Sandoval v. I.C. Systems
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Dora Lizette Irizarry |
Referred: | Steven Tiscione |
Case #: | 1:17-cv-03755 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jun 21, 2017 |
Terminated: | Mar 30, 2018 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 18, 2017 3:35 AM EST |
Defendant
I.C. Systems
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan Sandoval
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, March 30, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Judgment - Clerk
Fri 03/30 2:05 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: ORDERED and ADJUDGED that defendant's Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED; and that the Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court, by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on March 30, 2018. (Williams, Erica) |
|
Thursday, March 29, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
7
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 03/29 7:55 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -- For the reasons set forth in the ATTACHED WRITTEN MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, Defendant's motion to dismiss the complaint is granted. This action is dismissed with prejudice and the Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 3/29/2018. (Irizarry, Dora) |
|
Monday, January 08, 2018 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 01/08 7:48 AM
ORDER granting (37) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Yevgeny Roymisher terminated in case 1:16-cv-04510-RRM-ST; granting (11) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Yevgeny Roymisher terminated in case 1:17-cv-03755-DLI-ST. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione on 1/8/2018. (Vasquez, Lea) |
||
Friday, January 05, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 01/05 11:38 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by I.C. Systems. (Roymisher, Yevgeny) |
|
Friday, October 20, 2017 | ||
10 | 10
13
pgs
respoth
Memorandum in Opposition
Fri 10/20 1:55 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Juan Sandoval. (Geller, Edward) |
|
order
Order(Other)
Fri 10/20 11:22 AM
ORDER -- Plaintiff is hereby directed to electronically file the opposition to defendant's Motion to Dismiss NO LATER THAN Monday, October 23, 2017. A hard courtesy copy must also be provided to chambers promptly. So Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 10/20/2017. (Carosella, Christy) |
||
Thursday, August 03, 2017 | ||
9 | 9
respoth
Reply in Support
Thu 08/03 4:18 PM
REPLY in Support re7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by I.C. Systems. (Siachos, Peter) |
|
Thursday, July 13, 2017 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Thu 07/13 8:58 AM
ORDER granting8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -- Plaintiff's response is now due by July 27, 2017. So Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 7/13/2017. (Carosella, Christy) |
||
Wednesday, July 12, 2017 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 07/12 2:49 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Juan Sandoval. (Geller, Edward) |
|
Thursday, June 29, 2017 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Thu 06/29 10:23 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by I.C. Systems. (Siachos, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Peter G. Siachos Esq. in Support of Motion, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Peter G. Siachos, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 4 Memorandum in Support | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/29 10:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Yevgeny Roymisher on behalf of I.C. Systems (aty to be noticed) (Roymisher, Yevgeny) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 06/29 10:59 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward B. Geller on behalf of Juan Sandoval (notification declined or already on case) (Geller, Edward) |
|
Thursday, June 22, 2017 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Clerks Notice of Rule 73
Thu 06/22 3:27 PM
In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening
Thu 06/22 2:23 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made. (McMahon, Carol) |
|
Wednesday, June 21, 2017 | ||
2 | 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by I.C. Systems (Siachos, Peter) Modified on 6/22/2017 (McMahon, Carol). | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by I.C. Systems from New York City Civil Court, case number 010976. Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed - Yes( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0207-9624380) (Siachos, Peter) Modified on 6/22/2017 (McMahon, Carol). | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Thu 06/22 3:26 PM
Case assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry and Magistrate Judge Steven Tiscione. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |