabj3) |
||
Tuesday, December 04, 2018 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 12/04 4:28 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The parties must file an updated status report by January 17, 2019, if the matter has not been resolved by then. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 12/04/2018. (lcabj3) |
||
Monday, December 03, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Status Report
Mon 12/03 5:34 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Cartier, Nicholas) |
|
Thursday, October 18, 2018 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 10/18 8:57 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 12/3/2018. (tb) |
||
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Status Report
Fri 10/12 3:05 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT by DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Cartier, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
.Order
Fri 10/12 4:52 PM
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the parties' status report18 , it is ORDERED that the parties shall file another status report by December 3, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/12/18. (DMK) |
||
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 10/05 12:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiffs and defendants State Department and DIA must submit a joint status report that includes a schedule for further proceedings by October 12, 2018. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 10/05/2018. (lcabj3) |
||
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
21
pgs
order
Memorandum & Opinion
Wed 09/26 2:54 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 09/26/2018. (lcabj3) |
|
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment
Wed 09/26 2:53 PM
ORDER. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56 and for the reasons stated in the accompanying Memorandum Opinion, it is hereby ORDERED that plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment8 is DENIED and defendants' Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment10 is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 09/26/2018. (lcabj3) |
|
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Substitution of Counsel
Wed 08/22 2:48 PM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Nicholas P. Cartier on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE Substituting for attorney Stephen Elliott (Cartier, Nicholas) |
|
Thursday, May 10, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 05/10 4:33 PM
NOTICE of Related Case by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE (Elliott, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, November 15, 2017 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Wed 11/15 5:02 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re10 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Elliott, Stephen) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2017 | ||
12 | 12
10
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Wed 11/01 9:34 AM
Memorandum in opposition to re10 Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by SPENCER ACKERMAN, JAMES MADISON PROJECT, NOAH SHACHTMAN.(Moss, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Statement of Facts (Response), | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
11 | 11
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Wed 11/01 9:33 AM
REPLY to opposition to motion re8 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by SPENCER ACKERMAN, JAMES MADISON PROJECT, NOAH SHACHTMAN. (Moss, Bradley) |
|
Wednesday, October 18, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Partial Summary Judgment
Wed 10/18 9:06 PM
Cross MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE(Elliott, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of David M. Hardy, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of David J. Sherman, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Antoinette B. Shiner, | ||
Att: 5 Statement of Facts, | ||
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order | ||
9 | 9
2
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Wed 10/18 8:54 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re8 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Elliott, Stephen) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of David M. Hardy, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of David J. Sherman, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Antoinette B. Shiner, | ||
Att: 5 Statement of Facts, | ||
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, September 18, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 09/18 1:13 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by SPENCER ACKERMAN, JAMES MADISON PROJECT, NOAH SHACHTMAN(Moss, Bradley) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Statement of Facts, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 1 - FOIA Requests, | ||
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, September 08, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Status Report
Fri 09/08 3:52 PM
STATUS REPORT by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE. (Elliott, Stephen) |
|
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 09/08 5:08 PM
MINUTE ORDER. In light of7 defendants' status report, Department of State will complete its search for responsive records and release any non-exempt responsive materials to plaintiffs by September 29, 2017. Further, the Court adopts the following briefing schedule with regard to defendants CIA, FBI, and NSA's Glomar responses: plaintiffs must file their motion for partial summary judgment by September 18, 2017; defendants must file their combined opposition and cross-motion for partial summary judgment by October 18, 2017; plaintiffs must file their combined reply and cross-opposition by November 1, 2017; and defendants must file their cross-reply by November 15, 2017. The Court will establish a schedule for briefing issues related to responses provided by DIA and Department of State at a later date, if necessary. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 9/8/2017. (lcabj2) |
||
Friday, August 11, 2017 | ||
6 | 6
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Fri 08/11 3:06 PM
ORDER. Before the Court in this FOIA case are a complaint and an answer. The requirements of LCvR 16.3 and Rule 26(f) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure appear to be inapplicable. Defendants shall file a dispositive motion or, in the alternative, a report setting forth the schedule according to which it will complete its production of documents to plaintiffs on or before September 11, 2017. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 8/11/2017. (lcabj2) |
|
Thursday, August 10, 2017 | ||
5 | 5
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 08/10 4:22 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE.(Elliott, Stephen) |
|
Monday, June 26, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Mon 06/26 3:35 PM
SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, DEPARTMENT OF STATE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Consent Form)(zsb) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/26 10:25 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bradley Prescott Moss on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Moss, Bradley) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Mon 06/26 3:31 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (zsb) |
||
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
2 | 2
notice
LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Thu 06/22 9:51 PM
LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests for James Madison Project by JAMES MADISON PROJECT (Zaid, Mark) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 06/22 9:50 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5003114) filed by JAMES MADISON PROJECT, Spencer Ackerman, NOAH SHACHTMAN.(Zaid, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons CIA, | ||
Att: 3 Summons DoD, | ||
Att: 4 Summons DOJ, | ||
Att: 5 Summons DOS, | ||
Att: 6 Summons US Attny, | ||
Att: 7 Summons USAG |